Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 11/17/2020 at 10:28:44 (UTC).

US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION v. MICHAUD et al

Case Summary

On 09/18/2020 US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against MICHAUD. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Maine District. The Judges overseeing this case are JOHN H. RICH III and JON D. LEVY. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-00330

  • Filing Date:

    09/18/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Maine District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

JOHN H. RICH III

Presiding Judge

JON D. LEVY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION

Defendants

RICKY W MICHAUD

KERRI A MICHAUD

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

JOHN A. DOONAN

Attorney at DOONAN, GRAVES & LONGORIA LLC

100 Cummings Center, Suite 225D

Beverly, MA 01915

RENEAU J. LONGORIA

Attorney at DOONAN, GRAVES & LONGORIA LLC

100 Cummings Center, Suite 225D

Beverly, MA 01915

 

Court Documents

#6

(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION. KERRI A MICHAUD served on 9/28/2020. (LONGORIA, RENEAU) Modified on 10/2/2020 to correct served on date from 9/23 to 9/28 (aks). (Entered: 10/01/2020)

#5

(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION. RICKY W MICHAUD served on 9/28/2020. (LONGORIA, RENEAU) Modified on 10/2/2020 to correct served on date from 9/23 to 9/28 (aks). (Entered: 10/01/2020)

#4

(#4) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION. (LONGORIA, RENEAU) (Entered: 09/21/2020)

3 #1

Ricky W. Michaud summons

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to KERRI A MICHAUD, RICKY W MICHAUD. Counsel shall print the embossed summons and effect service in the manner in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4. Note-If you are using Version 6 of Adobe Acrobat, be sure the PRINT WHAT field is set to DOCUMENTS AND COMMENTS (Click File, then Print to check this setting). (Attachments: #1 Ricky W. Michaud summons)(bfa) (Entered: 09/21/2020)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET. (bfa) (Entered: 09/21/2020)

1 #12

Exhibit L - Military Affidavit

1 #11

Exhibit K - Demand Letters

1 #10

Exhibit J - Confirmatory Assignment into US Bank

1 #9

Exhibit I - Assignment into OSAT Sponsor

1 #8

Exhibit H - Assignment into Ocwen

1 #7

Exhibit G - Assignment into US Bank

1 #6

Exhibit F Assignment into FHLMC

1 #5

Exhibit E - Quitclaim Assignment into Ocwen

1 #4

Exhibit D Assignment into Ocwen

1 #3

Exhibit C - Mortgage

1 #2

Exhibit B - Endorsed Note

1 #1

Exhibit A - Legal Description

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/20/2020
  • DocketSet Deadlines : Check for Filing of a Motion for Default on 11/18/2020 as to RICKY W MICHAUD and KERRI A MICHAUD. (aks) (Entered: 10/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Docket Entry Modification regarding #6 Summons Returned Executed, #5 Summons Returned Executed : These entries have been modified to correct served on date from 9/23 to 9/28. (aks) (Entered: 10/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2020
  • DocketSet Answer Deadline for RICKY W MICHAUD and KERRI A MICHAUD : Answer due by 10/19/2020. (aks) (Entered: 10/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION. KERRI A MICHAUD served on 9/28/2020. (LONGORIA, RENEAU) Modified on 10/2/2020 to correct served on date from 9/23 to 9/28 (aks). (Entered: 10/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION. RICKY W MICHAUD served on 9/28/2020. (LONGORIA, RENEAU) Modified on 10/2/2020 to correct served on date from 9/23 to 9/28 (aks). (Entered: 10/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION. (LONGORIA, RENEAU) (Entered: 09/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketFiling Fee Paid via Credit Card ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AMEDC-2321111.), filed by US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION.(LONGORIA, RENEAU) (Entered: 09/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to KERRI A MICHAUD, RICKY W MICHAUD. Counsel shall print the embossed summons and effect service in the manner in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4. Note-If you are using Version 6 of Adobe Acrobat, be sure the PRINT WHAT field is set to DOCUMENTS AND COMMENTS (Click File, then Print to check this setting). (Attachments: #1 Ricky W. Michaud summons)(bfa) (Entered: 09/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET. (bfa) (Entered: 09/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against KERRI A MICHAUD, RICKY W MICHAUD PAYMENT OF FILING FEE DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS. IF FILING FEE IS BEING PAID WITH A CREDIT CARD COUNSEL ARE INSTRUCTED TO LOGIN TO CMECF AND DOCKET Case Opening Filing Fee Paid FOUND IN THE Complaints and Other Initiating Documents CATEGORY. CHECK PAYMENTS DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS., filed by US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION. (Service of Process Deadline 12/17/2020) Fee due by 9/21/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Legal Description, #2 Exhibit B - Endorsed Note, #3 Exhibit C - Mortgage, #4 Exhibit D Assignment into Ocwen, #5 Exhibit E - Quitclaim Assignment into Ocwen, #6 Exhibit F Assignment into FHLMC, #7 Exhibit G - Assignment into US Bank, #8 Exhibit H - Assignment into Ocwen, #9 Exhibit I - Assignment into OSAT Sponsor, #10 Exhibit J - Confirmatory Assignment into US Bank, #11 Exhibit K - Demand Letters, #12 Exhibit L - Military Affidavit)(bfa) (Entered: 09/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where U.S. Bank, N.A. as Trustee for the RMAC Trust, Series 2016-CTT is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer RENEAU J. LONGORIA

Latest cases represented by Lawyer JOHN A. DOONAN