This case was last updated from PACER on 08/21/2021 at 08:47:20 (UTC).

U.S. Bank, National Association, as Trustee for Adjustable Rate Mortgage Trust 2005-4, Adjustable Rate Mortgage-Backed Pass-Through Certificates, Series 2005-4 v. Fidelity National Title Group, Inc et al

Case Summary

On 06/22/2021 U S Bank, National Association, as Trustee for Adjustable Rate Mortgage Trust 2005-4, Adjustable Rate Mortgage-Backed Pass-Through Certificates, Series 2005-4 filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Fidelity National Title Group, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Nevada District. The Judges overseeing this case are Andrew P. Gordon and Brenda Weksler. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-01186

  • Filing Date:

    06/22/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Andrew P. Gordon

Referral Judge

Brenda Weksler

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

U.S. Bank, National Association

Defendants

Fidelity National Title Group, Inc

Chicago Title Insurance Company

Ticor Title of Nevada, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Christina Miller

Attorney at Wright, Finlay & Zak

7785 W. Sahara Ave., Ste. 200

Las Vegas, NV 89117

Darren T Brenner

Attorney at Wright, Finlay & Zak, LLP

7785 W. Sahara Ave., Suite 200

Las Vegas, NV 89117

Lindsay Robbins

Attorney at WRIGHT FINLAY & ZAK, LLP

7785 W. Sahara Ave, Ste 200

Las Vegas, NV 89117

Defendant Attorneys

Gary L. Compton

2950 E. Flamingo Rd., Ste. L

Las Vegas, NV 89121

Kevin Samuel Sinclair

Attorney at Sinclair Braun LLP

16501 Ventura Boulevard, Suite 400

Encino, CA 91436

Scott E Gizer

Attorney at Early Sullivan Wright Gizer & McRae LLP

8716 Spanish Ridge Avenue, Suite 105

Las Vegas, NV 89148

Sophia Shunwan Lau

Attorney at Early Sullivan Wright Gizer & McRae LLP

8716 Spanish Ridge Avenue, Suite 105

Las Vegas, NV 89148

 

Court Documents

18 #6

Exhibit F - April 20, 2015 Corporate Assignment of Deed of Trust recorded in the

18 #5

Exhibit E - July 28, 2010 Assignment of Mortgage recorded in the Clark County Re

18 #4

Exhibit D - August 26, 2009 Corporation Assignment recorded in the Clark County

18 #3

Exhibit C - Certificate of Compliance issued to Chicago Title of Nevada, Inc. by

18 #2

Exhibit B - Ticor Title of Nevada, Inc.s license

18 #1

Exhibit A - Chicago Title Insurance Companys Insurer license

#18

(#18) REQUEST for Judicial Notice re #17 Response by Defendant Chicago Title Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Chicago Title Insurance Companys Insurer license, #2 Exhibit B - Ticor Title of Nevada, Inc.s license, #3 Exhibit C - Certificate of Compliance issued to Chicago Title of Nevada, Inc. by the Nevada Division of Insurance, #4 Exhibit D - August 26, 2009 Corporation Assignment recorded in the Clark County Recorders Office as instrument number 200908260003113, #5 Exhibit E - July 28, 2010 Assignment of Mortgage recorded in the Clark County Recorders Office as instrument number 201007280003461, #6 Exhibit F - April 20, 2015 Corporate Assignment of Deed of Trust recorded in the Clark County Recorders Office as instrument number 20150420-0000316) (Gizer, Scott) (Entered: 08/20/2021)

#17

(#17) RESPONSE to #8 Motion for Attorney Fees, #7 Motion to Remand to State Court by Defendant Chicago Title Insurance Company. Replies due by 8/27/2021. (Gizer, Scott) (Entered: 08/20/2021)

#16

(#16) STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (Second Request) re #1 Petition for Removal, #15 Order, by Defendants Chicago Title Insurance Company, Ticor Title of Nevada, Inc. (Sinclair, Kevin) Modified on 8/20/2021 to link to Order (SLD). (Entered: 08/20/2021)

8 #1

Exhibit

#8

(#8) MOTION for Attorney Fees re #7 Motion to Remand to State Court by Plaintiff U.S. Bank, National Association. Responses due by 7/21/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Miller, Christina) (Entered: 07/07/2021)

7 #1

Exhibit

#7

(#7) MOTION to Remand to State Court re #1 Petition for Removal,, by Plaintiff U.S. Bank, National Association. Responses due by 7/21/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Miller, Christina) (Entered: 07/07/2021)

1 #4

Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet

1 #3

Exhibit Initial Appearance Fee Disclosure

1 #2

Exhibit Complaint pp. 401-799

1 #1

Exhibit Complaint pp. 1-400

#1

(#1) PETITION FOR REMOVAL from Eighth Judicial District, Clark County, NV, Case Number A-21-836669-C, (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0978-6532627) by Chicago Title Insurance Company. Proof of service due by 9/19/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Complaint pp. 1-400, #2 Exhibit Complaint pp. 401-799, #3 Exhibit Initial Appearance Fee Disclosure, #4 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) (Gizer, Scott) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court. (Entered: 06/22/2021)

