This case was last updated from PACER on 07/07/2019 at 08:14:20 (UTC).

US BANK TRUST NA AS TRUSTEE FOR LSF10 MASTER PARTICIPATION TRUST v. COTE

Case Summary

On 05/08/2019 US BANK TRUST NA AS TRUSTEE FOR LSF10 MASTER PARTICIPATION TRUST filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against COTE. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Maine District. The Judges overseeing this case are JOHN H. RICH III and D. BROCK HORNBY. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-00205

  • Filing Date:

    05/08/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Maine District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

JOHN H. RICH III

Presiding Judge

D. BROCK HORNBY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

US BANK TRUST NA AS TRUSTEE FOR LSF10 MASTER PARTICIPATION TRUST

Defendant

PETER J COTE, II

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

JOHN A. DOONAN

Attorney at DOONAN, GRAVES & LONGORIA LLC

100 Cummings Center, Suite 225D

Beverly, MA 01915

RENEAU J. LONGORIA

Attorney at DOONAN, GRAVES & LONGORIA LLC

100 Cummings Center, Suite 225D

Beverly, MA 01915

 

Court Documents

#8

(#8) Notice of Voluntary Dismissal by US BANK TRUST NA AS TRUSTEE FOR LSF10 MASTER PARTICIPATION TRUST (LONGORIA, RENEAU) (Entered: 05/21/2019)

#7

(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by US BANK TRUST NA AS TRUSTEE FOR LSF10 MASTER PARTICIPATION TRUST. PETER J COTE, II served on 5/13/2019. (LONGORIA, RENEAU) (Entered: 05/20/2019)

#6

(#6) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by US BANK TRUST NA AS TRUSTEE FOR LSF10 MASTER PARTICIPATION TRUST. (LONGORIA, RENEAU) (Entered: 05/15/2019)

#4

(#4) CIVIL COVER SHEET Amended. (DOONAN, JOHN) (Entered: 05/09/2019)

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to PETER J COTE, II. Counsel shall print the embossed summons and effect service in the manner in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4. Note-If you are using Version 6 of Adobe Acrobat, be sure the PRINT WHAT field is set to DOCUMENTS AND COMMENTS (Click File, then Print to check this setting). (bfa) (Entered: 05/09/2019)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET. (bfa) (Entered: 05/09/2019)

1 #8

Exhibit H Affidavit Relating to Military Search

1 #7

Exhibit G Demand Letter

1 #6

Exhibit F AOM to U.S. Bank Trust, N.A

1 #5

Exhibit E AOM to U.S. Bank Trust, N.A.

1 #4

Exhibit D AOM to FNMA

1 #3

Exhibit C Mortgage

1 #2

Exhibit B Note

1 #1

Exhibit A Legal Description

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against PETER J COTE, II PAYMENT OF FILING FEE DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS. IF FILING FEE IS BEING PAID WITH A CREDIT CARD COUNSEL ARE INSTRUCTED TO LOGIN TO CMECF AND DOCKET Case Opening Filing Fee Paid FOUND IN THE Complaints and Other Initiating Documents CATEGORY. CHECK PAYMENTS DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS., filed by US BANK TRUST NA AS TRUSTEE FOR LSF10 MASTER PARTICIPATION TRUST. (Service of Process Deadline 8/6/2019) Fee due by 5/10/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Legal Description, #2 Exhibit B Note, #3 Exhibit C Mortgage, #4 Exhibit D AOM to FNMA, #5 Exhibit E AOM to U.S. Bank Trust, N.A., #6 Exhibit F AOM to U.S. Bank Trust, N.A, #7 Exhibit G Demand Letter, #8 Exhibit H Affidavit Relating to Military Search)(bfa) (Entered: 05/09/2019)

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Notice of Voluntary Dismissal by US BANK TRUST NA AS TRUSTEE FOR LSF10 MASTER PARTICIPATION TRUST (LONGORIA, RENEAU) (Entered: 05/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • set Answer Deadline Defendant was served on May 13, 2019: Answer due by 6/3/2019. (mjlt) (Entered: 05/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by US BANK TRUST NA AS TRUSTEE FOR LSF10 MASTER PARTICIPATION TRUST. PETER J COTE, II served on 5/13/2019. (LONGORIA, RENEAU) (Entered: 05/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by US BANK TRUST NA AS TRUSTEE FOR LSF10 MASTER PARTICIPATION TRUST. (LONGORIA, RENEAU) (Entered: 05/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2019
  • Filing Fee Paid via Credit Card ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0100-2017883.), filed by US BANK TRUST NA AS TRUSTEE FOR LSF10 MASTER PARTICIPATION TRUST.(LONGORIA, RENEAU) (Entered: 05/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2019
  • (#5) NOTICE of Docket Entry Modification regarding Reset Corporate Disclosure Statement deadline entry: Docket entry modified by the Clerk's Office to reflect that it was filed in error. (mnw) (Entered: 05/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2019
  • **FILED IN ERROR** Reset Deadlines : Per Local Rule 7.1 Notice of Interested Parties or Corporate Disclosure Statements due by 5/16/2019. (mnw) Modified on 5/9/2019 to add filed in error notation (mnw). (Entered: 05/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) CIVIL COVER SHEET Amended. (DOONAN, JOHN) (Entered: 05/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2019
  • Set Deadlines : Per Local Rule 7.1 Notice of Interested Parties or Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 5/16/2019. (bfa) (Entered: 05/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Summons Issued as to PETER J COTE, II. Counsel shall print the embossed summons and effect service in the manner in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4. Note-If you are using Version 6 of Adobe Acrobat, be sure the PRINT WHAT field is set to DOCUMENTS AND COMMENTS (Click File, then Print to check this setting). (bfa) (Entered: 05/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET. (bfa) (Entered: 05/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against PETER J COTE, II PAYMENT OF FILING FEE DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS. IF FILING FEE IS BEING PAID WITH A CREDIT CARD COUNSEL ARE INSTRUCTED TO LOGIN TO CMECF AND DOCKET Case Opening Filing Fee Paid FOUND IN THE Complaints and Other Initiating Documents CATEGORY. CHECK PAYMENTS DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS., filed by US BANK TRUST NA AS TRUSTEE FOR LSF10 MASTER PARTICIPATION TRUST. (Service of Process Deadline 8/6/2019) Fee due by 5/10/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Legal Description, #2 Exhibit B Note, #3 Exhibit C Mortgage, #4 Exhibit D AOM to FNMA, #5 Exhibit E AOM to U.S. Bank Trust, N.A., #6 Exhibit F AOM to U.S. Bank Trust, N.A, #7 Exhibit G Demand Letter, #8 Exhibit H Affidavit Relating to Military Search)(bfa) (Entered: 05/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.