Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 07/12/2020 at 09:45:27 (UTC).

US BANK TRUST NA AS TRUSTEE FOR LSF9 MASTER PARTICIPATION TRUST v. PLUMMER

Case Summary

On 05/13/2020 US BANK TRUST NA AS TRUSTEE FOR LSF9 MASTER PARTICIPATION TRUST filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against PLUMMER. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Maine District. The Judges overseeing this case are JOHN H. RICH III and D. BROCK HORNBY. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-00171

  • Filing Date:

    05/13/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Maine District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

JOHN H. RICH III

Presiding Judge

D. BROCK HORNBY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

US BANK TRUST NA AS TRUSTEE FOR LSF9 MASTER PARTICIPATION TRUST

Defendant

LEE A PLUMMER

Interested Parties

CITIBANK FEDERAL SAVINGS BANK

COLONIAL VILLAGE OF SOUTH PORTLAND CONDOMINIUM NO. 1 ASSOCIATION

ISLANDCAP LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

JOHN A. DOONAN

Attorney at DOONAN, GRAVES & LONGORIA LLC

100 Cummings Center, Suite 225D

Beverly, MA 01915

RENEAU J. LONGORIA

Attorney at DOONAN, GRAVES & LONGORIA LLC

100 Cummings Center, Suite 225D

Beverly, MA 01915

Interested Party Attorney

ANDREW W. SPARKS

Attorney at DRUMMOND & DRUMMOND LLP

One Monument Way

Portland, ME 04101

 

Court Documents

#9

(#9) SUMMONS Returned Executed by US BANK TRUST NA AS TRUSTEE FOR LSF9 MASTER PARTICIPATION TRUST. COLONIAL VILLAGE OF SOUTH PORTLAND CONDOMINIUM NO. 1 ASSOCIATION served on 5/18/2020. (LONGORIA, RENEAU) (Entered: 06/17/2020)

#8

(#8) AFFIDAVIT of Service by US BANK TRUST NA AS TRUSTEE FOR LSF9 MASTER PARTICIPATION TRUST. CITIBANK FEDERAL SAVINGS BANK served on 5/20/2020. (LONGORIA, RENEAU) (Entered: 06/17/2020)

#7

(#7) AFFIDAVIT of Service by US BANK TRUST NA AS TRUSTEE FOR LSF9 MASTER PARTICIPATION TRUST. ISLANDCAP LLC served on 5/15/2020. (LONGORIA, RENEAU) (Entered: 06/10/2020)

#6

(#6) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by COLONIAL VILLAGE OF SOUTH PORTLAND CONDOMINIUM NO. 1 ASSOCIATION. (SPARKS, ANDREW) (Entered: 06/03/2020)

#5

(#5) ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,, by COLONIAL VILLAGE OF SOUTH PORTLAND CONDOMINIUM NO. 1 ASSOCIATION.(SPARKS, ANDREW) (Entered: 06/03/2020)

#4

(#4) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by US BANK TRUST NA AS TRUSTEE FOR LSF9 MASTER PARTICIPATION TRUST. (LONGORIA, RENEAU) (Entered: 05/20/2020)

3 #1

Colonial Village of South Portland Condominium No.1 summons

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to CITIBANK FEDERAL SAVINGS BANK, COLONIAL VILLAGE OF SOUTH PORTLAND CONDOMINIUM NO. 1 ASSOCIATION, ISLANDCAP LLC, LEE A PLUMMER. Counsel shall print the embossed summons and effect service in the manner in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4. Note-If you are using Version 6 of Adobe Acrobat, be sure the PRINT WHAT field is set to DOCUMENTS AND COMMENTS (Click File, then Print to check this setting). (Attachments: #1 Colonial Village of South Portland Condominium No.1 summons, #2 Citibank Federal Savings Bank summons, #3 Islandcap, LLC summons)(bfa) (Entered: 05/13/2020)

1 #9

Exhibit I -Affidavit Relating to Military Search

1 #8

Exhibit H - Demand Letters

1 #7

Exhibit G - Assignment into U.S. Bank

1 #6

Exhibit F - Assignment into U.S. Bank

1 #5

Exhibit E - Affidavit into FNMA

1 #4

Exhibit D - Assignment into Letom Management

1 #3

Exhibit C - Mortgage

1 #2

Exhibit B - Note

1 #1

Exhibit A - Legal Description

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against LEE A PLUMMER PAYMENT OF FILING FEE DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS. IF FILING FEE IS BEING PAID WITH A CREDIT CARD COUNSEL ARE INSTRUCTED TO LOGIN TO CMECF AND DOCKET Case Opening Filing Fee Paid FOUND IN THE Complaints and Other Initiating Documents CATEGORY. CHECK PAYMENTS DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS., filed by US BANK TRUST NA AS TRUSTEE FOR LSF9 MASTER PARTICIPATION TRUST. (Service of Process Deadline 8/11/2020) Fee due by 5/15/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Legal Description, #2 Exhibit B - Note, #3 Exhibit C - Mortgage, #4 Exhibit D - Assignment into Letom Management, #5 Exhibit E - Affidavit into FNMA, #6 Exhibit F - Assignment into U.S. Bank, #7 Exhibit G - Assignment into U.S. Bank, #8 Exhibit H - Demand Letters, #9 Exhibit I -Affidavit Relating to Military Search)(bfa) (Entered: 05/13/2020)

