This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/10/2020 at 14:09:59 (UTC).

US Bank NA v. Glogowski Law Firm et al

Case Summary

On 01/16/2019 US Bank NA filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Glogowski Law Firm. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Washington Western District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is John C Coughenour. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-00074

  • Filing Date:

    01/16/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

John C Coughenour

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant

US Bank NA

Defendants and Counter Claimants

Katrina Glogowski

Glogowski Law Firm PLLC doing business as Allegiant Law Group

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant Attorneys

John T Fetters

Samantha K Pitsch

Defendant and Counter Claimant Attorney

Wilhelm Dingler

 

Court Documents

13 #1

Proposed Order

#13

#12

#11

#10

#9

#8

#7

#6

#5

4 #1

Summons

#4

#3

#2

1 #3

Summons

1 #2

Summons

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM of Defendant Law Firm's Counterclaims, filed by Counter Defendant US Bank NA. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 4/5/2019, (Fetters, John) (Entered: 03/13/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Katrina Glogowski, Glogowski Law Firm PLLC (Dingler, Wilhelm) (Entered: 02/25/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ANSWER to #1 Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES against plaintiff All Defendants by Glogowski Law Firm PLLC, Katrina Glogowski.(Dingler, Wilhelm) (Entered: 02/22/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Samantha K Pitsch on behalf of Plaintiff US Bank NA. (Pitsch, Samantha) (Entered: 02/14/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Wilhelm Dingler on behalf of Defendants Katrina Glogowski, Glogowski Law Firm PLLC. (Dingler, Wilhelm) (Entered: 02/01/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Glogowski Law Firm-Katrina Glogowski Registered Agent on 1/22/2019, filed by Plaintiff US Bank NA. (Fetters, John) (Entered: 01/25/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Katrina Glogowski on 1/22/2019, filed by Plaintiff US Bank NA. (Fetters, John) (Entered: 01/25/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY AND DEPOSITIONS by U.S. District Judge John C. Coughenour. (PP) (Entered: 01/18/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MINUTE ENTRY re: STATUS CONFERENCE. The attorney who will be responsible for trying the case, or that attorney's representative, should attend the conference and be prepared to discuss the following matters at the conference: 1. An estimate of the number of days needed for trial; 2. The date by which the case will be ready for trial; 3. Whether the parties intend to mediate per LCR 39.1 and, if so, when the parties expect to complete mediation; If counsel's office is outside of the Greater Metropolitan Seattle area, local counsel should attend on behalf of non-local counsel. If local counsel is unavailable, non-local counsel may make arrangements to participate telephonically in the conference by contacting the Courtroom Deputy Clerk at Paul_Pierson@wawd.uscourts.gov at least TEN (10) DAYS in advance of the proceeding. Counsel do NOT need to file a Joint Status Report or Rule 26(f) Report in advance of the Status Conference. Counsel should plan on arriving 10-15 minutes early to check in with the Courtroom Deputy Clerk as the Court's calendar begins promptly at 9:00 a.m. COUNSEL OR THE PRO SE PARTY WHO FILED THIS MATTER SHALL IMMEDIATELY NOTIFY ALL PARTIES OF THE DATE AND TIME OF THE SCHEDULED STATUS CONFERENCE. A STATUS CONFERENCE is ordered set for 4/23/2019 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 16206 before U.S. District Judge John C. Coughenour. (PP) (Entered: 01/18/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summonses Electronically Issued as to defendants Glogowski Law Firm PLLC and Katrina Glogowski. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(GT) (Entered: 01/17/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE TO FILER: re #1 Complaint. Notice of Filing Deficiency** Action Required ** See Attached Letter for More Information and Instructions. (GT) (Entered: 01/17/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • DocketU.S. District Judge John C Coughenour added. (GT) (Entered: 01/17/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent U.S. Bancorp, Inc. for U.S. Bank, N.A.. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by U.S. Bank, N.A. (Fetters, John) (Entered: 01/16/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Receipt # 0981-5616231), filed by U.S. Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(Fetters, John) (Entered: 01/16/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less