Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 11/02/2019 at 07:58:52 (UTC).

US Bank National Association v. Nordberg et al

Case Summary

On 09/03/2019 US Bank National Association filed a Property - Other Eviction lawsuit against Nordberg. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Utah District. The Judges overseeing this case are Howard C. Nielson, Jr and Evelyn J. Furse. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-00611

  • Filing Date:

    09/03/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Eviction

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Utah District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Howard C. Nielson, Jr

Referral Judge

Evelyn J. Furse

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

US Bank National Association

Defendants

Louis Monson

Draper, UT 84020

Peter Nordberg

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Tyler S. Wirick

Attorney at ALDRIDGE PITE LLP

374 E 720 S

Orem, UT 84058

 

Court Documents

#10

(#10) NOTICE OF TRANSMITTAL that case has been transferred to Third District Court - Salt Lake via mail Remand order an docket sheet sent for case number 190901006. (las) (Entered: 11/01/2019)

#9

(#9) MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER granting #7 Motion to Remand to State Court. Signed by Judge Howard C. Nielson, Jr. on 10/31/2019. (las) (Entered: 11/01/2019)

8 #1

Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order

#8

(#8) REQUEST to Submit for Decision re #7 MOTION to Remand to State Court 3rd Judicial Court, Salt Lake City, Utah and Memorandum in Support filed by Plaintiff US Bank National Association. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Wirick, Tyler) (Entered: 10/24/2019)

#7

(#7) MOTION to Remand to State Court 3rd Judicial Court, Salt Lake City, Utah and Memorandum in Support filed by Plaintiff US Bank National Association. (Wirick, Tyler) (Entered: 09/17/2019)

#6

(#6) ORDER TO PROPOSE SCHEDULE - Plaintiff must propose a schedule to defendant in the form of a draft Attorney Planning Meeting Report within twenty-one (21) days. See order for additional instructions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse on 9/12/2019. (las) (Entered: 09/12/2019)

#4

(#4) NOTICE OF ADR, e-mailed or mailed to Defendant Louis Monson, Plaintiff US Bank National Association. (nl) (Entered: 09/09/2019)

3 #4

Civil Cover Sheet 1

3 #3

Exhibit 3-State Complaint

3 #2

Exhibit 2-State Notice of Removal

3 #1

Exhibit 1-KSL Listing

#3

(#3) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 3rd District Court, Salt Lake County, case number 190901006. filed by Louis Monson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-KSL Listing, #2 Exhibit 2-State Notice of Removal, #3 Exhibit 3-State Complaint, #4 Civil Cover Sheet 1) Assigned to Judge Howard C. Nielson, Jr. (nl) (Entered: 09/09/2019)

#2

(#2) ORDER granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul M. Warner on 9/4/2019. (nl) Modified on 9/9/2019 to correct filing date to 9/5/2019 (nl). (Entered: 09/09/2019)

#1

DOCUMENT UNAVAILABLE

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) NOTICE OF TRANSMITTAL that case has been transferred to Third District Court - Salt Lake via mail Remand order an docket sheet sent for case number 190901006. (las) (Entered: 11/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER granting #7 Motion to Remand to State Court. Signed by Judge Howard C. Nielson, Jr. on 10/31/2019. (las) (Entered: 11/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) REQUEST to Submit for Decision re #7 MOTION to Remand to State Court 3rd Judicial Court, Salt Lake City, Utah and Memorandum in Support filed by Plaintiff US Bank National Association. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Wirick, Tyler) (Entered: 10/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) MOTION to Remand to State Court 3rd Judicial Court, Salt Lake City, Utah and Memorandum in Support filed by Plaintiff US Bank National Association. (Wirick, Tyler) (Entered: 09/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ORDER TO PROPOSE SCHEDULE - Plaintiff must propose a schedule to defendant in the form of a draft Attorney Planning Meeting Report within twenty-one (21) days. See order for additional instructions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse on 9/12/2019. (las) (Entered: 09/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2019
  • (#5) ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse under 28:636 (b)(1)(A), Magistrate to hear and determine all nondispositive pretrial matters. No attached document. Signed by Judge Howard C. Nielson, Jr. on 9/11/2019. (las) (Entered: 09/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE OF ADR, e-mailed or mailed to Defendant Louis Monson, Plaintiff US Bank National Association. (nl) (Entered: 09/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 3rd District Court, Salt Lake County, case number 190901006. filed by Louis Monson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-KSL Listing, #2 Exhibit 2-State Notice of Removal, #3 Exhibit 3-State Complaint, #4 Civil Cover Sheet 1) Assigned to Judge Howard C. Nielson, Jr. (nl) (Entered: 09/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) ORDER granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul M. Warner on 9/4/2019. (nl) Modified on 9/9/2019 to correct filing date to 9/5/2019 (nl). (Entered: 09/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) **SEALED DOCUMENT** MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Assigned to Magistrate Judge Paul M. Warner for review, case file forwarded to Magistrate Judge. (Received by the court on: 9/3/2019) filed by Defendant Louis Monson. (nl) (Entered: 09/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where U.S. Bank, N.A. as Trustee for the RMAC Trust, Series 2016-CTT is a litigant