This case was last updated from PACER on 11/29/2020 at 08:56:05 (UTC).

UPMC v. AZAR et al

Case Summary

On 09/30/2020 UPMC filed an Other lawsuit against AZAR. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, District Of Columbia District. The Judges overseeing this case are Colleen Kollar-Kotelly and Rudolph Contreras. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-02781

  • Filing Date:

    09/30/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    District Of Columbia District

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Colleen Kollar-Kotelly

Rudolph Contreras

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

UPMC

One Oxford Centre, 38Th Floor

Pittsburgh, PA 15219

Defendants

ALEX M. AZAR, II

DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

William Barnett Schultz

Attorney at ZUCKERMAN SPAEDER LLP

1800 M St. Nw, Suite 1000

Washington, DC 20036

Margaret M. Dotzel

Attorney at ZUCKERMAN SPAEDER LLP

1800 M St. Nw, Suite 1000

Washington, DC 20036

Defendant Attorney

Justin Michael Sandberg

Attorney at U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE

1100 L Street, Nw, Room 11004

Washington, DC 20005

 

Court Documents

12 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#12

(#12) Joint MOTION to Stay by ALEX M. AZAR, II, DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Sandberg, Justin) (Entered: 10/29/2020)

#11

(#11) NOTICE of Appearance by William Barnett Schultz on behalf of UPMC (Schultz, William) (Main Document 11 replaced fillable document on 10/5/2020) (ztd). (Entered: 10/02/2020)

#10

(#10) NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by UPMC. Case related to Case No. 2:20-cv-00674. (Dotzel, Margaret) (Entered: 10/02/2020)

#9

(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Margaret M. Dotzel on behalf of UPMC (Dotzel, Margaret) (Main Document 9 replaced fillable document on 10/5/2020) (ztd). (Entered: 10/02/2020)

#8

(#8) Case directly reassigned to Judge Rudolph Contreras as related. Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly is no longer assigned to the case. (ztnr) (Entered: 10/01/2020)

7 #1

*Restricted*

#7

(#7) Case transferred in from District of Pennsylvania Western; Case Number 2:20-cv-01276. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 09/30/2020)

#6

(#6) ORDER granting #5 Motion to Change Venue. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Cynthia Reed Eddy on 9/11/2020. (ajt) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 9/30/2020.] (Entered: 09/11/2020)

5 #1

Proposed Order

#5

(#5) Consent MOTION to Change Venue by UPMC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Schwab, John) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 9/30/2020.] (Entered: 09/10/2020)

#4

(#4) STANDING ORDER ON RULE 12(b) MOTIONS. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Cynthia Reed Eddy on 9/1/2020. (cmc) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 9/30/2020.] (Entered: 09/01/2020)

3 #1

Summons

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to ALEX M. AZAR, II, THE DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES (Attachments: #1 Summons) (ma) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 9/30/2020.] (Entered: 08/31/2020)

#2

(#2) Disclosure Statement identifying Susquehana Health System Innovation Center, Inc.; Somerset Hospital; Hamot Health Foundation; The Williamsport Hospital; Laurel Health System; Pinnacle Health System; Hanover Hospital as other affiliates, by UPMC. (ma) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 9/30/2020.] (Entered: 08/31/2020)

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against ALEX M. AZAR, II, THE DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number APAWDC-5869612), filed by UPMC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (ma) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 9/30/2020.] (Entered: 08/31/2020)

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMINUTE ORDER granting #12 Motion to Stay. It is hereby ORDERED that this matter is STAYED, including the deadline to answer the complaint, pending the appeal in American Hospital Association v. Azar ("AHA"), Nos. 19-5048, 19-5198 (D.C. Cir.). The case will remain stayed until the time for filing a petition for certiorari in AHA has run, there is a decision by the Supreme Court denying any petition for certiorari in AHA, or there is a decision by the Supreme Court on the merits in AHA. The parties shall file a joint status report within 30 days after such resolution in AHA if the matter has not been dismissed by that date. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 10/29/2020. (lcrc3) (Entered: 10/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Joint MOTION to Stay by ALEX M. AZAR, II, DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Sandberg, Justin) (Entered: 10/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE of Appearance by William Barnett Schultz on behalf of UPMC (Schultz, William) (Main Document 11 replaced fillable document on 10/5/2020) (ztd). (Entered: 10/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by UPMC. Case related to Case No. 2:20-cv-00674. (Dotzel, Margaret) (Entered: 10/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Margaret M. Dotzel on behalf of UPMC (Dotzel, Margaret) (Main Document 9 replaced fillable document on 10/5/2020) (ztd). (Entered: 10/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Case directly reassigned to Judge Rudolph Contreras as related. Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly is no longer assigned to the case. (ztnr) (Entered: 10/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Case transferred in from District of Pennsylvania Western; Case Number 2:20-cv-01276. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 09/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER granting #5 Motion to Change Venue. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Cynthia Reed Eddy on 9/11/2020. (ajt) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 9/30/2020.] (Entered: 09/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Consent MOTION to Change Venue by UPMC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Schwab, John) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 9/30/2020.] (Entered: 09/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) STANDING ORDER ON RULE 12(b) MOTIONS. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Cynthia Reed Eddy on 9/1/2020. (cmc) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 9/30/2020.] (Entered: 09/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to ALEX M. AZAR, II, THE DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES (Attachments: #1 Summons) (ma) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 9/30/2020.] (Entered: 08/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Disclosure Statement identifying Susquehana Health System Innovation Center, Inc.; Somerset Hospital; Hamot Health Foundation; The Williamsport Hospital; Laurel Health System; Pinnacle Health System; Hanover Hospital as other affiliates, by UPMC. (ma) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 9/30/2020.] (Entered: 08/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against ALEX M. AZAR, II, THE DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number APAWDC-5869612), filed by UPMC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (ma) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 9/30/2020.] (Entered: 08/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less