This case was last updated from PACER on 06/06/2020 at 09:11:25 (UTC).

Uperesa v. Fidelity Life Association

Case Summary

On 04/07/2020 Uperesa filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Fidelity Life Association. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Dale A. Drozd and Barbara A. McAuliffe. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-00495

  • Filing Date:

    04/07/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Courthouse:

    California Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Dale A. Drozd

Referral Judge

Barbara A. McAuliffe

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Mona Uperesa

Defendant

Fidelity Life Association

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Andrew Michael Kantor

Attorney at Kantor & Kantor, LLP

19839 Nordhoff St.

Northridge, CA 91324

Glenn Robert Kantor

Attorney at Kantor and Kantor

19839 Nordhoff Street, Suite 1B

Northridge, CA 91324

Defendant Attorney

Melissa M. Cowan

Attorney at Burke, Williams & Sorensen, LLP

444 So. Flower Street, Suite 2400

Los Angeles, CA 90071

 

Court Documents

9 #1

Proposed Order

#9

(#9) STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for to Continue Scheduling Conference for One Month Pending the Parties' July 16, 2020 Mediation re #3 Civil New Case Documents for DAD, by Fidelity Life Association. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Cowan, Melissa) (Entered: 06/03/2020)

#8

(#8) NOTICE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Fidelity Life Association. (Cowan, Melissa) (Entered: 05/26/2020)

#7

(#7) ANSWER by Fidelity Life Association.(Cowan, Melissa) (Entered: 05/26/2020)

#6

(#6) SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Fidelity Life Association served on 4/10/2020, answer due 5/1/2020. (Kantor, Glenn) (Entered: 04/15/2020)

#5

(#5) STIPULATION re #1 Complaint - Stipulation to Extend Time for Defendant to File Responsive Pleading by Fidelity Life Association. Attorney Cowan, Melissa M. added. (Cowan, Melissa) (Entered: 04/13/2020)

#4

(#4) SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Fidelity Life Association* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Glenn Robert Kantor* *Kantor and Kantor* *19839 Nordhoff Street, Suite 1B* *Northridge, CA 91324*. (Rivera, O) (Entered: 04/07/2020)

3 #4

VDRP

3 #3

Order re Consent

3 #2

Standing Order re Judicial Emergency

3 #1

Standing Order

#3

(#3) CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Initial Scheduling Conference set for 7/9/2020 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 8 (BAM) before Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order, #2 Standing Order re Judicial Emergency, #3 Order re Consent, #4 VDRP) (Rivera, O) (Entered: 04/07/2020)

#2

(#2) NOTICE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Mona Uperesa. (Kantor, Glenn) (Entered: 04/07/2020)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Fidelity Life Association by Mona Uperesa. Attorney Kantor, Glenn Robert added. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0972-8832312) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Kantor, Glenn) (Entered: 04/07/2020)

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for to Continue Scheduling Conference for One Month Pending the Parties' July 16, 2020 Mediation re #3 Civil New Case Documents for DAD, by Fidelity Life Association. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Cowan, Melissa) (Entered: 06/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Fidelity Life Association. (Cowan, Melissa) (Entered: 05/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ANSWER by Fidelity Life Association.(Cowan, Melissa) (Entered: 05/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Fidelity Life Association served on 4/10/2020, answer due 5/1/2020. (Kantor, Glenn) (Entered: 04/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) STIPULATION re #1 Complaint - Stipulation to Extend Time for Defendant to File Responsive Pleading by Fidelity Life Association. Attorney Cowan, Melissa M. added. (Cowan, Melissa) (Entered: 04/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Fidelity Life Association* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Glenn Robert Kantor* *Kantor and Kantor* *19839 Nordhoff Street, Suite 1B* *Northridge, CA 91324*. (Rivera, O) (Entered: 04/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Initial Scheduling Conference set for 7/9/2020 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 8 (BAM) before Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order, #2 Standing Order re Judicial Emergency, #3 Order re Consent, #4 VDRP) (Rivera, O) (Entered: 04/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Mona Uperesa. (Kantor, Glenn) (Entered: 04/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Fidelity Life Association by Mona Uperesa. Attorney Kantor, Glenn Robert added. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0972-8832312) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Kantor, Glenn) (Entered: 04/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Fidelity Life Association is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Melissa M Cowan