This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/04/2022 at 08:02:29 (UTC).

US BANK TRUST NA v. PAMELA GIBERSON

Case Summary

On 05/05/2022 US BANK TRUST NA filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against PAMELA GIBERSON. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Maine District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are JOHN A. WOODCOCK, JR and JOHN C. NIVISON. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:22-CV-00124

  • Filing Date:

    05/05/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

JOHN A. WOODCOCK, JR

Referral Judge

JOHN C. NIVISON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

US BANK TRUST NA

Defendants and Not Classified By Court

PAMELA GIBERSON

PAMALA GIBERSON

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

RENEAU J. LONGORIA

Attorney at DOONAN, GRAVES & LONGORIA LLC

100 Cummings Center, Suite 303C

Beverly, MA 01915

 

Court Documents

#6

(#6) MOTION for Entry of Default as to Defendant by US BANK TRUST NA Responses due by 7/13/2022. (LONGORIA, RENEAU) (Entered: 06/22/2022)

#5

(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by US BANK TRUST NA. PAMELA GIBERSON served on 5/19/2022. (LONGORIA, RENEAU) (Entered: 05/25/2022)

#4

(#4) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by US BANK TRUST NA. (LONGORIA, RENEAU) (Entered: 05/11/2022)

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to PAMELA GIBERSON. Counsel shall print the embossed summons and effect service in the manner in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4. Note-If you are using Version 6 of Adobe Acrobat, be sure the PRINT WHAT field is set to DOCUMENTS AND COMMENTS (Click File, then Print to check this setting). (bfa) (Entered: 05/05/2022)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET. (bfa) (Entered: 05/05/2022)

1 #13

Exhibit M Deed to Pamela

1 #11

Exhibit K Affidavit Relating to Military Search

1 #10

Exhibit J Payoff Calculation

1 #9

Exhibit I Obituary

1 #8

Exhibit H Demand Letter

1 #7

Exhibit G Property Inspection Report

1 #6

Exhibit F Order on Plaintiffs Motion for Default Judgment

1 #5

Exhibit E Assignment into Federal National Mortgage Association

1 #4

Exhibit D Assignment into JPMorgan Chase Bank, National Association

1 #3

Exhibit C - Mortgage

1 #2

Exhibit B Note

1 #1

Exhibit A Legal Description

1 #1

Main Document

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER granting #6 Motion for Entry of Default (no answer or responsive pleading having been filed) as to PAMELA GIBERSON Check for Filing of a Motion for Default Judgment on 7/22/2022. By DEPUTY CLERK: Teagan Snyder (tcs) (Entered: 06/22/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION for Entry of Default as to Defendant by US BANK TRUST NA Responses due by 7/13/2022. (LONGORIA, RENEAU) (Entered: 06/22/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2022
  • DocketSet Deadlines: Check for Filing of a Motion for Default as to PAMELA GIBERSON on 7/13/2022. (tcs) (Entered: 06/13/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2022
  • DocketSet Answer Deadline for PAMELA GIBERSON: Answer due by 6/9/2022. (tcs) (Entered: 05/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by US BANK TRUST NA. PAMELA GIBERSON served on 5/19/2022. (LONGORIA, RENEAU) (Entered: 05/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by US BANK TRUST NA. (LONGORIA, RENEAU) (Entered: 05/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2022
  • DocketFiling Fee Paid via Credit Card ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AMEDC-2649144.), filed by US BANK TRUST NA.(LONGORIA, RENEAU) (Entered: 05/05/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2022
  • DocketSet Deadlines : Per Local Rule 7.1 Notice of Interested Parties or Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 5/12/2022. (bfa) (Entered: 05/05/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to PAMELA GIBERSON. Counsel shall print the embossed summons and effect service in the manner in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4. Note-If you are using Version 6 of Adobe Acrobat, be sure the PRINT WHAT field is set to DOCUMENTS AND COMMENTS (Click File, then Print to check this setting). (bfa) (Entered: 05/05/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET. (bfa) (Entered: 05/05/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against PAMELA GIBERSON PAYMENT OF FILING FEE DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS. IF FILING FEE IS BEING PAID WITH A CREDIT CARD COUNSEL ARE INSTRUCTED TO LOGIN TO CMECF AND DOCKET Case Opening Filing Fee Paid FOUND IN THE Complaints and Other Initiating Documents CATEGORY. CHECK PAYMENTS DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS., filed by US BANK TRUST NA. (Service of Process Deadline 8/3/2022) Fee due by 5/9/2022. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Legal Description, #2 Exhibit B Note, #3 Exhibit C - Mortgage, #4 Exhibit D Assignment into JPMorgan Chase Bank, National Association, #5 Exhibit E Assignment into Federal National Mortgage Association, #6 Exhibit F Order on Plaintiffs Motion for Default Judgment, #7 Exhibit G Property Inspection Report, #8 Exhibit H Demand Letter, #9 Exhibit I Obituary, #10 Exhibit J Payoff Calculation, #11 Exhibit K Affidavit Relating to Military Search, #12 Exhibit L Property Inspection Report, #13 Exhibit M Deed to Pamela)(bfa) (Entered: 05/05/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where U.S. Bank Trust, N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer RENEAU J. LONGORIA