This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/25/2020 at 08:10:53 (UTC).

UNIVERSAL PROPERTY SERVICES, INC. v. LEHIGH GAS WHOLESALE SERVICES, INC. et al

Case Summary

On 03/26/2020 UNIVERSAL PROPERTY SERVICES, INC filed an Other lawsuit against LEHIGH GAS WHOLESALE SERVICES, INC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New Jersey District. The Judges overseeing this case are Tonianne J. Bongiovanni and Freda L. Wolfson. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-03315

  • Filing Date:

    03/26/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Tonianne J. Bongiovanni

Presiding Judge

Freda L. Wolfson

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

UNIVERSAL PROPERTY SERVICES, INC.

Syed Kazmi

Defendants

LEHIGH GAS WHOLESALE LLC

LEHIGH GAS WHOLESALE SERVICES, INC.

LGP REALTY HOLDINGS LP

Circle K Stores, Inc.

TMC FRANCHISE CORP.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KENNETH L. LEIBY, JR.

159 Millburn Avenue

Millburn, NJ 07041-1849

Defendant Attorneys

JENNINE DISOMMA

Attorney at SAIBER LLC

18 Columbia Turnpike, Suite 200

Florham Park, NJ 07932

JAKOB BENJAMIN HALPERN

Attorney at SAIBER LLC

One Gateway Center, 10Th Floor

Newark, NJ 07102-5311

CATHERINE MAGDY SOLIMAN

Attorney at SAIBER LLC

18 Columbia Turnpike, Suite 200

Florham Park, NJ 07932

MATTHEW J. FEDOR

Attorney at Faegre Drinker Biddle & Reath LLP

600 Campus Drive

Florham Park, NJ 07932

 

