This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/10/2022 at 08:07:20 (UTC).

Urban View Development Group, Inc. et al v. GoDaddy.Com, LLC et al

Case Summary

On February 9, 2022, Urban View Development Group, Inc. (“UVDG”), Nadav Hamo (“Hamo”), and Robert Michaeli (“Michaeli”) (collectively, “Plaintiffs”), represented by Adam Stein and Jacob E. Lewin of Stein, Adler, Dabah, & Zelkowitz LLP, filed a personal injury lawsuit against Godaddy.com, LLC (“GoDaddy”), Amazon Web Services, Inc. (“AWS”) and John Doe (“Doe”) (collectively, “Defendants”), seeking declaratory and injunctive relief for the alleged attempt to smear the names and reputation of Plaintiffs, procuring the domain name www.nadavhamo.com (the “Misappropriated Site”), and using the Misappropriated Site to defame and harm Plaintiffs. This case was filed in the U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of New York with Judges Kiyo A. Matsumoto and Lois Bloom presiding. 

In the complaint, Plaintiffs alleged that “Defendants maintain and/or enable the maintenance and registration of the Misappropriated Site. The Misappropriated Site contains statements that are solely intended to tarnish the names of Plaintiffs, including ‘Nadav Hamo and Bobby Michaeli are slumlords,’ and ‘delivering structurally deficient condominiums to hapless buyers.’ Plaintiffs claim that “the Misappropriated Site contains threats to Plaintiffs, stating that ‘SOONER OR LATER GOD’LL CUT YOU DOWN.’ There is no reason for Defendant Doe to maintain this site other than to blacken the names of Plaintiffs.”

Plaintiffs further alleged that “Doe’s actions are motivated solely by ill-will. The statements on the Misappropriated Site are false, and intended to cause harm to Plaintiffs’ reputation. Such statements have caused harm to Plaintiffs’ reputation. Defendants GoDaddy and AWS are contributorily liable for failure to remove the Misappropriated Site. Defendants GoDaddy and AWS have caused harm to Plaintiffs by failing to remove the Misappropriated Site.”

Plaintiffs presented four claims for relief for the misappropriation of likeness, defamation, injurious falsehood, and libel. Plaintiffs alleged that “Defendants GoDaddy and AWS are facilitating these actions by allowing the continued registration and hosting of the Misappropriated Site. Despite notice, GoDaddy has failed to act to rectify these actions. Plaintiffs have thus been forced to file this action to vindicate its rights in its names and likeness, and to cease all damage caused by such defamatory statements.” 

In the prayer for relief, Plaintiffs requested judgment that “Defendants have committed acts of misappropriation of likeness, defamation, injurious falsehood and misappropriation of trade libel.” Plaintiffs further requested an order for “Defendants to take down and delete the Misappropriated Site” and an injunction enjoining Defendants from using the Misappropriated Site in the future.” Plaintiffs also requested damages for loss of business reputation and goodwill. 

This case summary may not reflect the current position of the parties to this litigation or the status of this case. Sign up to view the latest case updates and court documents.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-00738

  • Filing Date:

    02/09/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Kiyo A. Matsumoto

Referral Judge

Lois Bloom

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Urban View Development Group, Inc.

Nadav Hamo

Robert Michaeli

Defendants

GoDaddy.Com, LLC

Amazon Web Services, Inc.

John Doe

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Jacob E. Lewin

Attorney at Stein Adler Dabah & Zelkowitz LLP

1633 Broadway, 46Th Floor

New York, NY 10019

Adam Stein

Attorney at Stein Adler Dabah & Zelkowitz LLP

1633 Broadway, 46Th Floor

New York, NY 10019

Defendant Attorneys

Ambika Kumar

Adam Sieff

Attorney at Davis Wright Tremaine LLP

865 S. Figueroa Street, Ste 24Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90017

James Eric Rosenfeld

Attorney at Davis Wright Tremaine LLP

1633 Broadway

New York, NY 10019

 

Court Documents

#17

(#17) Letter MOTION for pre motion conference by Amazon Web Services, Inc.. (Kumar, Ambika) (Entered: 03/09/2022)

16 #2

Affidavit in Support

16 #1

Proposed Order

16 #16

Main Document

#15

(#15) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Nadav Hamo, Robert Michaeli, Urban View Development Group, Inc. against defendant, GoDaddy.com LLC without prejudice (Lewin, Jacob) (Entered: 03/08/2022)

14 #2

Proposed Order

14 #1

Affidavit

14 #14

Main Document

#13

(#13) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Amazon Web Services, Inc. identifying Other Affiliate Amazon.Com, Inc. for Amazon Web Services, Inc.. (Rosenfeld, James) (Entered: 03/07/2022)

