This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/21/2022 at 06:04:54 (UTC).

Universal City Studios Productions LLLP et al v. Dwayne Anthony Johnson et al

Case Summary

On December 2, 2021, Universal City Studios Productions LLLP (“UCSP”), Universal City Studios LLC, Universal Television LLC, Universal Content Productions LLC, Dreamworks Animation LLC and Ors (collectively, “Plaintiffs”), represented by Sean M. Sullivan of Davis Wright Tremaine LLP, filed an intellectual property lawsuit against Dwayne Anthony Johnson (“Johnson”) d/b/a AllAccessTV (“AATV”) and Quality Restreams, and DOES 1-20 (collectively, “Defendants”), seeking injunctive relief, damages, and prejudgment interest, among other relief, for the alleged copyright infringement by Defendants. This case was filed in the United States District Court in the Central District of California with Judges Andre Birotte Jr. and Michael R. Wilner presiding. 

 

In the complaint, Plaintiffs alleged that, “Defendants have infringed and continue to infringe Plaintiffs’ Copyrighted Works by violating Plaintiffs’ exclusive rights to publicly perform and reproduce the Copyrighted Works. Without Plaintiffs’ authorization, Defendants (a) publicly perform Plaintiffs’ Copyrighted Works listed on Exhibit A, as well as many other works owned or exclusively controlled by Plaintiffs, by transmitting performances of the Copyrighted Works over the Internet to AATV and Quality Restreams customers; and (b) reproduce the Copyrighted Works in connection with multiple offerings, including, but not limited to, the infringing services’ VOD service and 24/7 channels. Defendants’ acts of infringement are willful, in disregard of and with indifference to Plaintiffs’ rights.”

 

Plaintiffs further alleged that, “Defendants have actual knowledge of the third parties’ infringement. Defendants systematically amassed from third parties thousands of channels, including 24/7 channels, which contain Copyrighted Works that necessarily were reproduced before being compiled into endless loops of curated content. Defendants know these third parties did not have authorization to create the copies of these works.”

 

Plaintiffs also alleged that, “To the extent Defendants claim third parties are exercising Plaintiffs’ exclusive public performance and reproduction rights under the Copyright Act, Defendants induce such infringement by supplying and promoting the use of the AATV and Quality Restreams services to resellers and connecting customers to unauthorized online sources that stream Plaintiffs’ copyrighted works, and by actively inducing, encouraging, and promoting the use of Quality Restreams and AATV for copyright infringement. Defendants’ intentional inducement of the infringement of each Copyrighted Work constitutes a separate and distinct act of infringement.”

 

There are three claims for relief laid down by Plaintiffs for the alleged copyright infringement by Defendants.

 

In the prayer for relief, Plaintiffs have requested the court for a judgment for preliminary and permanent injunctive relief, along with an award for damages alternatively, at Plaintiffs’ election, for maximum statutory damages, or for such other amounts as may be proper pursuant to 17 U.S.C. § 504(c). Further, Plaintiffs have requested the court for an accounting, the imposition of a constructive trust, restitution of Defendants’ unlawful proceeds from copyright infringement, and damages according to proof. Plaintiffs also requested the court for a declaration that Defendants’ activities as alleged herein constitute direct and secondary copyright infringement of Plaintiffs’ exclusive rights under copyright in violation of 17 U.S.C. § 106, together with prejudgment interest, including attorneys’ fees and costs of suit incurred in this action pursuant to 17 U.S.C. § 505 and any other relief the court deems just.

 

This case summary may not reflect the current position of the parties to this litigation or the status of this case. Sign up to view the latest case updates and court documents.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-09361

  • Filing Date:

    12/02/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Copyright

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Andre Birotte Jr

Referral Judge

Michael R. Wilner

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Universal City Studios Productions LLLP

Universal City Studios LLC

Universal Television LLC

Universal Content Productions LLC

Dreamworks Animation LLC

Disney Enterprises, Inc.

Paramount Pictures Corporation

Amazon Content Services LLC

Apple Video Programming LLC

Warner Bros. Entertainment Inc.

