This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/25/2022 at 08:40:33 (UTC).

UNIVERSITY OF PITTSBURGH OF THE COMMONWEALTH SYSTEM OF HIGHER EDUCATION v. PACS1 SYNDROME RESEARCH FOUNDATION

Case Summary

On 04/26/2022 UNIVERSITY OF PITTSBURGH OF THE COMMONWEALTH SYSTEM OF HIGHER EDUCATION filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against PACS1 SYNDROME RESEARCH FOUNDATION. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Western District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Nora Barry Fischer. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:22-CV-00630

  • Filing Date:

    04/26/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Nora Barry Fischer

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

UNIVERSITY OF PITTSBURGH OF THE COMMONWEALTH SYSTEM OF HIGHER EDUCATION

Defendant

PACS1 SYNDROME RESEARCH FOUNDATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Thomas V. Gebler, Jr.

Attorney at Swartz Campbell

7Th Floor, 7Th Street

Pittsburgh, PA 15219

Shannon Huygens

Attorney at University of Pittsburgh

2400 Cathedral Of Learning, 4200 Fifth Avenue

Pittsburgh, PA 15260

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit A

1 #3

Exhibit B

1 #4

Exhibit C

1 #5

Exhibit D

1 #6

Exhibit E

#2

(#2) Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate, by UNIVERSITY OF PITTSBURGH OF THE COMMONWEALTH SYSTEM OF HIGHER EDUCATION. (Gebler, Thomas) (Entered: 04/28/2022)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Shannon Huygens on behalf of UNIVERSITY OF PITTSBURGH OF THE COMMONWEALTH SYSTEM OF HIGHER EDUCATION. (Huygens, Shannon) (Entered: 04/29/2022)

#4

(#4) ORDER RE: Rule 12(b) Motions (Details more fully stated in said order). Signed by Judge Nora Barry Fischer on 5/13/2022. (nt) (Entered: 05/13/2022)

#5

(#5) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by UNIVERSITY OF PITTSBURGH OF THE COMMONWEALTH SYSTEM OF HIGHER EDUCATION. PACS1 SYNDROME RESEARCH FOUNDATION waiver sent on 4/28/2022, answer due 6/27/2022. (Meyer, William) (Entered: 05/16/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by UNIVERSITY OF PITTSBURGH OF THE COMMONWEALTH SYSTEM OF HIGHER EDUCATION. PACS1 SYNDROME RESEARCH FOUNDATION waiver sent on 4/28/2022, answer due 6/27/2022. (Meyer, William) (Entered: 05/16/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER RE: Rule 12(b) Motions (Details more fully stated in said order). Signed by Judge Nora Barry Fischer on 5/13/2022. (nt) (Entered: 05/13/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Shannon Huygens on behalf of UNIVERSITY OF PITTSBURGH OF THE COMMONWEALTH SYSTEM OF HIGHER EDUCATION. (Huygens, Shannon) (Entered: 04/29/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate, by UNIVERSITY OF PITTSBURGH OF THE COMMONWEALTH SYSTEM OF HIGHER EDUCATION. (Gebler, Thomas) (Entered: 04/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re #1 Complaint. ERROR: Party did not file disclosure statement as required pursuant L.R. 7.1.1. CORRECTION: Attorney advised to file statement within 7 days. Disclosure Statement due by 5/5/2022. (lyk) (Entered: 04/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against PACS1 SYNDROME RESEARCH FOUNDATION (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $402, receipt number APAWDC-7070771), filed by UNIVERSITY OF PITTSBURGH OF THE COMMONWEALTH SYSTEM OF HIGHER EDUCATION. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E) (lyk) (Entered: 04/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where THE UNIVERSITY OF PITTSBURGH-OF THE COMMONWEALTH SYSTEM OF HIGHER EDUCATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Thomas V. Gebler, Jr.(Designation Retained)