This case was last updated from PACER on 10/20/2020 at 09:33:35 (UTC).

UNUM Life Insurance Company of America et al v. Willis et al

Case Summary

On 08/21/2020 UNUM Life Insurance Company of America filed a Labor - Employee Benefit lawsuit against Willis. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Mississippi Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Daniel P. Jordan, III and F. Keith Ball. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-00559

  • Filing Date:

    08/21/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Employee Benefit

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Daniel P. Jordan, III

Referral Judge

F. Keith Ball

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Provident Life and Accident Insurance Company

UNUM Life Insurance Company of America

Defendants

Danita Darlene Willis

Deanna Johnson

Deanna John

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Kenna L. Mansfield, Jr.

Attorney at WELLS, MARBLE & HURST, PLLC - Ridgeland

P. O. Box 131 (Jackson - 39205-0131), 300 Concourse Blvd., Suite 200

Ridgeland, MS 39157

 

Court Documents

#3

(#3) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by UNUM Life Insurance Company of America, Provident Life and Accident Insurance Company. Deanna John waiver sent on 8/24/2020, answer due 10/23/2020. (Mansfield, Kenna) Modified on 10/1/2020 (VM). (Entered: 09/22/2020)

#2

(#2) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by UNUM Life Insurance Company of America, Provident Life and Accident Insurance Company. Danita Darlene Willis waiver sent on 8/24/2020, answer due 10/23/2020. (Mansfield, Kenna) (Entered: 08/31/2020)

1 #9

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #8

Exhibit H - Employer Statement

1 #7

Exhibit G - Benefit Election Auth Form

1 #6

Exhibit F - 04.16.20 letter to Deanna John

1 #5

Exhibit E - Notice of Life Insurance Claim

1 #4

Exhibit D - Death Certificate

1 #3

Exhibit C - Provident Policy - Application

1 #2

Exhibit B - Group Insurance Enrollment Care

1 #1

Exhibit A - Unum Group Policy

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Deanna John, Danita Darlene Willis (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0538-4353809), filed by UNUM Life Insurance Company of America, Provident Life and Accident Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Unum Group Policy, #2 Exhibit B - Group Insurance Enrollment Care, #3 Exhibit C - Provident Policy - Application, #4 Exhibit D - Death Certificate, #5 Exhibit E - Notice of Life Insurance Claim, #6 Exhibit F - 04.16.20 letter to Deanna John, #7 Exhibit G - Benefit Election Auth Form, #8 Exhibit H - Employer Statement, #9 Civil Cover Sheet).(VM) Modified on 10/1/2020 (VM). (Entered: 08/21/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by UNUM Life Insurance Company of America, Provident Life and Accident Insurance Company. Deanna John waiver sent on 8/24/2020, answer due 10/23/2020. (Mansfield, Kenna) Modified on 10/1/2020 (VM). (Entered: 09/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by UNUM Life Insurance Company of America, Provident Life and Accident Insurance Company. Danita Darlene Willis waiver sent on 8/24/2020, answer due 10/23/2020. (Mansfield, Kenna) (Entered: 08/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Deanna John, Danita Darlene Willis (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0538-4353809), filed by UNUM Life Insurance Company of America, Provident Life and Accident Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Unum Group Policy, #2 Exhibit B - Group Insurance Enrollment Care, #3 Exhibit C - Provident Policy - Application, #4 Exhibit D - Death Certificate, #5 Exhibit E - Notice of Life Insurance Claim, #6 Exhibit F - 04.16.20 letter to Deanna John, #7 Exhibit G - Benefit Election Auth Form, #8 Exhibit H - Employer Statement, #9 Civil Cover Sheet).(VM) Modified on 10/1/2020 (VM). (Entered: 08/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Provident Life & Accident Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases where Unum Life Insurance Company of America is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kenna L. Mansfield, Jr.