This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/02/2020 at 08:52:37 (UTC).

Universal-Polygram International Publishing, Inc. et al v. Gabe's Oasis, L.L.C. et al

Case Summary

On 03/03/2020 Universal-Polygram International Publishing, Inc filed an Intellectual Property - Copyright lawsuit against Gabe's Oasis, L L C. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Iowa Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Helen C. Adams and James E. Gritzner. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-00021

  • Filing Date:

    03/03/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Copyright

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Helen C. Adams

James E. Gritzner

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

M.L.E. Music

Universal-Polygram International Publishing, Inc.

Songs of Peer LTD

Fixation Music, Inc.

Universal Music-Z Tunes, LLC

Defendants

Gabe's Oasis, L.L.C.

Scott Kading

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Eric G Hoch

Attorney at FINLEY LAW FIRM

699 Walnut Street, 1700 Hub Tower

Des Moines, IA 50309-3773

Defendant Attorney

Thomas E Maxwell

Attorney at LEFF LAW FIRM LLP

222 S Linn Street

Iowa City, IA 52240-1601

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Statement of Interest

#3

#4

#5

#7

#10

#11

#12

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCES. See Order for more particulars. Status Conference set for 7/10/2020 11:00 AM in Phone Hearing(HCA). Counsel shall call 1-877-336-1829 and enter code 1176783. Hearing will be held before Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams. Status Conference set for 9/9/2020 11:00 AM in Phone Hearing(HCA). Counsel shall call 1-877-336-1829 and enter code 1176783. Hearing will be held before Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams. Status Conference set for 11/9/2020 11:00 AM in Phone Hearing(HCA). Counsel shall call 1-877-336-1829 and enter code 1176783. Hearing will be held before Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams. Status Conference set for 1/7/2021 11:00 AM in Phone Hearing(HCA). Counsel shall call 1-877-336-1829 and enter code 1176783. Hearing will be held before Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams.. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams on 4/29/2020. (imk) (Entered: 04/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ORDER REGARDING FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE REQUIREMENTS. See Order for particulars. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams on 4/29/2020. (imk) (Entered: 04/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER adopting #7 PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER AND DISCOVERY PLAN: Initial Disclosures Deadline 5/8/2020. Motions to Add Parties due by 6/22/2020. Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 6/22/2020. Plaintiffs Expert Witness Disclosures due by 7/22/2020. Defendants Expert Witness Disclosures due by 9/22/2020. Plaintiffs Rebuttal Witness Disclosures due by 10/22/2020. Discovery Deadline 12/22/2020. Dispositive Motion Deadline 12/22/2020. Final Pretrial Conference set for 8/9/2021 10:00 AM in Davenport Courthouse before Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams. Bench Trial set for 8/30/2021 09:00 AM in Davenport Courthouse before Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams. Estimated length of three days. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams on 4/29/2020. (imk) (Entered: 04/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2020
  • Docket(#9) TEXT MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams: Scheduling Conference held on 4/29/2020. Attorney Eric Hoch appeared for plaintiffs. Attorney Thomas Maxwell appeared for defendants. Status of case discussed. Separate Orders to follow. Total Court Time: 12 minutes. (imk) (Entered: 04/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2020
  • DocketChief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams added. Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams and Senior Judge James E. Gritzner no longer assigned to case. (bp) (Entered: 04/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2020
  • Docket(#8) TEXT ORDER OF REFERENCE - CONSENT TO U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE: This matter is hereby referred to a U.S. Magistrate Judge for all further proceedings and entry of judgment in accordance with 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and the consent of the parties. Signed by Senior Judge James E. Gritzner on 4/22/2020. (nlh) (Entered: 04/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER AND DISCOVERY PLAN AND CONSENT TO PROCEED BEFORE A MAGISTRATE . (Hoch, Eric) (Main Document 7 replaced. Took off worksheet and resent NEF on 4/22/2020) (bp). (Entered: 04/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2020
  • Docket(#6) TEXT ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE. A Telephonic Scheduling Conference shall be held on 4/29/2020 at 10:00 AM before Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams. Counsel should call 1-877-336-1829 and enter access code 1176783 at the prompt to be joined with the call. The parties shall file a proposed scheduling order and discovery plan as provided under L.R. 16 by 4/22/2020. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams on 3/31/2020. (imk) (Entered: 03/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ANSWER to Complaint by Gabe's Oasis, L.L.C., Scott Kading.(Maxwell, Thomas) (Entered: 03/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2020
  • DocketSet Deadline: Corporate Disclosure Statement deadline set for defendant, Gabe's Oasis, L.L.C., 4/8/2020. (rav) (Entered: 03/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Universal Music-Z Tunes, LLC, Fixation Music, Inc., Universal-Polygram International Publishing, Inc., Songs of Peer LTD, M.L.E. Music. Gabe's Oasis, L.L.C. served on 3/9/2020, answer due 3/30/2020. (Hoch, Eric) (Entered: 03/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) REPORT REGARDING COPYRIGHT mailed to registrar. (rav) (Entered: 03/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet. Note: Counsel should download the attached summons and/or corporate disclosure packet, if applicable. In compliance with Rule 4 of the Rules of Civil Procedure for summons and Local Rule 7.1 for the disclosure statements. Corporate Disclosure Statement deadline set for Plaintiff 3/26/2020. (Attachments: #1 Corporate Disclosure Packet) (rav) (Entered: 03/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT 3:20-cv-00021 against All Defendants Filing fee paid in the amount of $ 400, receipt number 0863-4077007., filed by UNIVERSAL MUSIC Z TUNES, FIXATION MUSIC INC, Universal Polygram International Publishing Inc., SONGS OF PEER LTD, MLE MUSIC. Notice of Dismissal for lack of Service deadline set for 6/1/2020. Rule 16 Notice of Dismissal set for 6/1/2020. (Attachments: #1 Statement of Interest)(Hoch, Eric) (Entered: 03/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Universal Music-Z Tunes LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Songs of Peer, Ltd. is a litigant

Latest cases where Universal Polygram International Publising, Inc. is a litigant