This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/21/2022 at 08:48:47 (UTC).

U.S. Bank Trust National Association, Trustee v. Kattar et al

Case Summary

On 01/20/2022 U S Bank Trust National Association, Trustee filed an Other lawsuit against Kattar. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New Hampshire District. The Judge overseeing this case is Joseph N. Laplante. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-00019

  • Filing Date:

    01/20/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Joseph N. Laplante

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

U.S. Bank Trust, N.A., Trustee

10 City Square, 4Th Floor

Boston, MA 02129

U.S. Bank Trust National Association, Trustee

Defendants

Darcy Kattar

Internal Revenue Service

United Guaranty Residential Insurance Company of North Carolina

Timberland Machines and Irrigation, Inc.

USA

Timberland Machines & Irrigation, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Patrick James Martin

Attorney at Demerle Hoeger LLP

10 City Sq, 4Th Flr

Boston, MA 02129

Defendant Attorney

Michael T. McCormack

Attorney at US Attorney's Office (NH)

James C Cleveland Federal Bldg, 53 Pleasant St, 4Th Flr

Concord, NH 03301

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

State Court Summons and Complaint

1 #2

Notice of Filing Notice of Removal

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

2 #2

Main Document

2 #1

State Court Record

#3

(#3) Assented to MOTION to Extend Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Interpleader Complaint filed by USA.(McCormack, Michael) (Entered: 01/24/2022)

#4

(#4) Disclosure Statement by U.S. Bank Trust National Association, Trustee disclosing no parent company, no publicly traded company, and no merger agreement. (Martin, Patrick) (Entered: 01/31/2022)

#5

(#5) Return of Service Executed as to Darcy Kattar by U.S. Bank Trust National Association, Trustee. Served/Mailed on 11/29/2021. Answer Follow Up on 12/20/2021. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Martin, Patrick) (Entered: 01/31/2022)

#6

(#6) Return of Service Executed as to United Guaranty Residential Insurance Company of North Carolina by U.S. Bank Trust National Association, Trustee. Served/Mailed on 1/31/2022. Answer Follow Up on 2/22/2022. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Martin, Patrick) (Entered: 01/31/2022)

#7

(#7) Return of Service Executed as to Timberland Machines & Irrigation, Inc. by U.S. Bank Trust National Association, Trustee. Served/Mailed on 11/30/2021. Answer Follow Up on 12/21/2021. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Martin, Patrick) (Entered: 01/31/2022)

#8

(#8) Return of Service Executed as to USA by U.S. Bank Trust National Association, Trustee. Served/Mailed on 12/16/2021. Answer Follow Up on 2/17/2022. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Martin, Patrick) (Entered: 01/31/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Return of Service Executed as to USA by U.S. Bank Trust National Association, Trustee. Served/Mailed on 12/16/2021. Answer Follow Up on 2/17/2022. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Martin, Patrick) (Entered: 01/31/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Return of Service Executed as to Timberland Machines & Irrigation, Inc. by U.S. Bank Trust National Association, Trustee. Served/Mailed on 11/30/2021. Answer Follow Up on 12/21/2021. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Martin, Patrick) (Entered: 01/31/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Return of Service Executed as to United Guaranty Residential Insurance Company of North Carolina by U.S. Bank Trust National Association, Trustee. Served/Mailed on 1/31/2022. Answer Follow Up on 2/22/2022. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Martin, Patrick) (Entered: 01/31/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Return of Service Executed as to Darcy Kattar by U.S. Bank Trust National Association, Trustee. Served/Mailed on 11/29/2021. Answer Follow Up on 12/20/2021. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Martin, Patrick) (Entered: 01/31/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Disclosure Statement by U.S. Bank Trust National Association, Trustee disclosing no parent company, no publicly traded company, and no merger agreement. (Martin, Patrick) (Entered: 01/31/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketENDORSED ORDER granting #3 Assented to MOTION to Extend Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Interpleader Complaint. Text of Order: Motion to Extend Time to Answer is granted. For the reasons stated in the motion, the court finds good cause to extend the deadline for issuing the scheduling order pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b). So Ordered by Judge Joseph N. Laplante. Answer Follow Up on 3/21/2022. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(jb) (Entered: 01/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Assented to MOTION to Extend Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Interpleader Complaint filed by USA.(McCormack, Michael) (Entered: 01/24/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Certified Copies of State Court Record. State Court Case No. 218-2021-CV-01156, Rockingham County Superior Court (Attachments: #1 State Court Record)(McCormack, Michael) (Entered: 01/24/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE re #1 Notice of Removal - New Case, LR 7.1.1. In removal actions, a nongovernmental corporate plaintiff, partnership plaintiff, or LLC plaintiff must file a disclosure statement within twenty-one (21) days from the date the notice of removal is filed or with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, objection, or request, whichever is filed sooner. File Disclosure Statement using the Other Documents/Disclosure Statement event. U.S. Bank Trust National Association, Trustee shall file a disclosure statement by January 28, 2022. Disclosure Statement due 1/28/2022. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(mc) (Entered: 01/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketNOTICE. This case has been designated for Electronic Case Filing. All further submissions shall be filed in compliance with the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing. Pro se litigants are not required to file electronically and may continue to file documents in paper format. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE. Pursuant to Local Rule 81.1(a) and (b), answers and motions filed in the state court will not be considered unless refiled in this court. Please note that all filings in this District must comply with Local Rule 7. The Local Rules and Administrative Procedures for ECF can be downloaded from our website #HERE. (mc) (Entered: 01/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Judge Joseph N. Laplante. The case designation is: 1:22-cv-19-JL. Please show this number with the judge designation on all future pleadings. (mc) (Entered: 01/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Rockingham, case number 218-2021-CV-01156 (No fee paid, USA or IFP.) filed by Internal Revenue Service. Answer Follow Up on 2/10/2022. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). State Court Record Follow Up 2/3/2022. (Attachments: #1 State Court Summons and Complaint, #2 Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(McCormack, Michael) (Entered: 01/20/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where United Guaranty Residential Ins Co of No Carolina is a litigant

Latest cases where U.S. Bank Trust, N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases where Internal Revenue Service is a litigant