23 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) REQUEST for Judicial Notice re #17 Response by Defendant Chicago Title Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Chicago Title Insurance Companys Insurer license, #2 Exhibit B - Ticor Title of Nevada, Inc.s license, #3 Exhibit C - Certificate of Compliance issued to Chicago Title of Nevada, Inc. by the Nevada Division of Insurance, #4 Exhibit D - August 26, 2009 Corporation Assignment recorded in the Clark County Recorders Office as instrument number 200908260003113, #5 Exhibit E - July 28, 2010 Assignment of Mortgage recorded in the Clark County Recorders Office as instrument number 201007280003461, #6 Exhibit F - April 20, 2015 Corporate Assignment of Deed of Trust recorded in the Clark County Recorders Office as instrument number 20150420-0000316) (Gizer, Scott) (Entered: 08/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) RESPONSE to #8 Motion for Attorney Fees, #7 Motion to Remand to State Court by Defendant Chicago Title Insurance Company. Replies due by 8/27/2021. (Gizer, Scott) (Entered: 08/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (Second Request) re #1 Petition for Removal, #15 Order, by Defendants Chicago Title Insurance Company, Ticor Title of Nevada, Inc. (Sinclair, Kevin) Modified on 8/20/2021 to link to Order (SLD). (Entered: 08/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) ORDER Granting #14 Stipulation for Extension of Time. Chicago Title Insurance Company, Fidelity National Title Group, Inc, and Ticor Title of Nevada, Inc. answer due 8/23/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 7/21/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC) (Entered: 07/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) re #1 Petition for Removal,, by Defendants Chicago Title Insurance Company, Ticor Title of Nevada, Inc.. (Sinclair, Kevin) (Entered: 07/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ORDER Granting #12 Stipulation for Extension of Time Re: #7 Motion to Remand to State Court and #8 Motion for Attorney Fees, Responses due by 8/20/2021. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 7/16/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC) (Entered: 07/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) and Proposed Order re #7 Motion to Remand to State Court, #8 Motion for Attorney Fees by Defendant Chicago Title Insurance Company. (Lau, Sophia) (Entered: 07/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) REPLY to Response to #5 Motion to Stay Case by Defendants Chicago Title Insurance Company, Fidelity National Title Group, Inc, Ticor Title of Nevada, Inc.. (Sinclair, Kevin) (Entered: 07/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Joint STATUS REPORT Regarding Removed Case by Defendant Chicago Title Insurance Company. (Sinclair, Kevin) (Entered: 07/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) RESPONSE to #5 Motion to Stay Case by Plaintiff U.S. Bank, National Association. Replies due by 7/14/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Miller, Christina) (Entered: 07/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION for Attorney Fees re #7 Motion to Remand to State Court by Plaintiff U.S. Bank, National Association. Responses due by 7/21/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Miller, Christina) (Entered: 07/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION to Remand to State Court re #1 Petition for Removal,, by Plaintiff U.S. Bank, National Association. Responses due by 7/21/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Miller, Christina) (Entered: 07/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) STATEMENT REGARDING REMOVAL by Defendant Chicago Title Insurance Company. (Sinclair, Kevin) (Entered: 07/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION to Stay Case by Defendants Chicago Title Insurance Company, Fidelity National Title Group, Inc, Ticor Title of Nevada, Inc.. (Sinclair, Kevin) (Entered: 06/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • Docket(#4) STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Andrew P. Gordon. Judge Gordon's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink: #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC) (Entered: 06/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 6/23/2021. Statement regarding removed action is due by 7/8/2021. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 7/23/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC) (Entered: 06/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • DocketCase randomly assigned to Judge Andrew P. Gordon and Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler. (JQC) (Entered: 06/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Chicago Title Insurance Company, Fidelity National Title Group, Inc, Ticor Title of Nevada, Inc. that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent Fidelity National Financial, Inc., Corporate Parent FNTG HOLDINGS, LLC, Corporate Parent FNTS Holdings, LLC for Ticor Title of Nevada, Inc.; Corporate Parent Fidelity National Financial, Inc., Corporate Parent FNTG HOLDINGS, LLC for Chicago Title Insurance Company, Fidelity National Title Group, Inc added. (Sinclair, Kevin) (Entered: 06/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) PETITION FOR REMOVAL from Eighth Judicial District, Clark County, NV, Case Number A-21-836669-C, (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0978-6532627) by Chicago Title Insurance Company. Proof of service due by 9/19/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Complaint pp. 1-400, #2 Exhibit Complaint pp. 401-799, #3 Exhibit Initial Appearance Fee Disclosure, #4 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) (Gizer, Scott) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court. (Entered: 06/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Ticor Title of Nevada, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Fidelity National Title Group, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where CHICAGO TITLE INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where U.S. Bank, N.A. as Trustee for the RMAC Trust, Series 2016-CTT is a litigant