This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/29/2022 at 07:43:38 (UTC).

Universal Dyeing and Printing, Inc. v. Li Zhangmin et al

Case Summary

On 02/28/2022 Universal Dyeing and Printing, Inc filed an Intellectual Property - Copyright lawsuit against Li Zhangmin. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are George H. Wu and Michael R. Wilner. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:22-CV-01373

  • Filing Date:

    02/28/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Copyright

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

George H. Wu

Referral Judge

Michael R. Wilner

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Universal Dyeing & Printing, Inc.

Universal Dyeing and Printing, Inc.

Defendants

Li Zhangmin

DOES 1 through 10

Li Zhangmin an individual or business entity of unknown form doing business as Aopostall

Yetaojin

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Stephen M. Doniger

Attorney at Doniger Burroughs

603 Rose Avenue

Venice, CA 90291

Benjamin Firestone Tookey

Attorney at Doniger Burroughs APC

603 Rose Avenue

Venice, CA 90291

 

Court Documents

#19

(#19) STANDING ORDER RE FINAL PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCES FOR CIVIL JURY TRIALS BEFORE JUDGE GEORGE H. WU by Judge George H. Wu: 1. You are instructed to read and to follow (unless otherwise superseded herein) the Central District of California Local Rules (henceforth "Local Rules") 16-1 through 16-15 regarding pre-trial requirements. (see document for further details) (bm) (Entered: 04/18/2022)

#18

(#18) NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT of MJDAP case from Magistrate Judge Steve Kim to Judge George H. Wu for all further proceedings. Any discovery matters that may be referred to a Magistrate Judge are assigned to U.S. Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judges 2:22-cv-01373-GW(MRWx). (ap) (Entered: 04/15/2022)

#17

(#17) STATEMENT OF CONSENT TO PROCEED before the assigned Magistrate Judge filed by Plaintiff Universal Dyeing and Printing, Inc.. (Doniger, Stephen) (Entered: 03/28/2022)

#16

(#16) REMINDER NOTICE re Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program. Each party must file form CV-11C within the consent deadlines pursuant to L.R. 73-2. Additionally, the parties are directed to L.R. 73-2.2 Proof of Service. In any case in which only a magistrate judge is initially assigned, plaintiff must file a proof of service within 10 days of service of the summons and complaint as to each defendant. (hr) (Entered: 03/28/2022)

#15

(#15) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Universal Dyeing and Printing, Inc.. upon Li Zhangmin waiver sent by Plaintiff on 3/22/2022, answer due 6/21/2022. Waiver of Service signed by Li Zhangmin. (Doniger, Stephen) (Entered: 03/25/2022)

#14

(#14) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Amended Complaint #12 as to Defendants Li Zhangmin, Yetaojin. (hr) (Entered: 03/17/2022)

#13

(#13) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Amended Complaint/Petition #12 filed by Plaintiff Universal Dyeing and Printing, Inc.. (Doniger, Stephen) (Entered: 03/17/2022)

#12

(#12) FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendants Does, Li Zhangmin, Yetaojin amending Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 , filed by Plaintiff Universal Dyeing and Printing, Inc.(Doniger, Stephen) (Entered: 03/17/2022)

11 #1

Exhibit A - Email Chain

11 #11

Main Document

#10

(#10) ORDER AUTHORIZING ALTERNATE MEANS OF SERVICE ON DEFENDANT by Magistrate Judge Steve Kim: granting #8 EX PARTE APPLICATION. Plaintiff may serve the Summons, Complaint, and a copy of this Order upon Defendant by transmitting said documents to the following email address: a. gtpsiq266@163.com. Service shall be deemed proper and complete upon a successful transmittal of legal process to the above email address. (hr) (Entered: 03/03/2022)

8 #6

Proposed Order

8 #5

Exhibit 4 to Doniger DL

8 #4

Exhibit 3 to Doniger DL

8 #3

Exhibit 2 to Doniger DL

8 #1

Declaration of Stephen M. Doniger

8 #8

Main Document

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-32865115 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff Universal Dyeing & Printing, Inc.. (Attorney Stephen M. Doniger added to party Universal Dyeing & Printing, Inc.(pty:pla))(Doniger, Stephen) (Entered: 02/28/2022)