Netflix US, LLC

Columbia Pictures Industries, Inc.

Screen Gem, Inc.

Defendants

Dwayne Anthony Johnson d/b/a Allaccesstv

Quality Restreams

DOES 1 through 20

Dwayne Anthony Johnson doing business as Allaccesstv

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Arleen Fernandez

Attorney at Davis Wright Tremaine LLP

865 South Figueroa Street Suite 2400

Los Angeles, CA 90017

Samantha Whitney Lachman

Attorney at Davis Wright Tremaine LLP

865 South Figueroa Street Suite 2400

Los Angeles, CA 90017

Elizabeth A. McNamara

Attorney at Davis Wright Tremaine LLP

1251 Avenue Of The Americas, 21St Floor

New York, NY 10020

Sean M Sullivan

Attorney at Davis Wright Tremaine LLP

865 South Figueroa Street Suite 2400

Los Angeles, CA 90017-2566

Defendant Attorneys

Glenn T Litwak

Attorney at Law Offices of Glenn T Litwak

201 Santa Monica Boulevard Suite 300

Santa Monica, CA 90401

Jennifer M. Rynell

Attorney at Wilson Whitaker Rynell, Wilson Legal Group PC

16610 Dallas Parkway, Suite 1000

Dallas, TX 75248

John T. Wilson

Attorney at Wilson Whitaker Rynell, Wilson Legal Group PC

16610 Dallas Parkway, Suite 1000

Dallas, TX 75248

 

Court Documents

#48

(#48) ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. Scheduling Conference set for 6/3/2022 at 10:00 AM before Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (cb) (Entered: 03/21/2022)

#47

(#47) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Dwayne Anthony Johnson d/b/a AllAccessTV and Quality Restreams Dwayne Anthony Johnson, Quality Restreams, (Wilson, John) (Entered: 03/18/2022)

#46

(#46) ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,,,,, #1 filed by Defendant Dwayne Anthony Johnson d/b/a AllAccessTV and Quality Restreams Dwayne Anthony Johnson, Quality Restreams.(Wilson, John) (Entered: 03/18/2022)

#45

(#45) ORDER ISSUING PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION, PURSUANT TO PARTIES' STIPULATION by Judge Andre Birotte Jr.: Upon the parties' Joint Stipulation #44 , Defendant Dwayne Anthony Johnson d/b/a AllAccessTV and Quality Restreams ("Defendant"), and all persons who are allegedly acting in active concert or participation with Defendant, ARE HEREBY PRELIMINARILY RESTRAINED AND ENJOINED re Plaintiffs' copyrighted works, etc. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiffs are not required to post a bond relating to the preliminary injunction. Moreover, this Order MOOTS Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction #14 . The associated hearing, set for 2/18/2022, is therefore vacated. See document for further details. (gk) (Entered: 02/17/2022)

44 #1

Proposed Order

44 #44

Main Document

43 #4

Exhibit 3

14 #1

Proposed Order

14 #14

Main Document

#8

(#8) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Andre Birotte Jr and Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. (jtil) (Entered: 12/07/2021)

#7

(#7) NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Notice of Appearance,,,,,, #6 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Notice of Appearance of Withdrawal of Counsel G123.. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (ak) (Entered: 12/06/2021)

#6

(#7) NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Notice of Appearance,,,,,, #6 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Notice of Appearance of Withdrawal of Counsel G123.. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (ak) (Entered: 12/06/2021)

#5

(#5) REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION regarding a copyright (Initial Notification) filed by Amazon Content Services LLC, Apple Video Programming LLC, Columbia Pictures Industries, Inc., Disney Enterprises, Inc., Dreamworks Animation LLC, Netflix US, LLC, Paramount Pictures Corporation, Screen Gem, Inc., Universal City Studios LLC, Universal City Studios Productions LLLP, Universal Content Productions LLC, Universal Television LLC, Warner Bros. Entertainment Inc.. (Sullivan, Sean) (Entered: 12/02/2021)

