This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/20/2022 at 21:45:15 (UTC).

Raul Uriarte Limon v. Golden State Supply LLC

Case Summary

On 11/01/2020 Raul Uriarte Limon filed a Civil Right - Other Disability Discrimination lawsuit against Golden State Supply LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are John A. Kronstadt and Charles F. Eick. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-10041

  • Filing Date:

    11/01/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Disability Discrimination

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Charles F. Eick

Presiding Judge

John A. Kronstadt

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Raul Uriarte-Limon

Defendants

Golden State Supply LLC

DOES 1-10

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Matt D Valenti

Attorney at Valenti Law APC

P O Box 712533

San Diego, CA 92171-2533

Defendant Attorney

Monica H Bullock

Attorney at Jackson Lewis PC

200 Specterum Center Drive Suite 500

Irvine, CA 92679

 

Court Documents

#1

#2

#3

#4

#5

#6

#7

#8

#9

#10

#11

#13

(#13) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Plaintiff Raul Uriarte-Limon. Dismissal is with prejudice. (Valenti, Matt) (Entered: 01/20/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Plaintiff Raul Uriarte-Limon. Dismissal is with prejudice. (Valenti, Matt) (Entered: 01/20/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2020
  • Docket(#12) (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER DISMISSING CASE WITHOUT PREJUDICE (JS-6) by Judge John A Kronstadt: In light of the parties Notice of Settlement, the Court orders that the action is dismissed without prejudice. The Court retains jurisdiction to vacate this Order and to reopen the action within 60 days from the date of this Order; provided, however, any request by any party(ies) that the Court do so, shall make a showing of good cause as to why the settlement has not been completed within the 60-day period, what further settlement processes are necessary, and when the party(ies) making such a request reasonably expect the process to be concluded. This Order does not preclude the filing of a stipulation of dismissal with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41, which does not require the approval of the Court. Such a stipulation shall be filed within the aforementioned 60-day period, or by such later date ordered by the Court pursuant to a stipulation by the parties that conforms the requirements of a showing of good cause stated above. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (tj) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 12/30/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE of Settlement filed by Plaintiff Raul Uriarte-Limon. (Valenti, Matt) (Entered: 12/29/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant Golden State Supply LLC.(Attorney Monica H Bullock added to party Golden State Supply LLC(pty:dft))(Bullock, Monica) (Entered: 12/04/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Raul Uriarte-Limon, upon Defendant Golden State Supply LLC served on 11/25/2020, answer due 12/16/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Jessie Gastelum, Agent for Service in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Valenti, Matt) (Entered: 11/30/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) STANDING ORDERS FOR CIVIL CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE JOHN A. KRONSTADT upon filing of the complaint by Judge John A. Kronstadt. Please read each Order carefully as they differ in some respects from the Local Rules. Counsel are advised that the Court, at any time, may amend one or more of its Standing Orders. It is the responsibility of counsel to refer to this Court's Procedures and Schedules found on the website for the United States District Court, Central District of California (www.cacd.uscourts.gov) to obtain the operative order. The Court thanks the parties and their counsel for their anticipated cooperation in carrying out these requirements. (vv) (Entered: 11/27/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Golden State Supply LLC. (jtil) (Entered: 11/04/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil) (Entered: 11/04/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge John A. Kronstadt and Magistrate Judge Charles F. Eick. (jtil) (Entered: 11/04/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Raul Uriarte-Limon, (Valenti, Matt) (Entered: 11/01/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Raul Uriarte-Limon. (Valenti, Matt) (Entered: 11/01/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Raul Uriarte-Limon. (Valenti, Matt) (Entered: 11/01/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-28804587 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Raul Uriarte-Limon. (Attorney Matt D Valenti added to party Raul Uriarte-Limon(pty:pla))(Valenti, Matt) (Entered: 11/01/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GOLDEN STATE SUPPLY LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Matt D Valenti