Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 06/22/2021 at 12:13:12 (UTC).

U.S. Bank National Association v. Sun Life Assurance Company of Canada

Case Summary

On 04/23/2021 U S Bank National Association filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Sun Life Assurance Company of Canada. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are John F. Walter and Rozella A. Oliver. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-03489

  • Filing Date:

    04/23/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Central District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

John F. Walter

Referral Judge

Rozella A. Oliver

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

U.S. Bank National Association

Defendant

Sun Life Assurance Company of Canada

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Lynnda A McGlinn

Attorney at Dorsey and Whitney LLP

600 Anton Boulevard Suite 2000

Costa Mesa, CA 92626

Faisal M Zubairi

Attorney at Dorsey and Whitney LLP

600 Anton Boulevard Suite 2000

Costa Mesa, CA 92626-7655

Defendant Attorney

Matthew Evan Lewitz

Attorney at Cozen O'Connor

601 South Figueroa Street Suite 3700

Los Angeles, CA 90017

 

Court Documents

#19

(#19) ORDER OF DISMISSAL #18 by Judge John F. Walter. The above-captioned action is dismissed pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a) with prejudice, and with each party is to bear their own attorney's fees and costs. Case Terminated. Made JS-6. (iv) (Entered: 06/04/2021)

#17

(#17) ORDER TO EXTEND TIME FOR DEFENDANT TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT #16 by Judge John F. Walter. Defendant Sun Life Assurance Company of Canada's deadline to move, answer, or otherwise respond to Plaintiff U.S. Bank National Association, solely as Securities Intermediary's Complaint is hereby extended to and including June 15, 2021. (iv) (Entered: 05/25/2021)

#15

(#15) SCHEDULING AND CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER by Judge John F. Walter.The purpose of this Order is to notify the parties and their counsel of the deadlines and the schedule that will govern this action. Pretrial Conference set for 2/4/2022 at 8:00 AM. Hearing on Motions in Limine; DisputedJury Instructions set for 2/11/2022 at 8:00 AM. Jury Trial set for 2/22/2022 at 8:30 AM. (iv) (Entered: 05/18/2021)

#14

(#14) ORDER VACATING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE, REFERRAL TO PRIVATE MEDIATION, and DISMISSING ANY UNSERVED DOE DEFENDANTS by Judge John F. Walter. The Court has reviewed the parties' Joint Rule 26(f) Report and finds that a Scheduling Conference is not necessary. The hearing on May 24, 2021 is vacated and taken off calendar. A Scheduling and Case Management Order will issue. Any unserved DOE defendants are dismissed at this time. The Court, having considered the parties' Request: ADR Procedure Selection, the Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program, or the report submitted by the parties pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(f) and Civil L.R. 26-1, hereby: ORDERS this case referred to: ADR PROCEDURE NO. 3: (Private mediation). The ADR proceeding is to be completed no later than: October 18, 2021. The Joint Report re: Results of Settlement Conference due on: October 25, 2021. (iv) (Entered: 05/18/2021)

#13

(#13) JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial Plaintiff estimates a trial of 3-5 days. Defendant estimates a trial of 5 or more days., filed by Plaintiff U.S. Bank National Association.. (Zubairi, Faisal) (Entered: 05/13/2021)

#12

(#12) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff U.S. Bank National Association, (Zubairi, Faisal) (Entered: 05/05/2021)

#11

(#11) DECLARATION of Lead Trial Counsel Regarding Compliance With Local Rules Governing Electronic Filing filed by Plaintiff U.S. Bank National Association. (Zubairi, Faisal) (Entered: 05/05/2021)

#8

(#8) STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Sun Life Assurance Company of Canada answer now due 5/28/2021, re Complaint - (Discovery) filed by Defendant Sun Life Assurance Company of Canada.(Lewitz, Matthew) (Entered: 04/29/2021)

#7

(#7) MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) COURT ORDER by Judge John F. Walter. Counsel are hereby notified that a Scheduling Conference has been set for May 24, 2021 at 1:15 p.m. before Judge John F. Walter in Courtroom 7A, 350 W. 1st St, Los Angeles, CA 90012. Lead Trial Counsel shall attend all proceedings before this Court, including the Scheduling Conference. Counsel are directed to comply with Rule 26 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 26-1 in a timely fashion and to file a Joint Report, on or before May 13, 2021. (iv) (Entered: 04/26/2021)

#6

(#6) STANDING ORDER by Judge John F. Walter. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT CONTROLS THE CASE AND DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge John F. Walter. (iv) (Entered: 04/26/2021)

#5

(#5) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap) (Entered: 04/23/2021)

#4

(#4) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge John F. Walter and Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver. (ghap) (Entered: 04/23/2021)

#3

(#3) Certification and NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Sun Life Assurance Company of Canada, identifying Sun Life Financial Inc.. (Lewitz, Matthew) (Entered: 04/23/2021)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Movant Sun Life Assurance Company of Canada. (Lewitz, Matthew) (Entered: 04/23/2021)

