This case was last updated from PACER on 09/15/2020 at 08:38:49 (UTC).

Uptime Systems, LLC v. Kennard Law, P.C.

Case Summary

On 07/17/2020 Uptime Systems, LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Kennard Law, P C. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Minnesota District. The Judges overseeing this case are John R. Tunheim and Elizabeth Cowan Wright. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    0:20-CV-01597

  • Filing Date:

    07/17/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Minnesota District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

John R. Tunheim

Referral Judge

Elizabeth Cowan Wright

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Upline Systems, LLC

Uptime Systems, LLC

Defendant

Kennard Law, P.C.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Steven M. Cerny

Attorney at Santi Cerny, PLLC

222 South 9Th Street, Suite 1600

Minneapolis, MN 55402

Defendant Attorneys

Michael J Minenko

Attorney at Minenko Law, LLC

2051 Killebrew Drive, Suite 611

Bloomington, MN 55425

Alfonso Kennard

Attorney at Kennard Law, P.C.

2603 Augusta Dr., Ste 1450

Houston, TX 77057

 

Court Documents

#31

(#31) PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #10 MOTION to Remand to State Court MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by Kennard Law, P.C..(Kennard, Alfonso) (Entered: 09/04/2020)

30 #2

LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate

30 #1

Exhibit(s)

#30

(#30) RESPONSE in Opposition re #10 MOTION to Remand to State Court MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by Kennard Law, P.C.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Kennard, Alfonso) (Entered: 09/04/2020)

#28

(#28) MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re #26 Motion to Alter/Amend/Supplement Pleadings filed by Kennard Law, P.C..(Kennard, Alfonso) (Entered: 08/31/2020)

#27

(#27) PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re Defendant's Motion to Amend Answer #26 Motion to Alter/Amend/Supplement Pleadings. (Kennard, Alfonso) (Entered: 08/31/2020)

26 #2

Exhibit(s)

26 #1

Exhibit(s)

#26

(#26) MOTION to Alter/Amend/Supplement Pleadings filed by Kennard Law, P.C.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Exhibit(s))(Kennard, Alfonso) (Entered: 08/31/2020)

#5

(#6) TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting #5 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Alfonso Kennard for Kennard Law, P.C. Approved by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright on 7/28/2020. (NAH) (Entered: 07/28/2020)

#4

(#4) ANSWER to Complaint filed by Kennard Law, P.C.. (Minenko, Michael) (Entered: 07/17/2020)

#3

(#3) RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Defendant Kennard Law, P.C.. (Minenko, Michael) (Entered: 07/17/2020)

1 #5

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #4

Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal

1 #3

Placeholder for Order for Partial Summary Judgment

1 #2

Placeholder for Plaintiff's Memorandum in Support of Summary Judgment

1 #1

Summons and Complaint

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Hennepin County District Court, case number 27-cv-19-2924 (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-7890968) filed by Kennard Law, P.C.. No summons requested. (Attachments: #1 Summons and Complaint, #2 Placeholder for Plaintiff's Memorandum in Support of Summary Judgment, #3 Placeholder for Order for Partial Summary Judgment, #4 Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal, #5 Civil Cover Sheet) (Minenko, Michael) (Entered: 07/17/2020)

53 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/08/2020
  • Docket(#33) (Text-Only) ORDER/NOTICE: Motion Hearing on Defendant's Motion to Amend is reset for 10/26/2020 at 01:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright on 9/8/2020.(TMA) (Entered: 09/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#31) PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #10 MOTION to Remand to State Court MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by Kennard Law, P.C..(Kennard, Alfonso) (Entered: 09/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#30) RESPONSE in Opposition re #10 MOTION to Remand to State Court MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by Kennard Law, P.C.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Kennard, Alfonso) (Entered: 09/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2020
  • Docket(#29) (Text-Only) ORDER/NOTICE: Motion Hearing on Plaintiff's Motion to Amend is set for 10/15/2020 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright via videoconference. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright on 9/4/2020.(TMA) (Entered: 09/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re #26 Motion to Alter/Amend/Supplement Pleadings filed by Kennard Law, P.C..(Kennard, Alfonso) (Entered: 08/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re Defendant's Motion to Amend Answer #26 Motion to Alter/Amend/Supplement Pleadings. (Kennard, Alfonso) (Entered: 08/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) MOTION to Alter/Amend/Supplement Pleadings filed by Kennard Law, P.C.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Exhibit(s))(Kennard, Alfonso) (Entered: 08/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Uptime Systems, LLC re #21 Memorandum in Support of Motion, (Cerny, Steven) (Entered: 08/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re #19 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief filed by Uptime Systems, LLC.(Cerny, Steven) (Entered: 08/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #19 MOTION to Revoke Pro Hac Vice Status of Alfonso Kennard, Jr. filed by Uptime Systems, LLC.(Cerny, Steven) (Entered: 08/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 08/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MOTION to Remand to State Court , MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by Uptime Systems, LLC. (Cerny, Steven) (Entered: 08/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Plaintiff Uptime Systems, LLC. (Cerny, Steven) (Entered: 08/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Steven M. Cerny on behalf of Uptime Systems, LLC. (Cerny, Steven) (Entered: 08/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER/NOTICE: Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 8/17/2020. TELEPHONIC Pretrial Conference set for 8/24/2020 at 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright on 8/5/2020. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(TMA) (Entered: 08/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting #5 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Alfonso Kennard for Kennard Law, P.C. Approved by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright on 7/28/2020. (NAH) (Entered: 07/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Alfonso Kennard, Jr.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-7891987 filed by Kennard Law, P.C.. (Minenko, Michael) (Entered: 07/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ANSWER to Complaint filed by Kennard Law, P.C.. (Minenko, Michael) (Entered: 07/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Defendant Kennard Law, P.C.. (Minenko, Michael) (Entered: 07/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • Docket(#2) TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Chief Judge John R. Tunheim per Civil (3rd, 4th - Master) list, referred to Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright. Please use case number 20-cv-1597 JRT/ECW. (CLK) (Entered: 07/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Hennepin County District Court, case number 27-cv-19-2924 (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-7890968) filed by Kennard Law, P.C.. No summons requested. (Attachments: #1 Summons and Complaint, #2 Placeholder for Plaintiff's Memorandum in Support of Summary Judgment, #3 Placeholder for Order for Partial Summary Judgment, #4 Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal, #5 Civil Cover Sheet) (Minenko, Michael) (Entered: 07/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less