This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/10/2019 at 08:02:46 (UTC).

UNIVEST CAPITAL, INC. v. TRAILPODS ACCEPTANCE CORPORATION et al

Case Summary

On 07/12/2019 UNIVEST CAPITAL, INC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against TRAILPODS ACCEPTANCE CORPORATION. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is JOEL H. SLOMSKY. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-03038

  • Filing Date:

    07/12/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Courthouse:

    Pennsylvania Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

JOEL H. SLOMSKY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

UNIVEST CAPITAL, INC.

Defendants

DOES 1-10

MICHAEL FRANK

COWS USA, LLC

TRAILPODS ACCEPTANCE CORPORATION

J J J J HOLDINGS, LLC

ANA FRANK

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

SAMUEL B. FINEMAN

Attorney at COHEN FINEMAN LLC

Five Greentree Centre Suite 302, 525 Route 73 North

Marlton, NJ 08053

WILLIAM R. HINCHMAN

Attorney at KLEHR HARRISON HARVEY BRANZBURG LLP

1835 Market St Ste 1400

Philadelphia, PA 19103

Defendant Attorney

FRANK E. NOYES, II

Attorney at OFFIT KURMAN PA

1801 Market St Suite 2300

Philadelphia, PA 19103

 

Court Documents

5 #1

Certificate of Service

#5

(#5) NOTICE by UNIVEST CAPITAL, INC. of Substitution of Counsel, Certificate of Service. Appearance of William R. Hinchman, and Withdrawal of Samuel B. Fineman. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(HINCHMAN, WILLIAM) Modified on 9/5/2019 (md). (Entered: 09/03/2019)

#4

(#4) STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT DEFENDANTS' COWS USA, LLC, ANA FRANK, MICHAEL FRANK, AND J J J J HOLDINGS, LLC ARE GRANTED AN EXTENSION OF TIME, UP TO AND INCLUDING 9/18/2019 WITHIN WHICH TO ANSWER OR OTHERWISE PLEAD TO THE COMPLAINT. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOEL H. SLOMSKY ON 8/28/2019. 8/29/2019 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(amas) (Entered: 08/29/2019)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by FRANK E. NOYES, II on behalf of COWS USA, LLC, ANA FRANK, MICHAEL FRANK, J J J J HOLDINGS, LLC with Certificate of Service(NOYES, FRANK) (Entered: 08/21/2019)

#2

(#2) Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 Identifying Corporate Parent UNIVEST BANK AND TRUST COMPANY (UVSP ON NASDAQ) for UNIVEST CAPITAL, INC.. by UNIVEST CAPITAL, INC..(amas) (Entered: 07/15/2019)

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet , DESIGNATION FORM, CASE MANAGEMENT TRACK FORM

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against COWS USA, LLC, DOES 1-10, ANA FRANK, MICHAEL FRANK, J J J J HOLDINGS, LLC, TRAILPODS ACCEPTANCE CORPORATION ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 200359.), filed by UNIVEST CAPITAL, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, DESIGNATION FORM, CASE MANAGEMENT TRACK FORM)(amas) (Entered: 07/15/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE by UNIVEST CAPITAL, INC. of Substitution of Counsel, Certificate of Service. Appearance of William R. Hinchman, and Withdrawal of Samuel B. Fineman. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(HINCHMAN, WILLIAM) Modified on 9/5/2019 (md). (Entered: 09/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT DEFENDANTS' COWS USA, LLC, ANA FRANK, MICHAEL FRANK, AND J J J J HOLDINGS, LLC ARE GRANTED AN EXTENSION OF TIME, UP TO AND INCLUDING 9/18/2019 WITHIN WHICH TO ANSWER OR OTHERWISE PLEAD TO THE COMPLAINT. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOEL H. SLOMSKY ON 8/28/2019. 8/29/2019 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(amas) (Entered: 08/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE of Appearance by FRANK E. NOYES, II on behalf of COWS USA, LLC, ANA FRANK, MICHAEL FRANK, J J J J HOLDINGS, LLC with Certificate of Service(NOYES, FRANK) (Entered: 08/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2019
  • 5 Summons Issued as to COWS USA, LLC, ANA FRANK, MICHAEL FRANK, J J J J HOLDINGS, LLC, TRAILPODS ACCEPTANCE CORPORATION. Forwarded To: PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL on 7/15/2019 (amas) (Entered: 07/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 Identifying Corporate Parent UNIVEST BANK AND TRUST COMPANY (UVSP ON NASDAQ) for UNIVEST CAPITAL, INC.. by UNIVEST CAPITAL, INC..(amas) (Entered: 07/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against COWS USA, LLC, DOES 1-10, ANA FRANK, MICHAEL FRANK, J J J J HOLDINGS, LLC, TRAILPODS ACCEPTANCE CORPORATION ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 200359.), filed by UNIVEST CAPITAL, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, DESIGNATION FORM, CASE MANAGEMENT TRACK FORM)(amas) (Entered: 07/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Univest Capital, Inc. is a litigant