Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 08/25/2020 at 10:22:12 (UTC).

US Bank National Association v. Quartzburg Gold LP et al

Case Summary

On 06/26/2020 US Bank National Association filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Quartzburg Gold LP. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Washington Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Robert S. Lasnik. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-00993

  • Filing Date:

    06/26/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Washington Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Robert S. Lasnik

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

US Bank National Association

Defendants

Dagang Wang

Yuntian Deng

Yu Wang

Idaho State Regional Center LLC

Chunjie Li

Jindong Hu

Bin Liu

Mengjie Shi

Jun Ji

Hua Zhang

Chiung-Ming Chen

Quartzburg Gold LP

Zhao Wang

Weicheng Li

Yue Gu

Dechun Li

Weiwei Yan

Ying Lin

Jung-Ting Hsieh

2 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Shawn J Larsen-Bright

Attorney at DORSEY & WHITNEY (WA)

701 Fifth Avenue, Suite 6100

Seattle, WA 98104-7043

Jeremy Robert Larson

Attorney at DORSEY & WHITNEY (WA)

701 Fifth Avenue, Suite 6100

Seattle, WA 98104-7043

Wendy M Feng

Attorney at DORSEY & WHITNEY (WA)

701 Fifth Avenue, Suite 6100

Seattle, WA 98104-7043

Defendant Attorneys

Sean Prosser

Attorney at MINTZ LEVIN COHN FERRIS GLOVSKY & POPEO PC

3580 Carmel Mountain Rd, Ste 300

San Diego, CA 92130

Roger D Mellem

Attorney at RYAN SWANSON & CLEVELAND

1201 3Rd Ave, Ste 3400

Seattle, WA 98101-3034

Natalie Prescott

Attorney at MINTZ LEVIN COHN FERRIS GLOVSKY & POPEO PC

3580 Carmel Mountain Rd St 300

San Diego, CA 92130

Jihee Ahn

Attorney at HARRIS BRICKEN LLP (SEA)

600 Stewart St Ste 1200

Seattle, WA 98101

Daniel P Harris

Attorney at HARRIS BRICKEN LLP (SEA)

600 Stewart St Ste 1200

Seattle, WA 98101

 

Court Documents

#37

(#37) NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Jihee Ahn on behalf of Defendants Yun Huang, Ying Lin. (Ahn, Jihee) (Entered: 08/21/2020)

#36

(#36) NOTICE that the following is RE-NOTED: #25 MOTION for Leave to Deposit Interpleader Funds. Filed by Plaintiff US Bank National Association. Noting Date 9/4/2020, (Larsen-Bright, Shawn) (Entered: 08/18/2020)

#35

(#35) AMENDED ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES, JOINT STATUS REPORT AND EARLY SETTLEMENT Joint Status Report due by 10/16/2020, by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (KERR) (Entered: 08/18/2020)

#34

(#34) ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES, JOINT STATUS REPORT AND EARLY SETTLEMENT Joint Status Report due by 9/1/2020, by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (KERR) (Entered: 08/04/2020)

#32

(#32) APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Natalie Prescott FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendants Idaho State Regional Center LLC, Quartzburg Gold LP (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-6502122 (Mellem, Roger) (Entered: 07/31/2020)

#31

(#31) APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Sean Prosser FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendants Idaho State Regional Center LLC, Quartzburg Gold LP (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-6502104 (Mellem, Roger) (Entered: 07/31/2020)

#30

(#30) PRAECIPE re #29 Notice of Motion Re-Noted by Plaintiff US Bank National Association (Attachments: #1 Notice of Re-Noting Motion)(Larsen-Bright, Shawn) (Entered: 07/29/2020)

25 #1

Proposed Order Granting Motion for Leave to Deposit Interpleader Funds

#25

(#29) NOTICE that the following is RE-NOTED: #25 MOTION for Leave to Deposit Interpleader Funds. Filed by Plaintiff US Bank National Association. Noting Date 8/21/2020, (Larsen-Bright, Shawn) (Entered: 07/29/2020)

#6

(#6) PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS re #1 Complaint, Summons to Dechun LI by Plaintiff US Bank National Association (Larsen-Bright, Shawn) (Entered: 06/26/2020)

#5

(#5) PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS re #1 Complaint, Summons to Dagang WANG by Plaintiff US Bank National Association (Larsen-Bright, Shawn) (Entered: 06/26/2020)