#4

(#4) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT and Notice of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiffs Amazon Content Services LLC, Apple Video Programming LLC, Columbia Pictures Industries, Inc., Disney Enterprises, Inc., Dreamworks Animation LLC, Netflix US, LLC, Paramount Pictures Corporation, Screen Gem, Inc., Universal City Studios LLC, Universal City Studios Productions LLLP, Universal Content Productions LLC, Universal Television LLC, Warner Bros. Entertainment Inc. (Sullivan, Sean) (Entered: 12/02/2021)

#3

(#3) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,,,,, #1 filed by Plaintiff Amazon Content Services LLC, Apple Video Programming LLC, Columbia Pictures Industries, Inc., Disney Enterprises, Inc., Dreamworks Animation LLC, Netflix US, LLC, Paramount Pictures Corporation, Screen Gem, Inc., Universal City Studios LLC, Universal City Studios Productions LLLP, Universal Content Productions LLC, Universal Television LLC, Warner Bros. Entertainment Inc.. (Sullivan, Sean) (Entered: 12/02/2021)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs Amazon Content Services LLC, Apple Video Programming LLC, Columbia Pictures Industries, Inc., Disney Enterprises, Inc., Dreamworks Animation LLC, Netflix US, LLC, Paramount Pictures Corporation, Screen Gem, Inc., Universal City Studios LLC, Universal City Studios Productions LLLP, Universal Content Productions LLC, Universal Television LLC, Warner Bros. Entertainment Inc.. (Sullivan, Sean) (Entered: 12/02/2021)

