This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/18/2022 at 14:26:33 (UTC).

UOP LLC et al v. Exterran Energy Solutions, LP et al

Case Summary

On 08/26/2021 UOP LLC filed an Other lawsuit against Exterran Energy Solutions, LP. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Southern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Sim Lake and Christina A Bryan. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:21-CV-02804

  • Filing Date:

    08/26/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Sim Lake

Referral Judge

Christina A Bryan

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

UOP LLC

UOP Russell LLC

Defendants

Exterran Energy Solutions, L.P.

Exterran Corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Michael Charles Smith

Attorney at Scheef & Stone, LLP

113 E. Austin St., P.O. Box 1556

Marshall, TX 75671-1556

Ryan B. Hauer

Attorney at Husch Blackwell Llp

120 South Riverside Plaza, Ste 2200

Chicago, IL 60606

Kara R. Fussner

Attorney at Husch Blackwell LLP

190 Carondelet Plaza, Ste 600

St Louis, MO 63105

Rudolph A. Telscher, Jr.

Attorney at Husch Blackwell LLP

190 Carondelet Plaza, Ste 600

St Louis, MO 63105

Jennifer E Hoekel

Attorney at Husch Blackwell LLP

190 Carondelet Plaza, Ste 600

St. Louis, MO 63105

Stephen P. Bosco

Attorney at HuschBlackwell LLP

750 17Th Street, Nw, Suite 900

Washington, DC 20006

Defendant Attorneys

Kevin T. Jacobs

One Shell Plaza, 910 Louisiana Street

Houston, TX 77002-4995

John A. Jad Davis

Attorney at Davis, Gerald & Cremer

400 W. Illinois, Suite 1400

Midland, TX 79701-4310

Kevin Thomas Jacobs

Attorney at Baker Botts LLP

910 Louisiana, Ste 3200

Houston, TX 77002-4995

Lindsay Volpenhein Cutie

Attorney at Baker Botts L.L.P.

910 Louisiana

Houston, TX 77002

Charles Frank Mace

Attorney at Baker Botts L.L.P.

910 Louisiana St.

Houston, TX 77002

Roger J Fulghum

Attorney at Baker Botts LLP

910 Louisiana St, Houston, Ste 910 Louisiana St

Houston, TX 77002-4916

 

Court Documents

#53

(#53) Amended Docket Control ORDER. Joint Pretrial Order due by 5/5/2023. Docket Call set for 5/12/2023 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom 9B before Judge Sim Lake. All other dates remain as previously set at #52 (Signed by Magistrate Judge Christina A Bryan) Parties notified. (MelissaMorgan, 4) (Entered: 03/22/2022)

#52

(#52) Amended Docket Control ORDER Granting #51 Joint Motion for Entry of Amended Docket Control Order. Identification of Experts due by 6/28/2022., Identification of Responsive Experts due by 8/26/2022., Discovery due by 10/25/2022., Mediation due by 11/16/2022., Dispositive Motion Filing due by 12/15/2022., Non-Dispositive Motion Filing due by 1/6/2023., Joint Pretrial Order due by 4/7/2023., Docket Call set for 4/14/2023 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom 9B before Judge Sim Lake (Signed by Magistrate Judge Christina A Bryan) Parties notified. (MelissaMorgan, 4) (Entered: 03/22/2022)

51 #1

Proposed Order Amended Docket Control Order

51 #51

Main Document

#50

(#50) ORDER granting #49 Motion for Stephen P. Bosco to Appear Pro Hac Vice for UOP LLC. (Signed by Judge Sim Lake) Parties notified.(sanderson, 4) (Entered: 02/01/2022)

#49

(#49) MOTION for Stephen P. Bosco to Appear Pro Hac Vice by UOP LLC, filed. (Motions referred to Christina A Bryan) Motion Docket Date 2/22/2022. (sanderson, 4) (Entered: 02/01/2022)

#48

(#48) ORDER granting #47 Motion for Protective Order.(Signed by Magistrate Judge Christina A Bryan) Parties notified.(cjan, 4) (Entered: 12/07/2021)

47 #1

Proposed Order

#47

(#47) Joint MOTION for Protective OrderMotions referred to Christina A Bryan. by UOP LLC, UOP Russell LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 12/27/2021. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Hoekel, Jennifer) (Entered: 12/06/2021)

