This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/29/2021 at 17:30:14 (UTC).

Urban v. KeyBank

Case Summary

On 11/19/2020 Urban filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against KeyBank. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Edward M. Chen. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-08182

  • Filing Date:

    11/19/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Edward M. Chen

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Peter Urban

Defendant

KeyBank

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

L. Timothy Fisher

Attorney at Bursor & Fisher, P.A.

1990 North California Boulevard, Suite 940

Walnut Creek, CA 94596

Joseph I Marchese

Attorney at Bursor Fisher P.A.

888 Seventh Avenue

New York, NY 10019

Defendant Attorneys

Daniel Rubin Warren

Attorney at Baker Hostetler LLP

1900 East Ninth Street, Suite 3200

Cleveland, OH 44114-3482

Sam A Camardo

Attorney at Baker Hostetler LLP

127 Public Square, Suite 2000

Cleveland, OH 44114

Kimberly S. Morris

Attorney at Baker & Hostetler LLP

600 Montgomery Street, Suite 3100

San Francisco, CA 94111-2806

James Alexander Slater, Jr.

Attorney at Baker Hostetler LLP

1900 East Ninth Street, Suite 3200

Cleveland, OH 44114-3482

 

Court Documents

#37

#36

#35

#34

#33

#32

#31

#30

#29

#9

8 #1

Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording

#8

#6

#5

#4

#2

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

44 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#37) ORDER granting #36 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal. Case dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 4/16/2021. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/19/2021) (Entered: 04/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#36) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal With Prejudice by Peter Urban (Fisher, L.) (Filed on 4/16/2021) (Entered: 04/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#35) ORDER GRANTING #34 STIPULATION TO STAY DEADLINES PENDING SETTLEMENT AND DISMISSAL. Deadline is 4/23/2021. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 3/24/2021. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/25/2021) (Entered: 03/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#34) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Stipulation to Stay Deadlines Pending Settlement and Dismissal filed by KeyBank. (Morris, Kimberly) (Filed on 3/24/2021) (Entered: 03/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#33) ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen granting #32 Stipulation to Extend Time to Respond to Amended Complaint and Defer Response to Amended Class Action Complaint Pending Forthcoming Motion to Compel Arbitration. Defendant's deadline to respond to the complaint is deferred pending the resolution of Defendant's forthcoming motion to compel arbitration. Defendant shall respond to the Amended Class Action Complaint 21 days after any order denying Defendant's forthcoming motion to compel arbitration, which Defendant shall file on 3/26/2021. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/10/2021) (Entered: 03/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#32) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Extend Time to Respond to Amended Complaint and Defer Response to Amended Class Action Complaint Pending Forthcoming Motion to Compel Arbitration filed by KeyBank. (Morris, Kimberly) (Filed on 3/10/2021) (Entered: 03/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#31) FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against KeyBank. Filed byPeter Urban. (Fisher, L.) (Filed on 3/5/2021) (Entered: 03/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#30) ORDER GRANTING #29 STIPULATED REQUEST FOR ORDER TO CHANGE DATE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Initial Case Management Conference set for 3/11/2021 is vacated and rescheduled for 5/6/2021 09:30 AM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only. Joint Case Management Statement due by 4/29/2021. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 2/24/2021.(afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/24/2021) (Entered: 02/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#29) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Stipulated Request for Order to Change Date of Case Management Conference filed by KeyBank. (Morris, Kimberly) (Filed on 2/24/2021) (Entered: 02/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSet/Reset Deadlines as to #23 MOTION to Compel Arbitration. Motion Hearing set for 4/1/2021 01:30 PM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only before Judge Edward M. Chen. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/16/2021) (Entered: 02/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
18 More Docket Entries
  • 12/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER IN REASSIGNED CASE: Initial Case Management Conference set for 3/11/2021 09:30 AM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only. Joint Case Management Statement due by 3/4/2021. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 12/7/2020. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/7/2020) (Entered: 12/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Peter Urban. KeyBank served on 11/30/2020, answer due 12/21/2020. (Fisher, L.) (Filed on 12/2/2020) (Entered: 12/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Edward M. Chen for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by the Clerk on 11/23/2020. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(anjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/23/2020) (Entered: 11/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2020
  • Docket(#7) CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/20/2020) (Entered: 11/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Peter Urban.. (Fisher, L.) (Filed on 11/20/2020) (Entered: 11/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 2/16/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 2/23/2021 01:30 PM. (bnsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/20/2020) (Entered: 11/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued as to KeyBank. (bnsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/20/2020) (Entered: 11/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2020
  • Docket(#3) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 12/3/2020. (anjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/20/2020) (Entered: 11/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Proposed Summons. (Fisher, L.) (Filed on 11/19/2020) (Entered: 11/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against KeyBank ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-15218145.). Filed byPeter Urban. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Fisher, L.) (Filed on 11/19/2020) Modified on 11/20/2020 (bnsS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 11/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where KeyBank National Association is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer L. Timothy Fisher

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Joseph I Marchese