This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/29/2022 at 08:06:32 (UTC).

Unmask Knox County Kids et al v. Knox County Board of Education et al (JRG1)

Case Summary

On 02/28/2022 Unmask Knox County Kids filed a Civil Right - Education Discrimination lawsuit against Knox County Board of Education JRG1. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Tennessee Eastern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are J Ronnie Greer and Debra C Poplin. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:22-CV-00074

  • Filing Date:

    02/28/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Education Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

J Ronnie Greer

Referral Judge

Debra C Poplin

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Unmask Knox County Kids

K. A.

K. M.

C. G.

M. A.

A. S.

Defendants

Knox County Board of Education

S. B.

M. S.

T. W.

M. K.

Governor Bill Lee

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Jesse D Nelson

Karin M. Sweigart

Mark P. Meuser

Ronald D. Coleman

Defendant Attorneys

Amanda Lynn Morse

David M Sanders

Jessica Jernigan-Johnson

Jessica F Salonus

Justin S Gilbert

Martha H McCampbell

 

Court Documents

#40

(#40) REPLY to Response to Motion re #34 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by S. B., M. K., M. S., T. W.. (Gilbert, Justin) (Entered: 04/28/2022)

#39

(#39) RESPONSE in Opposition re #34 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by K. A., M. A., C. G., K. M., A. S., Unmask Knox County Kids. (Meuser, Mark) (Entered: 04/25/2022)

#38

(#38) MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings by Knox County Board of Education. (Sanders, David) (Entered: 04/25/2022)

#37

(#37) RESPONSE to Motion re #26 First MOTION to Quash SERVICE AND FOR DISMISSAL PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV.P. 12(b)(2) OF NON-PARTY GOVERNOR filed by K. A., M. A., C. G., K. M., A. S., Unmask Knox County Kids. (Meuser, Mark) (Entered: 04/15/2022)

#34

(#34) MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by S. B., M. K., M. S., T. W.. (Gilbert, Justin) (Entered: 04/04/2022)

#26

(#37) RESPONSE to Motion re #26 First MOTION to Quash SERVICE AND FOR DISMISSAL PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV.P. 12(b)(2) OF NON-PARTY GOVERNOR filed by K. A., M. A., C. G., K. M., A. S., Unmask Knox County Kids. (Meuser, Mark) (Entered: 04/15/2022)

