Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 09/12/2020 at 12:48:30 (UTC).

U.S. Bank National Association v. Krondes

Case Summary

On 07/14/2020 U S Bank National Association filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Krondes. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Shaniek M. Maynard and Donald M. Middlebrooks. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-14239

  • Filing Date:

    07/14/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Florida Southern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Shaniek M. Maynard

Presiding Judge

Donald M. Middlebrooks

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

U.S. Bank National Association

Defendant

John Krondes

Darien, CT 06820

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Richard Slaughter McIver

1505 N. Florida Ave.

Tampa, FL 33602

 

Court Documents

#14

(#14) Memorandum in Opposition re #6 MOTION to Remand to State Court and for Sanctions filed by John Krondes. (not signed) Replies due by 9/18/2020. (cqs) (Entered: 09/11/2020)

#13

(#13) ORDER Granting in Part #11 Motion for Reconsideration ; Granting in Part #11 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Motion ( Responses due by 9/11/2020). Re: #6 MOTION to Remand to State Court and for Sanctions filed by U.S. Bank National Association. Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 8/27/2020. See attached document for full details. (cds) (Entered: 08/27/2020)

#12

(#12) AFFIDAVIT (Statement of Facts Concerning Lack of Service) signed by: John J. Krondes re #6 MOTION to Remand to State Court and for Sanctions by John Krondes (cds) (Entered: 08/12/2020)

#11

(#11) MOTION for Modification re 10 Paperless Order, and Request for Extension of Time to File Response re #6 MOTION to Remand to State Court and for Sanctions by John Krondes. (cds) (Entered: 08/12/2020)

#9

(#9) MEMORANDUM of Law in Support of re #8 Jury Demand by John Krondes. (cds) (Entered: 08/05/2020)

#8

(#8) DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL by John Krondes (cds) (Entered: 07/23/2020)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Exacerbated Covid-19 Crisis in Florida by John Krondes (cds) (Entered: 07/23/2020)

#6

(#6) MOTION to Remand to State Court and for Sanctions by U.S. Bank National Association. (McIver, Richard) (Entered: 07/22/2020)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Richard Slaughter McIver on behalf of U.S. Bank National Association. Attorney Richard Slaughter McIver added to party U.S. Bank National Association(pty:pla). (McIver, Richard) (Entered: 07/22/2020)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Consent to Removal and Constitutional Right to Removal by John Krondes (cds) (Entered: 07/20/2020)

#3

(#3) Clerks Notice of Receipt of Filing Fee received on 7/14/2020 in the amount of $ 400.00, receipt number FLS000013173. (drz) (Entered: 07/14/2020)

1 #2

Exhibit

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL (STATE COURT COMPLAINT ) Filing fee $400.00 paid, filed by John Krondes. (State court documents were provided, see exhibit 1-2 ) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit)(drz) Modified on 7/15/2020 (drz). (Entered: 07/14/2020)

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) Memorandum in Opposition re #6 MOTION to Remand to State Court and for Sanctions filed by John Krondes. (not signed) Replies due by 9/18/2020. (cqs) (Entered: 09/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ORDER Granting in Part #11 Motion for Reconsideration ; Granting in Part #11 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Motion ( Responses due by 9/11/2020). Re: #6 MOTION to Remand to State Court and for Sanctions filed by U.S. Bank National Association. Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 8/27/2020. See attached document for full details. (cds) (Entered: 08/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) AFFIDAVIT (Statement of Facts Concerning Lack of Service) signed by: John J. Krondes re #6 MOTION to Remand to State Court and for Sanctions by John Krondes (cds) (Entered: 08/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) MOTION for Modification re 10 Paperless Order, and Request for Extension of Time to File Response re #6 MOTION to Remand to State Court and for Sanctions by John Krondes. (cds) (Entered: 08/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2020
  • DocketReset Deadlines Per DE#10. Responses due by 8/12/2020 (cqs) (Entered: 08/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) PAPERLESS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. On July 22, 2020, Plaintiff filed a Motion to Remand. (DE #6 ). The deadline to respond has since passed, and Defendant has failed to file a response. Accordingly, Defendant shall respond to Plaintiff's Motion on or before August 12, 2020. Failure to timely comply with this order will result in Plaintiff's Motion being decided without a respond. Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 8/7/2020. (gts) (Entered: 08/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MEMORANDUM of Law in Support of re #8 Jury Demand by John Krondes. (cds) (Entered: 08/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL by John Krondes (cds) (Entered: 07/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Exacerbated Covid-19 Crisis in Florida by John Krondes (cds) (Entered: 07/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION to Remand to State Court and for Sanctions by U.S. Bank National Association. (McIver, Richard) (Entered: 07/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Richard Slaughter McIver on behalf of U.S. Bank National Association. Attorney Richard Slaughter McIver added to party U.S. Bank National Association(pty:pla). (McIver, Richard) (Entered: 07/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Consent to Removal and Constitutional Right to Removal by John Krondes (cds) (Entered: 07/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Clerks Notice of Receipt of Filing Fee received on 7/14/2020 in the amount of $ 400.00, receipt number FLS000013173. (drz) (Entered: 07/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2020
  • Docket(#2) Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks and Magistrate Judge Shaniek M. Maynard. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Shaniek M. Maynard is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (drz) (Entered: 07/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL (STATE COURT COMPLAINT ) Filing fee $400.00 paid, filed by John Krondes. (State court documents were provided, see exhibit 1-2 ) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit)(drz) Modified on 7/15/2020 (drz). (Entered: 07/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where U.S. Bank, N.A. as Trustee for the RMAC Trust, Series 2016-CTT is a litigant