This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/28/2020 at 09:21:58 (UTC).

UOP LLC et al v. Exterran Energy Solutions, LP et al

Case Summary

On 09/29/2020 UOP LLC filed an Other lawsuit against Exterran Energy Solutions, LP. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Western District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is David Counts. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    7:20-CV-00233

  • Filing Date:

    09/29/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

David Counts

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

UOP Russell LLC

UOP LLC

Defendants

Exterran Energy Solutions, LP

Exterran Corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Michael Charles Smith

Attorney at Siebman, Forrest, Burg & Smith, LLP

113 E. Austin Street

Marshall, TX 75670

Kara R. Fussner

Attorney at Husch Blackwell Llp

190 Carondelet Plaza, Suite 600

St Louis, MO 63105

Rudolph A. Telscher, Jr.

Attorney at Husch Blackwell LLP

190 Carondelet Plaza, Suite 600

St Louis, MO 63105

Ryan B. Hauer

Attorney at Husch Blackwell Llp

120 South Riverside Plaza, Suite 2200

Chicago, IL 60606

Defendant Attorney

Roger J. Fulghum

Attorney at Baker Botts LLP

One Shell Plaza, 910 Louisiana

Houston, TX 77002

 

Court Documents

#12

#11

#10

9 #1

Proposed Order

#9

8 #1

Exhibit

#8

#7

#6

#5

#4

#3

2 #1

Exhibit

#2

1 #3

Exhibit

1 #2

Exhibit

1 #1

Exhibit

#1

15 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketText Order GRANTING #9 the Parties' Joint Stipulation for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint. It is ORDERED the deadline for Defendants Exterran Energy Solutions, L.P. and Exterran Corporation to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint is extended to on or before December 21, 2020. Entered by Judge David Counts. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (db) (Entered: 10/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketText Order GRANTING #12 Rudolph A. Telscher, Jr.'s Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice Pro Hac Vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our Court within 10 days of this Order. It is further ORDERED that if Mr. Telscher has not already done so, shall immediately tender the amount of $100.00, made payable to: Clerk, U.S. District Court, in compliance with Local Court Rule AT-1(f)(2). Entered by Judge David Counts. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (db) (Entered: 10/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketText Order GRANTING #11 Ryan B. Hauer's Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice Pro Hac Vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our Court within 10 days of this Order. It is further ORDERED that if Mr. Hauer has not already done so, shall immediately tender the amount of $100.00, made payable to: Clerk, U.S. District Court, in compliance with Local Court Rule AT-1(f)(2). Entered by Judge David Counts. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (db) (Entered: 10/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketText Order GRANTING #10 Kara R. Fussner's Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice Pro Hac Vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our Court within 10 days of this Order. It is further ORDERED that if Ms. Fussner has not already done so, shall immediately tender the amount of $100.00, made payable to: Clerk, U.S. District Court, in compliance with Local Court Rule AT-1(f)(2). Entered by Judge David Counts. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (db) (Entered: 10/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Michael Charles Smith Rudolph A. Telscher, Jr. ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-14048239) by on behalf of UOP LLC, UOP Russell LLC. (Smith, Michael) (Entered: 10/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Michael Charles Smith Ryan B. Hauer ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-14048230) by on behalf of UOP LLC, UOP Russell LLC. (Smith, Michael) (Entered: 10/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Michael Charles Smith Kara R. Fussner ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-14048197) by on behalf of UOP LLC, UOP Russell LLC. (Smith, Michael) (Entered: 10/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Motion For Extension of Time by UOP LLC, UOP Russell LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Smith, Michael) Modified event on 10/8/2020 (slt). (Entered: 10/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed by UOP LLC, UOP Russell LLC. Exterran Corporation served on 9/29/2020, answer due 10/20/2020; Exterran Energy Solutions, LP served on 9/29/2020, answer due 10/20/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Smith, Michael) (Entered: 10/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Roger J. Fulghum on behalf of Exterran Corporation, Exterran Energy Solutions, LP. Attorney Roger J. Fulghum added to party Exterran Corporation(pty:dft), Attorney Roger J. Fulghum added to party Exterran Energy Solutions, LP(pty:dft) (Fulghum, Roger) (Entered: 10/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Judge David Counts. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (slt) (Entered: 09/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Summons Issued as to Exterran Corporation. (slt) (Entered: 09/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summons Issued as to Exterran Energy Solutions, LP. (slt) (Entered: 09/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by UOP Russell LLC. (Smith, Michael) (Entered: 09/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by UOP LLC. (Smith, Michael) (Entered: 09/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by UOP LLC, UOP Russell LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Smith, Michael) (Entered: 09/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-14014079), filed by UOP LLC, UOP Russell LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Civil Cover Sheet)(Smith, Michael) (Entered: 09/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Exterran Energy Solutions LP is a litigant

Latest cases where Exterran Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases where UOP LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Michael Charles Smith