Court Documents

#20

#19

17 #4

Certificate of Service

17 #3

Text of Proposed Order

17 #2

Declaration of Brendan O'Toole in support of pro hac vice admission

17 #1

Declaration of Otto Konrad in support of pro hac vice admission

#17

#16

#15

#14

#13

#12

#11

#10

#9

#8

#7

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/22/2020
  • Docket(#21) TEXT ORDER: In light of the current pandemic involving COVID-19, a paper Order regarding requests to be admitted pro hac vice submitted by Michael Einbinder, Esq., and Mackenzie L. Dimitri, Esq., shall not be entered. Instead, this entry shall serve to adopt the proposed consent order submitted to Chambers on May 22, 2020. Mr. Einbinder and Ms. Dimitri are directed to comply with all of the terms outlined in that order. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni.(mm) (Entered: 05/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2020
  • DocketPro Hac Vice counsel, BRENDAN O'TOOLE, has been added to receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Pursuant to L.Civ.R. 101.1, only local counsel are entitled to sign and file papers, enter appearances and receive payments on judgments, decrees or orders. (jmh) (Entered: 05/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Brendan O'Toole to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number ANJDC-10847672.) (DISOMMA, JENNINE) (Entered: 05/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2020
  • DocketPro Hac Vice counsel, OTTO KONRAD, has been added to receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Pursuant to L.Civ.R. 101.1, only local counsel are entitled to sign and file papers, enter appearances and receive payments on judgments, decrees or orders. (jmh) (Entered: 05/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Otto Konrad to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number ANJDC-10847410.) (DISOMMA, JENNINE) (Entered: 05/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2020
  • Docket(#18) TEXT ORDER: In light of the current pandemic involving COVID-19, a paper Order regarding requests to be admitted pro hac vice submitted by Otto Konrad, Esq. and Brendan OToole, Esq., shall not be entered. Instead, this entry shall serve to adopt the proposed consent order submitted to Chambers on May 21, 2020. Messrs. Konrad and OToole are directed to comply with all of the terms outlined in that order. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni. (mm) (Entered: 05/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) APPLICATION/PETITION for Pro Hac Vice Admission of Cocounsel and Certification of Jennine DiSomma in support of same for by LEHIGH GAS WHOLESALE LLC, LEHIGH GAS WHOLESALE SERVICES, INC., LGP REALTY HOLDINGS LP. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Otto Konrad in support of pro hac vice admission, #2 Declaration of Brendan O'Toole in support of pro hac vice admission, #3 Text of Proposed Order, #4 Certificate of Service)(DISOMMA, JENNINE) (Entered: 05/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) NOTICE of Appearance by CATHERINE MAGDY SOLIMAN on behalf of LEHIGH GAS WHOLESALE LLC, LEHIGH GAS WHOLESALE SERVICES, INC., LGP REALTY HOLDINGS LP (SOLIMAN, CATHERINE) (Entered: 05/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) NOTICE of Appearance by JAKOB BENJAMIN HALPERN on behalf of LEHIGH GAS WHOLESALE LLC, LEHIGH GAS WHOLESALE SERVICES, INC., LGP REALTY HOLDINGS LP (HALPERN, JAKOB) (Entered: 05/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) NOTICE of Appearance by JENNINE DISOMMA on behalf of LEHIGH GAS WHOLESALE LLC, LEHIGH GAS WHOLESALE SERVICES, INC., LGP REALTY HOLDINGS LP (DISOMMA, JENNINE) (Entered: 05/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 04/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) JOINT STIPULATION AND ORDER that pursuant to the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, Rule 12(a)(1)(A)(i), and the Standing Order 2020-09, the time for the Circle K Defendants to answer or move with respect to the Amended complaint is 6/15/2020 Signed by Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni on 04/30/2020. (jmh) (Entered: 04/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SUMMONS ISSUED as to Circle K Stores, Inc., LEHIGH GAS WHOLESALE LLC, LEHIGH GAS WHOLESALE SERVICES, INC., LGP REALTY HOLDINGS LP, TMC FRANCHISE CORP.. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (jmh) (Entered: 04/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Letter re #5 Amended Complaint,. (LEIBY, KENNETH) (Entered: 04/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) AMENDED COMPLAINT AND JURY DEMAND against LEHIGH GAS WHOLESALE LLC, LEHIGH GAS WHOLESALE SERVICES, INC., LGP REALTY HOLDINGS LP, Circle K Stores, Inc., TMC FRANCHISE CORP., filed by UNIVERSAL PROPERTY SERVICES, INC., Syed Kazmi.(LEIBY, KENNETH) (Entered: 04/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Corporate Disclosure Statement by UNIVERSAL PROPERTY SERVICES, INC.. (LEIBY, KENNETH) (Entered: 03/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Exhibit to #1 Complaint, Case Information Statement by UNIVERSAL PROPERTY SERVICES, INC.. (LEIBY, KENNETH) (Entered: 03/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) SUMMONS ISSUED as to LEHIGH GAS WHOLESALE LLC, LEHIGH GAS WHOLESALE SERVICES, INC., LGP REALTY HOLDINGS LP. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (abr) (Entered: 03/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2020
  • DocketChief Judge Freda L. Wolfson and Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni added. (abr) (Entered: 03/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2020
  • DocketCLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The case you electronically filed has been processed, however, the following deficiencies were found: In the future when choosing parties please choose each party individually. Do NOT select the ALL PLAINTIFFS or ALL DEFENDANTS button. The Clerk's Office has made the appropriate changes. Please refer to the Attorney Case Opening Guide for processing electronically filed cases. (jjc, ) (Entered: 03/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against LEHIGH GAS WHOLESALE SERVICES, INC., LEHIGH GAS WHOLESALE LLC, LGP REALTY HOLDINGS LP ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number ANJDC-10610116) with JURY DEMAND, filed by UNIVERSAL PROPERTY SERVICES, INC..(LEIBY, KENNETH) Modified on 3/27/2020 (abr). (Entered: 03/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LEHIGH GAS WHOLESALE SERVICES, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where UNIVERSAL PROPERTY SERVICES INC is a litigant

Latest cases where TMC Franchise Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases where Circle K Stores Inc. is a litigant