#4

(#4) PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS re #1 Complaint, Summons to Chunjie LI by Plaintiff U.S. Bank (Larsen-Bright, Shawn) (Entered: 06/26/2020)

#3

(#3) PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS re #1 Complaint, Summons to Chiung-Ming CHEN by Plaintiff U.S. Bank (Larsen-Bright, Shawn) (Entered: 06/26/2020)

#2

(#2) PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS re #1 Complaint, Summons to Bin LIU by Plaintiff U.S. Bank (Larsen-Bright, Shawn) (Entered: 06/26/2020)

1 #3

Exhibit B

1 #2

Exhibit A

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#10) PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS re #1 Complaint, Jindong Hu by Plaintiff US Bank National Association (Larsen-Bright, Shawn) (Entered: 06/26/2020)

53 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAttorney Daniel P Harris added for Yun Huang, Ying Lin; per #37 Notice of Appearance. (MW) (Entered: 08/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#37) NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Jihee Ahn on behalf of Defendants Yun Huang, Ying Lin. (Ahn, Jihee) (Entered: 08/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#36) NOTICE that the following is RE-NOTED: #25 MOTION for Leave to Deposit Interpleader Funds. Filed by Plaintiff US Bank National Association. Noting Date 9/4/2020, (Larsen-Bright, Shawn) (Entered: 08/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#35) AMENDED ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES, JOINT STATUS REPORT AND EARLY SETTLEMENT Joint Status Report due by 10/16/2020, by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (KERR) (Entered: 08/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#34) ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES, JOINT STATUS REPORT AND EARLY SETTLEMENT Joint Status Report due by 9/1/2020, by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (KERR) (Entered: 08/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#33) ORDER re #32 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Natalie Prescott for Interpleader Defendants Idaho State Regional Center LLC, and for Quartzburg Gold LP, by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS) (Entered: 08/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#32) APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Natalie Prescott FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendants Idaho State Regional Center LLC, Quartzburg Gold LP (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-6502122 (Mellem, Roger) (Entered: 07/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#31) APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Sean Prosser FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendants Idaho State Regional Center LLC, Quartzburg Gold LP (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-6502104 (Mellem, Roger) (Entered: 07/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#30) PRAECIPE re #29 Notice of Motion Re-Noted by Plaintiff US Bank National Association (Attachments: #1 Notice of Re-Noting Motion)(Larsen-Bright, Shawn) (Entered: 07/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#29) NOTICE that the following is RE-NOTED: #25 MOTION for Leave to Deposit Interpleader Funds. Filed by Plaintiff US Bank National Association. Noting Date 8/21/2020, (Larsen-Bright, Shawn) (Entered: 07/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
21 More Docket Entries
  • 06/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS re #1 Complaint, Jindong Hu by Plaintiff US Bank National Association (Larsen-Bright, Shawn) (Entered: 06/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS re #1 Complaint, Idaho State Regional Center, LLC by Plaintiff US Bank National Association (Larsen-Bright, Shawn) (Entered: 06/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS re #1 Complaint, Summons to Hua Zhang by Plaintiff US Bank National Association (Larsen-Bright, Shawn) (Entered: 06/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS re #1 Complaint, Summons to Feibing Zhu by Plaintiff US Bank National Association (Larsen-Bright, Shawn) (Entered: 06/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS re #1 Complaint, Summons to Dechun LI by Plaintiff US Bank National Association (Larsen-Bright, Shawn) (Entered: 06/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS re #1 Complaint, Summons to Dagang WANG by Plaintiff US Bank National Association (Larsen-Bright, Shawn) (Entered: 06/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS re #1 Complaint, Summons to Chunjie LI by Plaintiff U.S. Bank (Larsen-Bright, Shawn) (Entered: 06/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS re #1 Complaint, Summons to Chiung-Ming CHEN by Plaintiff U.S. Bank (Larsen-Bright, Shawn) (Entered: 06/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS re #1 Complaint, Summons to Bin LIU by Plaintiff U.S. Bank (Larsen-Bright, Shawn) (Entered: 06/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT In Interpleader against All Defendants (Receipt # AWAWDC-6427210) Attorney Shawn J Larsen-Bright added to party U.S. Bank(pty:pla), filed by U.S. Bank. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B)(Larsen-Bright, Shawn) (Entered: 06/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where U.S. Bank, N.A. as Trustee for the RMAC Trust, Series 2016-CTT is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jeremy Robert Larson

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Shawn J Larsen-Bright