This case was last updated from PACER on 05/02/2020 at 09:03:41 (UTC).

Universal Music Corporation et al v Ace-3 Nightclub LLC et al

Case Summary

On 03/03/2020 Universal Music Corporation filed an Intellectual Property - Copyright lawsuit against Ace-3 Nightclub LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is James Wesley Hendrix. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-00045

  • Filing Date:

    03/03/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Copyright

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

James Wesley Hendrix

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Lit Up Music

Universal Music Corporation

Hori Productions America Inc

Desmobile Inc

Defendants

Jason Sanchez

Ace-3 Nightclub LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Abigail Kaitlin Drake

Attorney at Foley Gardere / Foley & Lardner LLP

2021 Mckinney Avenue, Suite 1600

Dallas, TX 75201

Stacy R. Obenhaus

Attorney at Gardere Wynne Sewell LLP

2021 Mckinney Avenue, Suite 1600

Dallas, TX 75201-4761

 

Court Documents

8 #1

Proposed Order Order extending answer deadline

#8

(#8) Agreed STIPULATION Extending Time for Filing Answer by Desmobile Inc, Hori Productions America Inc, Lit Up Music, Universal Music Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Order extending answer deadline) (Obenhaus, Stacy) (Entered: 04/29/2020)

#7

(#7) **DISREGARD - FILED IN ERROR, See #8 ** Agreed STIPULATION Extending Time for Filing Answer by Desmobile Inc, Hori Productions America Inc, Lit Up Music, Universal Music Corporation. (Obenhaus, Stacy) Modified on 4/28/2020- filer to submit an updated document. Counsel for defense listed on this document contacted regarding the filing of an NOA (jak). Modified on 4/29/2020 (jak). (Entered: 04/28/2020)

#6

(#6) Civil Cover Sheet by Plaintiff Universal Music Corporation. (Leonard, Thomas) (Entered: 03/03/2020)

#5

(#5) Report to Copyright Office of Initiating Document. Form AO 121 e-mailed to 508filings@loc.gov. (jak) (Entered: 03/03/2020)

#4

(#4) Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (jak) (Entered: 03/03/2020)

#2

(#2) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Universal Music Corporation. (Obenhaus, Stacy) (Entered: 03/03/2020)

1 #1

Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against Ace-3 Nightclub LLC, Jason Sanchez filed by Universal Music Corporation. (Filing fee $400; Receipt number 0539-10669456) Clerk to issue summons(es). In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet) (Obenhaus, Stacy) (Entered: 03/03/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Agreed STIPULATION Extending Time for Filing Answer by Desmobile Inc, Hori Productions America Inc, Lit Up Music, Universal Music Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Order extending answer deadline) (Obenhaus, Stacy) (Entered: 04/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) **DISREGARD - FILED IN ERROR, See #8 ** Agreed STIPULATION Extending Time for Filing Answer by Desmobile Inc, Hori Productions America Inc, Lit Up Music, Universal Music Corporation. (Obenhaus, Stacy) Modified on 4/28/2020- filer to submit an updated document. Counsel for defense listed on this document contacted regarding the filing of an NOA (jak). Modified on 4/29/2020 (jak). (Entered: 04/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Civil Cover Sheet by Plaintiff Universal Music Corporation. (Leonard, Thomas) (Entered: 03/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Report to Copyright Office of Initiating Document. Form AO 121 e-mailed to 508filings@loc.gov. (jak) (Entered: 03/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (jak) (Entered: 03/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • Docket(#3) New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. (jak) (Entered: 03/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Universal Music Corporation. (Obenhaus, Stacy) (Entered: 03/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against Ace-3 Nightclub LLC, Jason Sanchez filed by Universal Music Corporation. (Filing fee $400; Receipt number 0539-10669456) Clerk to issue summons(es). In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet) (Obenhaus, Stacy) (Entered: 03/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less