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/17/2020
  • DocketReset Deadlines per filing of #8 Affidavit of Service returned served 5/20/20 and per #7 Affidavit of Service filed, Served 5/15/2020: Check for Filing of a Motion for Default as to CITIBANK FEDERAL SAVINGS BANK and ISLANDCAP LLC on 7/17/2020. (clp) (Entered: 06/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) SUMMONS Returned Executed by US BANK TRUST NA AS TRUSTEE FOR LSF9 MASTER PARTICIPATION TRUST. COLONIAL VILLAGE OF SOUTH PORTLAND CONDOMINIUM NO. 1 ASSOCIATION served on 5/18/2020. (LONGORIA, RENEAU) (Entered: 06/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) AFFIDAVIT of Service by US BANK TRUST NA AS TRUSTEE FOR LSF9 MASTER PARTICIPATION TRUST. CITIBANK FEDERAL SAVINGS BANK served on 5/20/2020. (LONGORIA, RENEAU) (Entered: 06/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2020
  • DocketSet Deadlines as to ISLANDCAP LLC per #7 Affidavit of Service filed, Served 5/15/2020: Check for Filing of a Motion for Default on 7/10/2020. (clp) (Entered: 06/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) AFFIDAVIT of Service by US BANK TRUST NA AS TRUSTEE FOR LSF9 MASTER PARTICIPATION TRUST. ISLANDCAP LLC served on 5/15/2020. (LONGORIA, RENEAU) (Entered: 06/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by COLONIAL VILLAGE OF SOUTH PORTLAND CONDOMINIUM NO. 1 ASSOCIATION. (SPARKS, ANDREW) (Entered: 06/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,, by COLONIAL VILLAGE OF SOUTH PORTLAND CONDOMINIUM NO. 1 ASSOCIATION.(SPARKS, ANDREW) (Entered: 06/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by US BANK TRUST NA AS TRUSTEE FOR LSF9 MASTER PARTICIPATION TRUST. (LONGORIA, RENEAU) (Entered: 05/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2020
  • DocketFiling Fee Paid via Credit Card ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AMEDC-2229145.), filed by US BANK TRUST NA AS TRUSTEE FOR LSF9 MASTER PARTICIPATION TRUST.(LONGORIA, RENEAU) (Entered: 05/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to CITIBANK FEDERAL SAVINGS BANK, COLONIAL VILLAGE OF SOUTH PORTLAND CONDOMINIUM NO. 1 ASSOCIATION, ISLANDCAP LLC, LEE A PLUMMER. Counsel shall print the embossed summons and effect service in the manner in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4. Note-If you are using Version 6 of Adobe Acrobat, be sure the PRINT WHAT field is set to DOCUMENTS AND COMMENTS (Click File, then Print to check this setting). (Attachments: #1 Colonial Village of South Portland Condominium No.1 summons, #2 Citibank Federal Savings Bank summons, #3 Islandcap, LLC summons)(bfa) (Entered: 05/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2020
  • DocketSet Deadlines : Per Local Rule 7.1 Notice of Interested Parties or Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 5/20/2020. (bfa) (Entered: 05/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET. (bfa) (Entered: 05/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against LEE A PLUMMER PAYMENT OF FILING FEE DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS. IF FILING FEE IS BEING PAID WITH A CREDIT CARD COUNSEL ARE INSTRUCTED TO LOGIN TO CMECF AND DOCKET Case Opening Filing Fee Paid FOUND IN THE Complaints and Other Initiating Documents CATEGORY. CHECK PAYMENTS DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS., filed by US BANK TRUST NA AS TRUSTEE FOR LSF9 MASTER PARTICIPATION TRUST. (Service of Process Deadline 8/11/2020) Fee due by 5/15/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Legal Description, #2 Exhibit B - Note, #3 Exhibit C - Mortgage, #4 Exhibit D - Assignment into Letom Management, #5 Exhibit E - Affidavit into FNMA, #6 Exhibit F - Assignment into U.S. Bank, #7 Exhibit G - Assignment into U.S. Bank, #8 Exhibit H - Demand Letters, #9 Exhibit I -Affidavit Relating to Military Search)(bfa) (Entered: 05/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Citibank, Federal Savings Bank is a litigant

Latest cases where U.S. Bank Trust, N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer JOHN A. DOONAN

Latest cases represented by Lawyer RENEAU J. LONGORIA