This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/21/2020 at 00:33:45 (UTC).

U.S. Bank National Association v. Goldman Sachs Mortgage Company et al

Case Summary

On 03/14/2019 U S Bank National Association filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Goldman Sachs Mortgage Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Alison J. Nathan. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-02305

  • Filing Date:

    03/14/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Alison J. Nathan

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

U.S. Bank National Association

Defendants

GS Mortgage Securities Corp.

Goldman Sachs Mortgage Company L.P.

Amicus Curiae

Robert Hockett

Robert Bartlett

John Crawford

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Zachary William Mazin

Attorney at McKool Smith, P.C.

One Manhattan West, 395 9Th Avenue, 50Th Floor

New York, NY 10001-8603

Michael Charles McCarthy

Attorney at Maslon LLP

3300 Wells Fargo Center, 90 South Seventh Street

Minneapolis, MN 55402

Gayle Rosenstein Klein

Attorney at McKool Smith, P.C.

One Manhattan West, 395 9Th Avenue, 50Th Floor

New York, NY 10001-8603

Christopher Paul Johnson

Attorney at McKool Smith, P.C.

One Manhattan West, 395 9Th Avenue, 50Th Floor

New York, NY 10001-8603

Jared Solomon Siegel

Attorney at McKool Smith, P.C.

One Manhattan West, 395 9Th Avenue, 50Th Floor

New York, NY 10001-8603

Defendant Attorneys

Richard Andre Jacobsen, Jr.

Attorney at Orrick, Herrington & Sutcliffe LLP

666 Fifth Avenue

New York, NY 10103

David Litterine-Kaufman

Attorney at Orrick, Herrington & Sutcliffe LLP (NYC)

51 West 52Nd Street

New York, NY 10019

Daniel Adam Rubens

Attorney at Orrick, Herrington & Sutcliffe LLP (NYC)

51 West 52Nd Street

New York, NY 10019

Thomas Nill Kidera

Attorney at Orrick, Herrington & Sutcliffe LLP (NYC)

51 West 52Nd Street

New York, NY 10019

Amicus Curiae Attorney

John Marquez Lundin

Attorney at Schlam Stone & Dolan LLP

26 Broadway

New York, NY 10004

 

Court Documents

#71

#60

#70

#69

#68

67 #1

Exhibit 1 - Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Regarding Expert Disclosure Protoco

#67

#66

#65

#64

#63

#61

#59

#58

#57

56 #2

B Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Regarding the Format of Document Production