1 #8

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #7

Exhibit

1 #6

Exhibit

1 #5

Exhibit

1 #4

Exhibit

1 #3

Exhibit

1 #2

Exhibit

1 #1

Exhibit

#1

76 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#53) Amended Docket Control ORDER. Joint Pretrial Order due by 5/5/2023. Docket Call set for 5/12/2023 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom 9B before Judge Sim Lake. All other dates remain as previously set at #52 (Signed by Magistrate Judge Christina A Bryan) Parties notified. (MelissaMorgan, 4) (Entered: 03/22/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#52) Amended Docket Control ORDER Granting #51 Joint Motion for Entry of Amended Docket Control Order. Identification of Experts due by 6/28/2022., Identification of Responsive Experts due by 8/26/2022., Discovery due by 10/25/2022., Mediation due by 11/16/2022., Dispositive Motion Filing due by 12/15/2022., Non-Dispositive Motion Filing due by 1/6/2023., Joint Pretrial Order due by 4/7/2023., Docket Call set for 4/14/2023 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom 9B before Judge Sim Lake (Signed by Magistrate Judge Christina A Bryan) Parties notified. (MelissaMorgan, 4) (Entered: 03/22/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#51) Joint MOTION Joint Motion for Entry of Amended Docket Control OrderMotions referred to Christina A Bryan. by Exterran Corporation, Exterran Energy Solutions, L.P., filed. Motion Docket Date 4/11/2022. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Amended Docket Control Order)(Fulghum, Roger) (Entered: 03/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#50) ORDER granting #49 Motion for Stephen P. Bosco to Appear Pro Hac Vice for UOP LLC. (Signed by Judge Sim Lake) Parties notified.(sanderson, 4) (Entered: 02/01/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#49) MOTION for Stephen P. Bosco to Appear Pro Hac Vice by UOP LLC, filed. (Motions referred to Christina A Bryan) Motion Docket Date 2/22/2022. (sanderson, 4) (Entered: 02/01/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#48) ORDER granting #47 Motion for Protective Order.(Signed by Magistrate Judge Christina A Bryan) Parties notified.(cjan, 4) (Entered: 12/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#47) Joint MOTION for Protective OrderMotions referred to Christina A Bryan. by UOP LLC, UOP Russell LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 12/27/2021. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Hoekel, Jennifer) (Entered: 12/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#46) Letter to Clerk Requesting Removal of John Jad Davis From Service List by Exterran Corporation, filed.(Jacobs, Kevin) (Entered: 10/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#45) DOCKET CONTROL ORDER. Jury. Amended Pleadings due by 11/18/2021. Joinder of Parties due by 11/18/2021 Discovery due by 7/25/2022. Mediation due by 8/16/2022. Dispositive Motion Filing due by 9/15/2022. Motion Filing due by 9/27/2022. Joint Pretrial Order due by 1/6/2023. Docket Call set for 1/13/2023 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom 9B before Judge Sim Lake(Signed by Magistrate Judge Christina A Bryan) Parties notified.(cjan, 4) (Entered: 10/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#44) NOTICE of Appearance by Frank Mace on behalf of Exterran Corporation, Exterran Energy Solutions, L.P., filed. (Mace, Charles) (Entered: 10/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
44 More Docket Entries
  • 10/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Motion For Extension of Time by UOP LLC, UOP Russell LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Smith, Michael) Modified event on 10/8/2020 (slt). (Entered: 10/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed by UOP LLC, UOP Russell LLC. Exterran Corporation served on 9/29/2020, answer due 10/20/2020; Exterran Energy Solutions, LP served on 9/29/2020, answer due 10/20/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Smith, Michael) (Entered: 10/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Roger J. Fulghum on behalf of Exterran Corporation, Exterran Energy Solutions, LP. Attorney Roger J. Fulghum added to party Exterran Corporation(pty:dft), Attorney Roger J. Fulghum added to party Exterran Energy Solutions, LP(pty:dft) (Fulghum, Roger) (Entered: 10/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Judge David Counts. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (slt) (Entered: 09/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Summons Issued as to Exterran Corporation. (slt) (Entered: 09/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summons Issued as to Exterran Energy Solutions, LP. (slt) (Entered: 09/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by UOP Russell LLC. (Smith, Michael) (Entered: 09/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by UOP LLC. (Smith, Michael) (Entered: 09/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by UOP LLC, UOP Russell LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Smith, Michael) (Entered: 09/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-14014079), filed by UOP LLC, UOP Russell LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Civil Cover Sheet)(Smith, Michael) (Entered: 09/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Exterran Energy Solutions LP is a litigant

Latest cases where Exterran Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases where UOP LLC is a litigant