This case was last updated from PACER on 10/19/2020 at 09:19:04 (UTC).

UNUM Life Insurance Company of America v. Morris et al

Case Summary

On 08/20/2020 UNUM Life Insurance Company of America filed a Labor - Employee Benefit lawsuit against Morris. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Georgia Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Benjamin W. Cheesbro and Lisa G. Wood. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-00088

  • Filing Date:

    08/20/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Employee Benefit

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Georgia Southern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Benjamin W. Cheesbro

Presiding Judge

Lisa G. Wood

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

UNUM Life Insurance Company of America

Defendants

Melvia Morris

Jeremy Brantley

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Elizabeth J. Bondurant

Attorney at Womble, Bond, Dickinson (US) LLP

271 17Th Street, N.W., Suite 2400

Atlanta, GA 30363-1017

 

Court Documents

#10

(#10) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by UNUM Life Insurance Company of America. Melvia Morris waiver sent on 8/26/2020, answer due 10/25/2020. (Bondurant, Elizabeth) (Entered: 10/12/2020)

#9

(#9) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by UNUM Life Insurance Company of America. UNUM Life Insurance Company of America waiver sent on 8/26/2020, answer due 10/25/2020. (Bondurant, Elizabeth) (Entered: 10/01/2020)

#7

(#7) Summons Issued as to Jeremy Brantley and Melvia Morris. (csr) (Entered: 08/24/2020)

6 #1

Flattened Copy

#6

(#6) Summons Submitted (Bondurant, Elizabeth) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/24/2020: #1 Flattened Copy) (csr). (Entered: 08/24/2020)

5 #1

Flattened Copy

#5

(#5) Summons Submitted (Bondurant, Elizabeth) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/24/2020: #1 Flattened Copy) (csr). (Entered: 08/24/2020)

4 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#4

(#4) MOTION to Deposit Funds by UNUM Life Insurance Company of America. Responses due by 9/3/2020. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bondurant, Elizabeth) (Entered: 08/20/2020)

#3

(#3) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Local Rule 7.1.1 by UNUM Life Insurance Company of America. (Bondurant, Elizabeth) (Entered: 08/20/2020)

1 #6

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #5

Exhibit E

1 #4

Exhibit D

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by UNUM Life Insurance Company of America. $400.00 Filing Fee Paid - Receipt Number: AGASDC-2907592. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Civil Cover Sheet). (csr) (Entered: 08/20/2020)

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by UNUM Life Insurance Company of America. Melvia Morris waiver sent on 8/26/2020, answer due 10/25/2020. (Bondurant, Elizabeth) (Entered: 10/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by UNUM Life Insurance Company of America. UNUM Life Insurance Company of America waiver sent on 8/26/2020, answer due 10/25/2020. (Bondurant, Elizabeth) (Entered: 10/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Summons Issued as to Jeremy Brantley and Melvia Morris. (csr) (Entered: 08/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Summons Submitted (Bondurant, Elizabeth) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/24/2020: #1 Flattened Copy) (csr). (Entered: 08/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summons Submitted (Bondurant, Elizabeth) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/24/2020: #1 Flattened Copy) (csr). (Entered: 08/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTIONS REFERRED: #4 MOTION to Deposit Funds. (loh) (Entered: 08/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MOTION to Deposit Funds by UNUM Life Insurance Company of America. Responses due by 9/3/2020. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bondurant, Elizabeth) (Entered: 08/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Local Rule 7.1.1 by UNUM Life Insurance Company of America. (Bondurant, Elizabeth) (Entered: 08/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) RULE 26(f)ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro on 8/20/2020. (csr) (Entered: 08/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by UNUM Life Insurance Company of America. $400.00 Filing Fee Paid - Receipt Number: AGASDC-2907592. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Civil Cover Sheet). (csr) (Entered: 08/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less