56 #1

A Proposed Protective Order

112 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#71) ORDER. In light of the various stipulations and pending motions to dismiss in these matters, the conference currently scheduled for July 24, 2020 is hereby adjourned sine die. SO ORDERED. The following hearing(s) was terminated: Initial Conference. (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 7/15/2020). (rjm) (Entered: 07/15/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#70) STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING BRIEFING OF DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS. IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED among all Parties, by their undersigned counsel, as follows: 1. The Parties' briefs and supporting papers regarding Defendants' motion to dismiss in GSAMP 2007-HE1 (GSAMP 2007-HE1 Dkt. Nos. 32-33, 40-41, and 43) shall be deemed as filed in this Action and the arguments therein shall be deemed to also address the allegations in Plaintiff's complaint in this Action. 2. Any further motion to dismiss briefing in this Action shall be by letter brief and Defendants will only make arguments not raised in the GSAMP 2007-HE1 motion to dismiss briefing. Any such letter briefing shall be subject to the following page limits: a. Defendants' opening letter brief shall not exceed five pages; b. Plaintiff's opposition to Defendants' letter brief shall not exceed five pages, and c. Defendants' reply letter brief shall not exceed three pages. 3. Nothing in this Stipulation and Order shall affect the deadline for a party to file any of the briefs referenced in paragraph 2 or any other deadlines in this Action or in GSAMP 2007-HE1. So ordered. (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 7/9/2020) (rjm). (Entered: 07/10/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#69) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by David Litterine-Kaufman on behalf of GS Mortgage Securities Corp., Goldman Sachs Mortgage Company L.P...(Litterine-Kaufman, David) (Entered: 07/08/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#68) STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING EXPERT DISCLOSURE PROTOCOL. NOW, THEREFORE, the undersigned hereby stipulate and agree to the following provisions relating to reports, disclosures and discovery with respect to Experts in this action: Limits on Disclosure. Notwithstanding Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(2)(B), 26(b)(4) or any other potentially applicable law, statute, regulation or rule, the parties shall not be required to disclose, produce in discovery or at any trial, or log on their respective privilege logs any of the following documents or information (the "Excluded Information"): drafts of any report, studies, work papers, affidavit, declaration, written testimony, exhibit or disclosure prepared by or at the direction of the Expert, counsel or other agent of the party proffering the Expert, or others working under the supervision of or on behalf of the Expert in connection with this action or any other matter, regardless of the form in which such information is recorded, and as further specified in this Stipulation and Order regarding Expert Disclosure Protocol. So ordered. Motions terminated: #67 JOINT LETTER MOTION for Discovery Requesting that the Court Enter the Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Regarding Expert Disclosure Protocol addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from Christopher P. Johnson dated June 30, 2020. Document filed by U.S. Bank National Association. (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 7/8/2020) (rjm) (Entered: 07/08/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#67) JOINT LETTER MOTION for Discovery Requesting that the Court Enter the Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Regarding Expert Disclosure Protocol addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from Christopher P. Johnson dated June 30, 2020. Document filed by U.S. Bank National Association. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Regarding Expert Disclosure Protocol).(Johnson, Christopher) (Entered: 06/30/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#66) FED. R. CIV. P. 26(d)(1) STIPULATION PERMITTING IMMEDIATE LOAN DOCUMENT DISCOVERY. IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED among all parties, by their undersigned counsel, as follows: For purposes of this stipulation, the "Limited Discovery Period" shall last from the date hereof until: a. the date that the Court resolves Defendants' contemplated motion to dismiss the action in its entirety; or b. if the only basis in such motion for dismissing this action in its entirety is the "depositor consent" language in Section 2.07 of the GSAMP Trust 2007-HE2 Pooling and Servicing Agreement, the date that the Court resolves the motion to dismiss in U.S. Bank National Association, as Trustee for GSAMP Trust 2007-HE1 v. Goldman Sachs Mortgage Company, L.P. and GS Mortgage Securities Corp., No: 19-cv-02305. The parties may immediately commence discovery, but, during the Limited Discovery Period, shall limit such discovery to i) an exchange of Rule 26 initial disclosures, and as further specified and set forth in this FED. R. CIV. P. 26(d)(1) STIPULATION PERMITTING IMMEDIATE LOAN DOCUMENT DISCOVERY. So ordered. (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 6/24/2020) (rjm) (Entered: 06/25/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#65) ORDER granting #64 LETTER MOTION for Conference re: 20 Memo Endorsement, Requesting a Telephonic Status Conference and Advising of Order in Minnesota Trust Instruction Proceeding. An initial pre-trial conference in 19-cv-2307 is hereby scheduled for July 24, 2020 at 3:15 p.m. One week in advance of the conference the parties should provide the joint letter and proposed case management plan described the Court's order of April 15, 2019. See Dkt. No. 12. Any outstanding issues in 19-cv-2305 may also be addressed at that conference. SO ORDERED. Initial Conference set for 7/24/2020 at 03:15 PM before Judge Alison J. Nathan. (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 6/8/2020) (jca) (Entered: 06/08/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#64) LETTER MOTION for Conference re: #20 Memo Endorsement, Set Deadlines/Hearings,,,,,, Requesting a Telephonic Status Conference and Advising of Order in Minnesota Trust Instruction Proceeding addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from Christopher P. Johnson dated May 28, 2020. Document filed by U.S. Bank National Association..(Johnson, Christopher) (Entered: 05/28/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#63) SUPPLEMENTAL RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent U.S. Bancorp for U.S. Bank National Association. Document filed by U.S. Bank National Association..(Johnson, Christopher) (Entered: 05/19/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2020
  • Docket(#62) SUPPLEMENTAL RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent U.S. Bancorp for U.S. Bank National Association. Document filed by U.S. Bank National Association..(Johnson, Christopher) (Entered: 04/28/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
64 More Docket Entries
  • 03/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Notice to Plaintiff of Removal and Notice of Removal served on U.S. Bank National Association, as Trustee for GSAMP Trust 2007-HE1 on March 14, 2019. Service was accepted by McKool Smith, PC. Service was made by Mail and Email. Document filed by GS Mortgage Securities Corp., Goldman Sachs Mortgage Company. (Attachments: #1 Notice to Plaintiff of Removal)(Kidera, Thomas) (Entered: 03/15/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Thomas Nill Kidera on behalf of GS Mortgage Securities Corp., Goldman Sachs Mortgage Company. (Kidera, Thomas) (Entered: 03/15/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2019
  • DocketCase Designated ECF. (pc) (Entered: 03/15/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2019
  • DocketMagistrate Judge Kevin Nathaniel Fox is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (pc) (Entered: 03/15/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2019
  • DocketCASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Alison J. Nathan. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (pc) (Entered: 03/15/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2019
  • Docket***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Richard Andre Jacobsen, Jr.. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Dollar Demand blank;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Dollar Demand has been modified to $500,000;. (pc) (Entered: 03/15/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2019
  • Docket***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Richard Andre Jacobsen, Jr.. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: U.S. Bank National Association, as Trustee for GSAMP TRUST 2007-HE1. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party text was omitted;. (pc) (Entered: 03/15/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent The Goldman Sachs Group, Inc. for GS Mortgage Securities Corp., Goldman Sachs Mortgage Company. Document filed by GS Mortgage Securities Corp., Goldman Sachs Mortgage Company.(Jacobsen, Richard) (Entered: 03/14/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Jacobsen, Richard) (Entered: 03/14/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court, County of New York. Case Number: 650992/2019. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-16496042).Document filed by GS Mortgage Securities Corp., Goldman Sachs Mortgage Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Summons with Notice)(Jacobsen, Richard) (Entered: 03/14/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less