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) ORDER OF DISMISSAL #18 by Judge John F. Walter. The above-captioned action is dismissed pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a) with prejudice, and with each party is to bear their own attorney's fees and costs. Case Terminated. Made JS-6. (iv) (Entered: 06/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) STIPULATION to Dismiss Case pursuant to Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a) filed by Plaintiff U.S. Bank National Association. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order of Dismissal)(Zubairi, Faisal) (Entered: 06/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) ORDER TO EXTEND TIME FOR DEFENDANT TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT #16 by Judge John F. Walter. Defendant Sun Life Assurance Company of Canada's deadline to move, answer, or otherwise respond to Plaintiff U.S. Bank National Association, solely as Securities Intermediary's Complaint is hereby extended to and including June 15, 2021. (iv) (Entered: 05/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to 06/15/2021 re Complaint - (Discovery) filed by Defendant Sun Life Assurance Company of Canada. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Lewitz, Matthew) (Entered: 05/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) SCHEDULING AND CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER by Judge John F. Walter.The purpose of this Order is to notify the parties and their counsel of the deadlines and the schedule that will govern this action. Pretrial Conference set for 2/4/2022 at 8:00 AM. Hearing on Motions in Limine; DisputedJury Instructions set for 2/11/2022 at 8:00 AM. Jury Trial set for 2/22/2022 at 8:30 AM. (iv) (Entered: 05/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) ORDER VACATING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE, REFERRAL TO PRIVATE MEDIATION, and DISMISSING ANY UNSERVED DOE DEFENDANTS by Judge John F. Walter. The Court has reviewed the parties' Joint Rule 26(f) Report and finds that a Scheduling Conference is not necessary. The hearing on May 24, 2021 is vacated and taken off calendar. A Scheduling and Case Management Order will issue. Any unserved DOE defendants are dismissed at this time. The Court, having considered the parties' Request: ADR Procedure Selection, the Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program, or the report submitted by the parties pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(f) and Civil L.R. 26-1, hereby: ORDERS this case referred to: ADR PROCEDURE NO. 3: (Private mediation). The ADR proceeding is to be completed no later than: October 18, 2021. The Joint Report re: Results of Settlement Conference due on: October 25, 2021. (iv) (Entered: 05/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial Plaintiff estimates a trial of 3-5 days. Defendant estimates a trial of 5 or more days., filed by Plaintiff U.S. Bank National Association.. (Zubairi, Faisal) (Entered: 05/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff U.S. Bank National Association, (Zubairi, Faisal) (Entered: 05/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) DECLARATION of Lead Trial Counsel Regarding Compliance With Local Rules Governing Electronic Filing filed by Plaintiff U.S. Bank National Association. (Zubairi, Faisal) (Entered: 05/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER DENYING JOINT STIPULATION REQUESTING CONTINUANCE OF RULE 16(B) SCHEDULING CONFERENCE #9 by Judge John F. Walter. DENIED BY ORDER OF THE COURT. (iv) (Entered: 05/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Joint STIPULATION to Continue Rule 16(b) Scheduling Conference from May 24, 2021 to June 28, 2021 filed by Plaintiff U.S. Bank National Association. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Joint Stipulation Requesting Continuance of Rule 16(B) Scheduling Conference)(Zubairi, Faisal) (Entered: 05/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Sun Life Assurance Company of Canada answer now due 5/28/2021, re Complaint - (Discovery) filed by Defendant Sun Life Assurance Company of Canada.(Lewitz, Matthew) (Entered: 04/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) COURT ORDER by Judge John F. Walter. Counsel are hereby notified that a Scheduling Conference has been set for May 24, 2021 at 1:15 p.m. before Judge John F. Walter in Courtroom 7A, 350 W. 1st St, Los Angeles, CA 90012. Lead Trial Counsel shall attend all proceedings before this Court, including the Scheduling Conference. Counsel are directed to comply with Rule 26 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 26-1 in a timely fashion and to file a Joint Report, on or before May 13, 2021. (iv) (Entered: 04/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) STANDING ORDER by Judge John F. Walter. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT CONTROLS THE CASE AND DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge John F. Walter. (iv) (Entered: 04/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap) (Entered: 04/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge John F. Walter and Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver. (ghap) (Entered: 04/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • DocketCONFORMED FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendant Sun Life Assurance Company of Canada. Jury Demanded., filed by plaintiff U.S. Bank National Association. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 4/6/2021 SUBMITTED ATTACHED EXHIBIT A) (ghap) (Entered: 04/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Certification and NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Sun Life Assurance Company of Canada, identifying Sun Life Financial Inc.. (Lewitz, Matthew) (Entered: 04/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Movant Sun Life Assurance Company of Canada. (Lewitz, Matthew) (Entered: 04/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles County Superior Court, case number 21STCV11641 Receipt No: ACACDC-31174631 - Fee: $402, filed by Defendant Sun Life Assurance Company of Canada. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Matthew Lewitz in Support of Notice of Removal, #2 Exhibit A - State Court Summons and Complaint, #3 Exhibit B - Documentation Re Proof of Service, #4 Exhibit C - State Court Pleadings and Orders, #5 Exhibit D - State Court Notice of Removal, #6 Exhibit E - California Secretary of State Entity Detail) (Attorney Matthew Evan Lewitz added to party Sun Life Assurance Company of Canada(pty:bkmov))(Lewitz, Matthew) (Entered: 04/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Sun Life Assurance Company of Canada is a litigant

Latest cases where U.S. Bank, N.A. as Trustee for the RMAC Trust, Series 2016-CTT is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Matthew E. Lewitz