15 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) STANDING ORDER RE FINAL PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCES FOR CIVIL JURY TRIALS BEFORE JUDGE GEORGE H. WU by Judge George H. Wu: 1. You are instructed to read and to follow (unless otherwise superseded herein) the Central District of California Local Rules (henceforth "Local Rules") 16-1 through 16-15 regarding pre-trial requirements. (see document for further details) (bm) (Entered: 04/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT of MJDAP case from Magistrate Judge Steve Kim to Judge George H. Wu for all further proceedings. Any discovery matters that may be referred to a Magistrate Judge are assigned to U.S. Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judges 2:22-cv-01373-GW(MRWx). (ap) (Entered: 04/15/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) STATEMENT OF CONSENT TO PROCEED before the assigned Magistrate Judge filed by Plaintiff Universal Dyeing and Printing, Inc.. (Doniger, Stephen) (Entered: 03/28/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) REMINDER NOTICE re Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program. Each party must file form CV-11C within the consent deadlines pursuant to L.R. 73-2. Additionally, the parties are directed to L.R. 73-2.2 Proof of Service. In any case in which only a magistrate judge is initially assigned, plaintiff must file a proof of service within 10 days of service of the summons and complaint as to each defendant. (hr) (Entered: 03/28/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Universal Dyeing and Printing, Inc.. upon Li Zhangmin waiver sent by Plaintiff on 3/22/2022, answer due 6/21/2022. Waiver of Service signed by Li Zhangmin. (Doniger, Stephen) (Entered: 03/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Amended Complaint #12 as to Defendants Li Zhangmin, Yetaojin. (hr) (Entered: 03/17/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Amended Complaint/Petition #12 filed by Plaintiff Universal Dyeing and Printing, Inc.. (Doniger, Stephen) (Entered: 03/17/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendants Does, Li Zhangmin, Yetaojin amending Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 , filed by Plaintiff Universal Dyeing and Printing, Inc.(Doniger, Stephen) (Entered: 03/17/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Universal Dyeing and Printing, Inc., upon Defendant Li Zhangmin served on 3/3/2022, answer due 3/24/2022. in compliance with statute not specified by method of service not specified.Original Summons NOT returned. (in compliance with Court's March 3, 2022 Order (Dkt. 10)) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Email Chain)(Doniger, Stephen) (Entered: 03/03/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER AUTHORIZING ALTERNATE MEANS OF SERVICE ON DEFENDANT by Magistrate Judge Steve Kim: granting #8 EX PARTE APPLICATION. Plaintiff may serve the Summons, Complaint, and a copy of this Order upon Defendant by transmitting said documents to the following email address: a. gtpsiq266@163.com. Service shall be deemed proper and complete upon a successful transmittal of legal process to the above email address. (hr) (Entered: 03/03/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiff Universal Dyeing and Printing, Inc., re EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order for AUTHORIZING ALTERNATE MEANS OF SERVICE ON DEFENDANT LI ZHANGMIN #8 served on March 2, 2022. (Doniger, Stephen) (Entered: 03/02/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order for AUTHORIZING ALTERNATE MEANS OF SERVICE ON DEFENDANT LI ZHANGMIN filed by Plaintiff Universal Dyeing and Printing, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Stephen M. Doniger, #2 Exhibit 1 to Doniger DL, #3 Exhibit 2 to Doniger DL, #4 Exhibit 3 to Doniger DL, #5 Exhibit 4 to Doniger DL, #6 Proposed Order) (Doniger, Stephen) (Entered: 03/02/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Li Zhangmin. (ghap) (Entered: 03/01/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE TO COUNSEL re Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program. This case has been randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Steve Kim. (Attachments: #1 CV-11C Statement of Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge) (ghap) (Entered: 03/01/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Universal Dyeing & Printing, Inc.. (Doniger, Stephen) (Entered: 02/28/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION regarding a copyright (Initial Notification) filed by Universal Dyeing & Printing, Inc.. (Doniger, Stephen) (Entered: 02/28/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Universal Dyeing & Printing, Inc., (Doniger, Stephen) (Entered: 02/28/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Universal Dyeing & Printing, Inc.. (Doniger, Stephen) (Entered: 02/28/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-32865115 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff Universal Dyeing & Printing, Inc.. (Attorney Stephen M. Doniger added to party Universal Dyeing & Printing, Inc.(pty:pla))(Doniger, Stephen) (Entered: 02/28/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Universal Dyeing & Printing Inc is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Benjamin Firestone Tookey

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Stephen M Doniger