11 #8

Affidavit

11 #7

Affidavit

11 #11

Main Document

2 #1

Summons Issued

1 #7

Other - Civil Cover Sheet

1 #6

Summons - Lee

1 #5

Summons - TW

1 #4

Summons - SB

1 #3

Summons - MS

1 #2

Summons - MK

1 #1

Summons - Knox County BOE

1 #1

Main Document

47 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#40) REPLY to Response to Motion re #34 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by S. B., M. K., M. S., T. W.. (Gilbert, Justin) (Entered: 04/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#39) RESPONSE in Opposition re #34 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by K. A., M. A., C. G., K. M., A. S., Unmask Knox County Kids. (Meuser, Mark) (Entered: 04/25/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#38) MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings by Knox County Board of Education. (Sanders, David) (Entered: 04/25/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#37) RESPONSE to Motion re #26 First MOTION to Quash SERVICE AND FOR DISMISSAL PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV.P. 12(b)(2) OF NON-PARTY GOVERNOR filed by K. A., M. A., C. G., K. M., A. S., Unmask Knox County Kids. (Meuser, Mark) (Entered: 04/15/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#36) REPLY TO RESPONSE to Motion re #11 MOTION to Alter Judgment Order filed by K. A., M. A., C. G., K. M., A. S., Unmask Knox County Kids. (Sweigart, Karin) Modified text on 4/7/2022 (ABF). (Entered: 04/07/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#35) ORDER: Generally, scheduling orders will be entered by the Court in lieu of in-person or telephonic scheduling conferences unless otherwise requested by the parties. It is therefore ORDERED: As soon as practicable, but in no event later than 30 days from the first appearance of a defendant, or if that has already occurred, within 30 days of this order, the parties must confer, in a conference arranged by plaintiffs counsel, for the purpose of considering the nature and basis of their claims and defenses. See Order for details. (Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 6/13/2022). Signed by District Judge J Ronnie Greer on 4/4/2022. (LCK) (Entered: 04/04/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#34) MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by S. B., M. K., M. S., T. W.. (Gilbert, Justin) (Entered: 04/04/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#33) ORDER: The parties are ordered to confer and return the attached form within the time provided.Signed by District Judge J Ronnie Greer on 4/4/22. (Attachments: #1 Other Notice of Consent/Non-Consent) (ABF) (Entered: 04/04/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#32) RESPONSE to Motion re #11 MOTION to Alter Judgment Order,, filed by Knox County Board of Education. (Sanders, David) (Entered: 04/01/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#31) ANSWER to #10 Amended Complaint by Knox County Board of Education.(Sanders, David) (Entered: 04/01/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
24 More Docket Entries
  • 03/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) [INCORRECT DOCUMENT ATTACHED; TO BE REFILED] SUPPLEMENT to #1 Complaint,, Summons to be issued to M.S by Unmask Knox County Kids. (Nelson, Jesse) Modified on 3/3/2022 (ABF). (Entered: 03/03/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER: Pursuant to Local Rule 3.2(d)(3), the undersigned finds that the above-captioned case is related to M.B., et al. v. Governor Bill Lee, et al., No. 3:21-CV-317. The Court finds that these cases arise out of the same transaction or occurrence and involve one or more of the same parties. Therefore, the two cases are related. See E.D. Tenn. L.R. 3.2(d)(3)(A)(2).Because the first of these cases was assigned to District Judge J. Ronnie Greer and Magistrate Judge Debra C. Poplin, this case will also be assigned to District Judge J. Ronnie Greer and Magistrate Judge Debra C. Poplin. However, consolidation is not ordered. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra C Poplin on 3/2/22. (ABF) (Entered: 03/02/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2022
  • DocketDistrict Judge J Ronnie Greer and Magistrate Judge Debra C Poplin added. (ABF) (Entered: 03/02/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Jessica F Salonus on behalf of S. B., M. K., M. S., T. W. (Salonus, Jessica) (Entered: 03/01/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2022
  • DocketNo summons received for Defendant M.S. Therefore, summons not issued as to M. S. (BJL) Modified on 3/1/2022 (BJL). (Entered: 03/01/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued as to S. B., M. K., T. W.. (BJL) (Entered: 03/01/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Deficiency (Pro Hac) for Attorneys Karin Sweigert,Mark Meuser and Ronald Coleman-Esqs. (BJL)*Mailed to Karin Sweigert,Mark Meuser and Ronald Coleman @ Dhillon Law Group Inc. 177 Post Street, Suite 700 San Francisco, CA 94108 (Entered: 03/01/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons Issued as to Knox County Board of Education,. (Attachments: #1 Summons Issued as to Bill Lee)(BJL) (Entered: 03/01/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2022
  • DocketAn email has been sent to Judge Poplin's Chambers to determine if this case is related to 3:21-cv-317-JRG-DCP. (BJL) (Entered: 03/01/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Knox County Board of Education ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATNEDC-4991344.), filed by M.A., a minor, through her parent M.A., Unmask Knox County Kids, C.G., a minor, through her parents, A.G. and J.G., K.M., a minor, through his parent L.M., K.A., a minor, through his parents C.A. and K.H.. (Attachments: #1 Summons - Knox County BOE, #2 Summons - MK, #3 Summons - MS, #4 Summons - SB, #5 Summons - TW, #6 Summons - Lee, #7 Other - Civil Cover Sheet)(Nelson, Jesse) (Entered: 02/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less