#12

(#12) NOTICE of Appearance by James Eric Rosenfeld on behalf of Amazon Web Services, Inc. (aty to be noticed) (Rosenfeld, James) (Entered: 03/07/2022)

#11

No Description Available

#10

No Description Available

9 #1

Summons

9 #9

Main Document

#8

No Description Available

11 More Documents Available
View All Documents

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER granting #17 Motion for Pre Motion Conference. Pre Motion Hearing set for 4/26/2022 01:00 PM in Courtroom 6C South before Judge Kiyo A. Matsumoto. All parties shall appear for a pre-motion conference on April 26, 2022, at 1:00 pm. The parties shall dial into the conference by calling 1-888-684-8852 and entering the following access code: 1312089. Ordered by Judge Kiyo A. Matsumoto on 3/14/2022. (Rodriguez Armenta, Elena) (Entered: 03/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER granting #16 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The proposed order, ECF No. 16 Attachment #1, is So Ordered. The attorney shall register for ECF, registration is available online at www.pacer.gov. Once registered, the attorney shall file a notice of appearance and ensure that s/he receives electronic notification of activity in this case. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lois Bloom on 3/10/2022. (Yindra, Hannah) (Entered: 03/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) Letter MOTION for pre motion conference by Amazon Web Services, Inc.. (Kumar, Ambika) (Entered: 03/09/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Adam S. Sieff Filing fee $ 150, receipt number ANYEDC-15361497. by Amazon Web Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Affidavit in Support) (Sieff, Adam) (Entered: 03/09/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2022
  • DocketGoDaddy.Com, LLC terminated.Ordered by Judge Kiyo A. Matsumoto on 3/9/2022. (Williams-Jackson, Sandra) (Entered: 03/09/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Nadav Hamo, Robert Michaeli, Urban View Development Group, Inc. against defendant, GoDaddy.com LLC without prejudice (Lewin, Jacob) (Entered: 03/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER granting #14 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The proposed order, ECF No. 14 Attachment #2, is So Ordered. The attorney shall register for ECF, registration is available online at www.pacer.gov. Once registered, the attorney shall file a notice of appearance and ensure that s/he receives electronic notification of activity in this case. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lois Bloom on 3/8/2022. (Yindra, Hannah) (Entered: 03/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Ambika Kumar Filing fee $ 150, receipt number ANYEDC-15353146. by Amazon Web Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Proposed Order) (Kumar, Ambika) (Entered: 03/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Amazon Web Services, Inc. identifying Other Affiliate Amazon.Com, Inc. for Amazon Web Services, Inc.. (Rosenfeld, James) (Entered: 03/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) NOTICE of Appearance by James Eric Rosenfeld on behalf of Amazon Web Services, Inc. (aty to be noticed) (Rosenfeld, James) (Entered: 03/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 02/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Proposed Summons. Re #1 Complaint, by Nadav Hamo, Robert Michaeli, Urban View Development Group, Inc. (Lewin, Jacob) (Entered: 02/09/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 02/09/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 02/09/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Kiyo A. Matsumoto and Magistrate Judge Lois Bloom. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 02/09/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Civil Cover Sheet.. Re Notice: Re: Incomplete Civil Cover Sheet, by Nadav Hamo, Robert Michaeli, Urban View Development Group, Inc. (Lewin, Jacob) (Entered: 02/09/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • DocketNotice: Re: Incomplete Civil Cover Sheet. The Clerk's Office cannot assign this case without a completed Civil Cover Sheet. All questions *** INCLUDING the CERTIFICATION OF ARBITRATION ELIGIBILITY*** section on the second page needs to be answered. Please resubmit Civil Cover Sheet. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 02/09/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Civil Cover Sheet.. by Nadav Hamo, Robert Michaeli, Urban View Development Group, Inc. (Lewin, Jacob) (Entered: 02/09/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • DocketNotice: Re: Civil Cover Sheet. The Clerk's Office cannot assign this case without a completed Civil Cover Sheet. All questions *** INCLUDING the CERTIFICATION OF ARBITRATION ELIGIBILITY*** section on the second page needs to be answered. Please submit Civil Cover Sheet. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 02/09/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Jacob E. Lewin on behalf of Nadav Hamo, Robert Michaeli, Urban View Development Group, Inc. (aty to be noticed) (Lewin, Jacob) (Entered: 02/09/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Amazon Web Services, Inc., John Doe, GoDaddy.Com, LLC filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANYEDC-15275783 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -NO,, filed by Urban View Development Group, Inc., Robert Michaeli, Nadav Hamo. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Stein, Adam) (Entered: 02/09/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Godaddy, Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where Amazon Web Services Inc is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Ambika Kumar

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Adam S Sieff