This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/28/2020 at 08:31:25 (UTC).

U.S. Bank National Association v. Mayflower Emerald Square, LLC

Case Summary

On 10/29/2020 U S Bank National Association filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against Mayflower Emerald Square, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Massachusetts District. The Judge overseeing this case is Patti B. Saris. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-11946

  • Filing Date:

    10/29/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Patti B. Saris

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

U.S. Bank National Association

Defendant

Mayflower Emerald Square, LLC

Receiver

Gregory T. Maloney

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Armando E Batastini

Attorney at Nixon Peabody LLP

One Citizens Plaza

Providence, RI 02903

Receiver Attorneys

L. Alexandra Hogan

Attorney at Sabella Hogan, P.C.

1350 Main Street, Suite 214

Springfield, MA 01103

Edward V. Sabella

Attorney at Sabella Hogan, P.C.

1350 Main Street, Suite 214

Springfield, MA 01103

 

Court Documents

16 #1

Certificate of Service

#16

(#16) STATUS REPORT November 2020 Management Report by Gregory T. Maloney. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Hogan, L.) (Entered: 12/18/2020)

#15

(#15) Judge Patti B. Saris: AMENDED ORDER APPOINTING RECEIVER entered. (Baker, Casey) (Entered: 11/18/2020)

#14

(#14) Proposed Document(s) submitted by U.S. Bank National Association. Document received: [Proposed] Amended Order Appointing Receiver. (Batastini, Armando) (Entered: 11/17/2020)

#12

(#12) Assented to MOTION to Amend #10 Order (Assented to Joint Motion to Amend Receivership Order) by U.S. Bank National Association.(Batastini, Armando) (Entered: 11/17/2020)

#11

(#11) SUMMONS Returned Executed Mayflower Emerald Square, LLC served on 11/3/2020, answer due 11/24/2020. (Batastini, Armando) (Entered: 11/06/2020)

#10

(#10) Judge Patti B. Saris: ORDER APPOINTING RECEIVER entered. (Baker, Casey) (Entered: 11/05/2020)

#9

(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by L. Alexandra Hogan on behalf of Gregory T. Maloney (Hogan, L.) (Entered: 11/04/2020)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Edward V. Sabella on behalf of Gregory T. Maloney (Sabella, Edward) (Entered: 11/04/2020)

#6

(#6) MEMORANDUM in Support re #5 Assented to MOTION to Appoint Receiver filed by U.S. Bank National Association. (Batastini, Armando) (Entered: 10/30/2020)

5 #1

Exhibit A, Proposed Order

#5

(#5) Assented to MOTION to Appoint Receiver by U.S. Bank National Association. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, Proposed Order)(Batastini, Armando) (Entered: 10/30/2020)

#4

(#4) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by U.S. Bank National Association identifying Corporate Parent U.S. Bancorp. for U.S. Bank National Association.. (Batastini, Armando) (Entered: 10/30/2020)

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to Mayflower Emerald Square, LLC. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Baker, Casey) (Entered: 10/29/2020)

1 #8

Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet

1 #7

Exhibit E, Document

1 #5

Exhibit D-1, Document

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT (Verified) against Mayflower Emerald Square, LLC Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-8486359 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by U.S. Bank National Association, as Trustee for the benefit of the registered holders of COMM 2012-CCRE3 Mortgage Pass-Through Certificates. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, Document, #2 Exhibit B-1, Document, #3 Exhibit B-2, Document, #4 Exhibit C, Document, #5 Exhibit D-1, Document, #6 Exhibit D-2, Document, #7 Exhibit E, Document, #8 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #9 Category Sheet, #10 Summons)(Batastini, Armando) (Entered: 10/29/2020)

16 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) STATUS REPORT November 2020 Management Report by Gregory T. Maloney. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Hogan, L.) (Entered: 12/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) Judge Patti B. Saris: AMENDED ORDER APPOINTING RECEIVER entered. (Baker, Casey) (Entered: 11/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) Proposed Document(s) submitted by U.S. Bank National Association. Document received: [Proposed] Amended Order Appointing Receiver. (Batastini, Armando) (Entered: 11/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Judge Patti B. Saris: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #12 Motion to Amend. "Allowed. Parties shall submit a Proposed Amended Order Appointing Receiver by 11/20/2020." (Baker, Casey) (Entered: 11/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Assented to MOTION to Amend #10 Order (Assented to Joint Motion to Amend Receivership Order) by U.S. Bank National Association.(Batastini, Armando) (Entered: 11/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) SUMMONS Returned Executed Mayflower Emerald Square, LLC served on 11/3/2020, answer due 11/24/2020. (Batastini, Armando) (Entered: 11/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Judge Patti B. Saris: ORDER APPOINTING RECEIVER entered. (Baker, Casey) (Entered: 11/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by L. Alexandra Hogan on behalf of Gregory T. Maloney (Hogan, L.) (Entered: 11/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Edward V. Sabella on behalf of Gregory T. Maloney (Sabella, Edward) (Entered: 11/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Judge Patti B. Saris: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #5 Motion to Appoint Receiver. Gregory T. Maloney appointed. (Baker, Casey) (Entered: 11/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MEMORANDUM in Support re #5 Assented to MOTION to Appoint Receiver filed by U.S. Bank National Association. (Batastini, Armando) (Entered: 10/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Assented to MOTION to Appoint Receiver by U.S. Bank National Association. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, Proposed Order)(Batastini, Armando) (Entered: 10/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by U.S. Bank National Association identifying Corporate Parent U.S. Bancorp. for U.S. Bank National Association.. (Batastini, Armando) (Entered: 10/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to Mayflower Emerald Square, LLC. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Baker, Casey) (Entered: 10/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • Docket(#2) ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Patti B. Saris assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell. (Finn, Mary) (Entered: 10/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT (Verified) against Mayflower Emerald Square, LLC Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-8486359 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by U.S. Bank National Association, as Trustee for the benefit of the registered holders of COMM 2012-CCRE3 Mortgage Pass-Through Certificates. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, Document, #2 Exhibit B-1, Document, #3 Exhibit B-2, Document, #4 Exhibit C, Document, #5 Exhibit D-1, Document, #6 Exhibit D-2, Document, #7 Exhibit E, Document, #8 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #9 Category Sheet, #10 Summons)(Batastini, Armando) (Entered: 10/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where U.S. Bank, N.A. as Trustee for the RMAC Trust, Series 2016-CTT is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Lisa A. Hogan