This case was last updated from PACER on 10/16/2020 at 09:01:58 (UTC).

U.S. Bank, National Association as Legal Title Trustee for Truman 2016 SC6 Title Trust v. Romero

Case Summary

On 08/17/2020 U S Bank, National Association as Legal Title Trustee for Truman 2016 SC6 Title Trust filed a Civil Right - Housing/Accommodation Discrimination lawsuit against Romero. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Thomas S. Hixson and James Donato. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-05806

  • Filing Date:

    08/17/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Housing/Accommodation Discrimination

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Thomas S. Hixson

James Donato

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

U.S. Bank, National Association as Legal Title Trustee for Truman 2016 SC6 Title Trust

Defendants

Janeth M. Romero

Hayward, CA 94542

Janeth Romero Dejesus

Hayward, CA 94542

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Donna La Porte

Attorney at La Porte Law

2030 Main Street, Suite 1300

Irvine, CA 92614

 

Court Documents

#8

(#8) Acknowledgment of Receipt of Remand from Alameda County Superior Court. (fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/13/2020) (Entered: 10/15/2020)

#7

(#7) ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. Signed by Judge James Donato on 9/18/2020. (jdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/18/2020)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) (Entered: 09/18/2020)

6 #1

Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording

#6

(#6) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge James Donato for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by Clerk on 08/21/2020. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(mbcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/21/2020)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) (Entered: 08/21/2020)

#4

(#4) REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Janeth M. Romero. Objections due by 9/3/2020. Signed by Judge Thomas S. Hixson on 8/20/2020. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/20/2020)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) (Entered: 08/20/2020)

#3

(#3) ORDER AND NOTICE REGARDING RESOURCES AVAILABLE TO PRO SE LITIGANTS. Signed by Judge Hixson on 8/18/20. (fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/17/2020)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) (Entered: 08/20/2020)

#2

(#2) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 11/12/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/19/2020 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom G, 15th Floor. (fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/17/2020)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) (Entered: 08/20/2020)

1 #2

receipt

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Alameda County Superior Court. Their case number is RG19028125. ( Filing fee $400 ). Filed byJaneth M. Romero. Consent/Declination due by 8/31/2020. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 receipt)(fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/17/2020) (Entered: 08/20/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Acknowledgment of Receipt of Remand from Alameda County Superior Court. (fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/13/2020) (Entered: 10/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. Signed by Judge James Donato on 9/18/2020. (jdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/18/2020)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) (Entered: 09/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge James Donato for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by Clerk on 08/21/2020. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(mbcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/21/2020)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) (Entered: 08/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • Docket(#5) CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/20/2020)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) (Entered: 08/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Janeth M. Romero. Objections due by 9/3/2020. Signed by Judge Thomas S. Hixson on 8/20/2020. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/20/2020)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) (Entered: 08/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ORDER AND NOTICE REGARDING RESOURCES AVAILABLE TO PRO SE LITIGANTS. Signed by Judge Hixson on 8/18/20. (fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/17/2020)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) (Entered: 08/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 11/12/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/19/2020 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom G, 15th Floor. (fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/17/2020)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) (Entered: 08/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Alameda County Superior Court. Their case number is RG19028125. ( Filing fee $400 ). Filed byJaneth M. Romero. Consent/Declination due by 8/31/2020. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 receipt)(fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/17/2020) (Entered: 08/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less