This case was last updated from PACER on 01/08/2021 at 09:02:51 (UTC).

UNM Rainforest Innovations v. Globalfoundries Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 11/09/2020 UNM Rainforest Innovations filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Globalfoundries Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Alan D Albright. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:20-MC-01060

  • Filing Date:

    11/09/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Alan D Albright

 

Party Details

Counter Defendant, Plaintiff and Respondent

UNM Rainforest Innovations

Petitioner

Advanced Micro Devices, Inc.

Counter Plaintiffs and Defendants

Globalfoundries U.S. Inc.

Globalfoundries Inc.

Globalfoundries U.S. 2 LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Counter Defendant, Plaintiff and Respondent Attorneys

Samuel E. Joyner

Attorney at Shore Chan DePumpo LLP

901 Main Street, Suite 3300

Dallas, TX 75202

Charles L. Ainsworth

Attorney at Parker, Bunt & Ainsworth, P.C.

100 East Ferguson, Suite 418

Tyler, TX 75702

Robert Christopher Bunt

Attorney at Parker, Bunt & Ainsworth, P.C.

100 East Ferguson, Ste. 1114

Tyler, TX 75702

Corey Martin Lipschutz

Attorney at Shore Chan DePumpo LLP

901 Main Street, Suite 3300

Dallas, TX 75202

Alfonso Garcia Chan

Attorney at Shore Chan LLP

901 Main Street, Suite 3300

Dallas, TX 75202

Thomas V. DelRosario

Attorney at Susman Godfrey LLP

1000 Louisiana St., Suite 5100

Houston, TX 77002

John P. Lahad

Attorney at Susman Godfrey, L.L.P.

1000 Louisiana Street, Suite 5100

Houston, TX 77002

Alejandra C. Salinas

Attorney at Susman Godfrey, LLP

1000 Louisiana Street, Suite 5100

Houston, TX 77002

Brian D. Melton

Attorney at Susman Godfrey LLP

1000 Louisiana Street - Suite 5100

Houston, TX 77002-5096

Michael W. Shore

Attorney at Shore Chan DePumpo LLP

901 Main Street, Suite 3300

Dallas, TX 75202

Petitioner Attorneys

Ryan M. Pierce

Attorney at Reeves & Brightwell LLP

221 W. 6Th Street, Suite 1000

Austin, TX 78701

Aaron R. Fahrenkrog

Attorney at Robins Kaplan LLP

800 Lasalle Ave., Suite 2800

Minneapolis, MN 55402

Emily J. Tremblay

Attorney at Robins Kaplan LLP

800 Lasalle Avenue, Suite 2800

Minneapolis, MN 55402

Counter Plaintiff and Defendant Attorneys

Jack Wesley Hill

Attorney at Ward Smith & Hill, PLLC

1507 Bill Owens Pkwy

Longview, TX 75604

Anupam Sharma

Attorney at Covington & Burling LLP

3000 El Camino Real, 5 Palo Alto Square, 10Th Floor

Palo Alto, CA 94306

Thomas E. Garten

Attorney at Covington & Burling LLP

3000 El Camino Real, 5 Palo Alto Square, 10Th Floor

Palo Alto, CA 94306

Andrea L. Fair

Attorney at Ward, Smith & Hill, PLLC

Po Box 1231

Longview, TX 75606

 

Court Documents

#16

RESTRICTED

#15

RESTRICTED

#14

(#14) ORDER, Telephone Conference set for 11/30/2020 02:30 PM before Judge Alan D Albright. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (am) (Entered: 11/23/2020)

#13

(#13) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Ryan M. Pierce for Aaron R. Fahrenkrog ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-14205559) by on behalf of Advanced Micro Devices, Inc.. (Pierce, Ryan) (Entered: 11/20/2020)

#12

(#12) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Ryan M. Pierce for Emily J. Tremblay ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-14205513) by on behalf of Advanced Micro Devices, Inc.. (Pierce, Ryan) (Entered: 11/20/2020)

11 #1

Exhibit 1

#11

(#11) REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by Advanced Micro Devices, Inc., re #2 MOTION to Quash filed by Movant Advanced Micro Devices, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Pierce, Ryan) (Entered: 11/20/2020)

2 #10

Proposed Order

2 #9

Civil Cover Sheet and Receipt

2 #8

Exhibit 8

2 #6

Exhibit 6

2 #5

Exhibit 5

2 #4

Exhibit 4

2 #3

Exhibit 3

2 #1

Exhibit 1

#1

(#1) RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Advanced Micro Devices, Inc.. (Pierce, Ryan) (Entered: 11/09/2020)