1 #1

Exhibit A to Complaint

1 #1

Main Document

150 More Documents Available
View All Documents

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#48) ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. Scheduling Conference set for 6/3/2022 at 10:00 AM before Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (cb) (Entered: 03/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#47) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Dwayne Anthony Johnson d/b/a AllAccessTV and Quality Restreams Dwayne Anthony Johnson, Quality Restreams, (Wilson, John) (Entered: 03/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#46) ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,,,,, #1 filed by Defendant Dwayne Anthony Johnson d/b/a AllAccessTV and Quality Restreams Dwayne Anthony Johnson, Quality Restreams.(Wilson, John) (Entered: 03/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#45) ORDER ISSUING PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION, PURSUANT TO PARTIES' STIPULATION by Judge Andre Birotte Jr.: Upon the parties' Joint Stipulation #44 , Defendant Dwayne Anthony Johnson d/b/a AllAccessTV and Quality Restreams ("Defendant"), and all persons who are allegedly acting in active concert or participation with Defendant, ARE HEREBY PRELIMINARILY RESTRAINED AND ENJOINED re Plaintiffs' copyrighted works, etc. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiffs are not required to post a bond relating to the preliminary injunction. Moreover, this Order MOOTS Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction #14 . The associated hearing, set for 2/18/2022, is therefore vacated. See document for further details. (gk) (Entered: 02/17/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#44) Joint STIPULATION for Order Regarding Entry of Preliminary Injunction filed by Plaintiffs Amazon Content Services LLC, Apple Video Programming LLC, Columbia Pictures Industries, Inc., Disney Enterprises, Inc., Dreamworks Animation LLC, Netflix US, LLC, Paramount Pictures Corporation, Screen Gem, Inc., Universal City Studios LLC, Universal City Studios Productions LLLP, Universal Content Productions LLC, Universal Television LLC, Warner Bros. Entertainment Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Sullivan, Sean) (Entered: 02/17/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#43) REPLY in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Preliminary Injunction re Copyright Infringement #14 filed by Plaintiffs Amazon Content Services LLC, Apple Video Programming LLC, Columbia Pictures Industries, Inc., Disney Enterprises, Inc., Dreamworks Animation LLC, Netflix US, LLC, Paramount Pictures Corporation, Screen Gem, Inc., Universal City Studios LLC, Universal City Studios Productions LLLP, Universal Content Productions LLC, Universal Television LLC, Warner Bros. Entertainment Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jan Van Voorn, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4)(Sullivan, Sean) (Entered: 02/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#42) MINUTE Order DENYING Defendant's Requests to Continue Hearing on Preliminary Injunction and GRANTING IN PART Defendant's Request to Continue Deadline for Response to Complaint by Judge Andre Birotte Jr.: Before the Court is Defendant's Opposed Motion to Continue Hearing on Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction and Defendant's Deadline for Response to Complaint #26 . Defendant's first request is DENIED. The hearing on Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction #14 remains set for 2/18/2022. As to Defendant's second request, although the Court will not continue the deadline for a response to Plaintiffs' Complaint to 4/22/2022, it hereby continues that deadline to 3/18/2022. This gives Defendant sufficient time both to prepare for the hearing on Plaintiffs' Motion and to prepare a response to Plaintiffs' Complaint. Court Reporter: N/A. (gk) (Entered: 02/03/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#41) RESPONSE filed by Pro Hac Vice attorneys Leigh Caudle Whitaker and Paul Abelkop on behalf of Defendants Dwayne Anthony Johnson and Quality Restreams. RE: Notice of Filing Fee Due. PHV fee N/A. Attorney will not be appearing as attorney of record on this case. (lt) (Entered: 02/02/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#38) NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: Second APPLICATION to Correct First APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Jennifer M. Rynell to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Dwayne Anthony Johnson, Quality Restreams (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. BCACDC-32694451)[ #32 , First APPLICATION to Correct First APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney John T. Wilson to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Dwayne Anthony Johnson, Quality Restreams (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-32694679) #25 #33 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event is Appear Pro Hac Vice (G-64) Local Rule 5-4.3.4 Application not hand-signed. Other error(s) with document(s): Please note that electronic, image or stamp signatures are not allowed. (lt) (Entered: 02/01/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#37) NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: First APPLICATION to Correct First APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Jennifer M. Rynell to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Dwayne Anthony Johnson, Quality Restreams (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. BCACDC-32694451)[2 #31 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event is Appear Pro Hac Vice (G-64) Local Rule 5-4.3.4 Application not hand-signed. Document Text is incorrect. States application is for Jennifer Rynell and phv application is for John T. Wilson. Other error(s) with document(s): Please note that electronic, image or stamp signatures are not allowed. (lt) (Entered: 02/01/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
28 More Docket Entries
  • 12/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (jtil) (Entered: 12/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil) (Entered: 12/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Andre Birotte Jr and Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. (jtil) (Entered: 12/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Notice of Appearance,,,,,, #6 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Notice of Appearance of Withdrawal of Counsel G123.. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (ak) (Entered: 12/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Arleen Fernandez on behalf of Plaintiffs Amazon Content Services LLC, Apple Video Programming LLC, Columbia Pictures Industries, Inc., Disney Enterprises, Inc., Dreamworks Animation LLC, Netflix US, LLC, Paramount Pictures Corporation, Screen Gem, Inc., Universal City Studios LLC, Universal City Studios Productions LLLP, Universal Content Productions LLC, Universal Television LLC, Warner Bros. Entertainment Inc. (Attorney Arleen Fernandez added to party Amazon Content Services LLC(pty:pla), Attorney Arleen Fernandez added to party Apple Video Programming LLC(pty:pla), Attorney Arleen Fernandez added to party Columbia Pictures Industries, Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney Arleen Fernandez added to party Disney Enterprises, Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney Arleen Fernandez added to party Dreamworks Animation LLC(pty:pla), Attorney Arleen Fernandez added to party Netflix US, LLC(pty:pla), Attorney Arleen Fernandez added to party Paramount Pictures Corporation(pty:pla), Attorney Arleen Fernandez added to party Screen Gem, Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney Arleen Fernandez added to party Universal City Studios LLC(pty:pla), Attorney Arleen Fernandez added to party Universal City Studios Productions LLLP(pty:pla), Attorney Arleen Fernandez added to party Universal Content Productions LLC(pty:pla), Attorney Arleen Fernandez added to party Universal Television LLC(pty:pla), Attorney Arleen Fernandez added to party Warner Bros. Entertainment Inc.(pty:pla))(Fernandez, