University of Pittsburgh -- Of the Commonwealth System of Higher Education v. Cochlear Limited et al

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT AND JURY DEMAND ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0542-15258468). No Summons requested at this time, filed by University of Pittsburgh -- Of the Commonwealth System of Higher Education. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G)(Ainsworth, Charles) (Entered: 09/23/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 forwarded to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Ainsworth, Charles) (Entered: 09/23/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • DocketAll parties shall comply with the Standing Orders located at https://www.txwd.uscourts.gov/judges-information/standing-orders/. (lad) (Entered: 09/23/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by University of Pittsburgh -- Of the Commonwealth System of Higher Education. (Ainsworth, Charles) (Entered: 09/23/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by University of Pittsburgh -- Of the Commonwealth System of Higher Education. [as to Cochlear Americas] (Ainsworth, Charles) (Entered: 09/23/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by University of Pittsburgh -- Of the Commonwealth System of Higher Education. [as to Cochlear Clinical Services, LLC] (Ainsworth, Charles) (Entered: 09/23/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Summons Issued as to Cochlear Americas. (lad) (Entered: 09/23/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Summons Issued as to Cochlear Clinical Services, LLC. (lad) (Entered: 09/23/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Judge Alan D Albright. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (lad) (Entered: 09/23/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Raphael Denis Philippe Chabaneix on behalf of University of Pittsburgh -- Of the Commonwealth System of Higher Education . Attorney Raphael Denis Philippe Chabaneix added to party University of Pittsburgh -- Of the Commonwealth System of Higher Education (pty:pla) (Chabaneix, Raphael) (Entered: 09/28/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) SUMMONS Returned Executed by University of Pittsburgh -- Of the Commonwealth System of Higher Education. Cochlear Clinical Services, LLC served on 9/24/2021, answer due 10/15/2021. (Ainsworth, Charles) (Entered: 09/28/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) SUMMONS Returned Executed by University of Pittsburgh -- Of the Commonwealth System of Higher Education. Cochlear Americas served on 9/24/2021, answer due 10/15/2021. (Ainsworth, Charles) (Entered: 10/05/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Cochlear Americas, Cochlear Clinical Services, LLC, Cochlear Limited. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Bell, Fiona) (Entered: 10/07/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketText Order DENYING #11 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer for failure to comply with the August 11, 2021 Standing Order Regarding Joint or Unopposed Request to Change Deadlines entered by Judge Alan D Albright. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (RRlc) (Entered: 10/08/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) NOTICE of Agreed Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by Cochlear Americas, Cochlear Clinical Services, LLC, Cochlear Limited re #1 Complaint, (Bell, Fiona) (Entered: 10/08/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • DocketReset Deadlines: Cochlear Americas answer due 12/23/2021; Cochlear Clinical Services, LLC answer due 12/23/2021; Cochlear Limited answer due 12/23/2021. (jc5) (Entered: 10/12/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Standing Order Regarding Order Governing Proceedings Patent Cases. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (Entered: 10/13/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Fiona A. Bell B. Trent Webb ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-15351253) by on behalf of Cochlear Americas, Cochlear Clinical Services, LLC, Cochlear Limited. (Bell, Fiona) (Entered: 10/19/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Fiona A. Bell John D. Garretson ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-15351330) by on behalf of Cochlear Americas, Cochlear Clinical Services, LLC, Cochlear Limited. (Bell, Fiona) (Entered: 10/19/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) NOTICE of Change of Address by Mark D. Siegmund (Siegmund, Mark) (Entered: 10/20/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) ORDER GRANTING #14 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney B. TRENT WEBB. Attorney added for Cochlear Americas, Cochlear Clinical Services, LLC, Cochlear Limited. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order, if he/she has not previously done so for a prior case in this District. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (jkda) (Entered: 10/21/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) ORDER GRANTING #15 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney JOHN D. GARRETSON. Attorney added for Cochlear Americas, Cochlear Clinical Services, LLC, Cochlear Limited. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order, if he/she has not previously done so for a prior case in this District. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (jkda) (Entered: 10/21/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less