21 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) Transcript filed of Proceedings held on 11-30-20, Proceedings Transcribed: Telephonic Motion Hearing. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Kristie Davis, Telephone number: 254-340-6114. Parties are notified of their duty to review the transcript to ensure compliance with the FRCP 5.2(a)/FRCrP 49.1(a). A copy may be purchased from the court reporter or viewed at the clerk's office public terminal. If redaction is necessary, a Notice of Redaction Request must be filed within 21 days. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made available via PACER without redaction after 90 calendar days. The clerk will mail a copy of this notice to parties not electronically noticed Redaction Request due 12/29/2020, Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/8/2021, Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/8/2021, (kd) (Entered: 12/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Alan D Albright: Motion Hearing held on 11/30/2020 re #2 MOTION to Quash filed by Advanced Micro Devices, Inc. Case called for Motion Hearing. The Court heard argument regarding quashing the subpoena. The Court orally DENIED the motion to quash. The Court clarified that when a party issues a subpeona they need to let the other side know so that they may cross-subpoena and question the witness as well. The Court wants the deposition done before Christmas. (Minute entry documents are not available electronically.). (Court Reporter Kristie Davis.)(lad) (Entered: 11/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) ORDER, Telephone Conference set for 11/30/2020 02:30 PM before Judge Alan D Albright. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (am) (Entered: 11/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketText Order GRANTING #13 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Before the Court is the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. The Court, having reviewed the Motion, finds it should be GRANTED and therefore orders as follows: IT IS ORDERED the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Applicant, if he/she has not already done so, shall immediately tender the amount of $100.00, made payable to: Clerk, U.S. District Court, in compliance with Local Rule AT-I (f)(2). Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. entered by Judge Alan D Albright. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (hs) (Entered: 11/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketText Order GRANTING #12 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Before the Court is the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. The Court, having reviewed the Motion, finds it should be GRANTED and therefore orders as follows: IT IS ORDERED the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Applicant, if he/she has not already done so, shall immediately tender the amount of $100.00, made payable to: Clerk, U.S. District Court, in compliance with Local Rule AT-I (f)(2). Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. entered by Judge Alan D Albright. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (hs) (Entered: 11/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Ryan M. Pierce for Aaron R. Fahrenkrog ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-14205559) by on behalf of Advanced Micro Devices, Inc.. (Pierce, Ryan) (Entered: 11/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Ryan M. Pierce for Emily J. Tremblay ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-14205513) by on behalf of Advanced Micro Devices, Inc.. (Pierce, Ryan) (Entered: 11/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by Advanced Micro Devices, Inc., re #2 MOTION to Quash filed by Movant Advanced Micro Devices, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Pierce, Ryan) (Entered: 11/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2020
  • DocketCASE NO LONGER REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. (lad) (Entered: 11/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • DocketCASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Jeffrey C. Manske.. Referral Judge: Jeffrey C. Manske. (lad) (Entered: 11/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 11/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) DEFICIENCY NOTICE: re #6 Attachment (jv2) (Entered: 11/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ATTACHMENT Exhibit 1 to Advanced Micro Devices, Inc.'s Notice Regarding Certificate of Conference to #4 Notice (Other), by Advanced Micro Devices, Inc.. (Pierce, Ryan) (Entered: 11/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER REFERRING MOTIONS: #2 MOTION to Quash filed by Advanced Micro Devices, Inc. and #3 Unopposed MOTION to Transfer Case filed by UNM Rainforest Innovations. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. Referral Magistrate Judge: Susan Hightower. (jv2) (Entered: 11/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE Regarding Certificate of Conference Filed with Motion for Intra-District Transfer by Advanced Micro Devices, Inc. re #3 Unopposed MOTION to Transfer Case AMD's Motion to Quash Deposition Subpoena to the Waco Division (Pierce, Ryan) (Entered: 11/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Unopposed MOTION to Transfer Case AMD's Motion to Quash Deposition Subpoena to the Waco Division by UNM Rainforest Innovations. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting UNMRI's Unopposed Motion for Intra-district Transfer of AMD's Motion to Quash Deposition Subpoena to the Waco Division)(Joyner, Samuel) (Entered: 11/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • DocketIf ordered by the court, all referrals and consents in this case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Hightower (cj) (Entered: 11/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Judge Robert Pitman. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (cj) (Entered: 11/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Judge Robert Pitman. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (cj) (Entered: 11/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MOTION to Quash ($47 Filing Fee #100039282) by Advanced Micro Devices, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Civil Cover Sheet and Receipt, #10 Proposed Order)(cj) (Entered: 11/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Advanced Micro Devices, Inc.. (Pierce, Ryan) (Entered: 11/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Advanced Micro Devices, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where GLOBALFOUNDRIES, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Ryan M. Pierce

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Emily J Tremblay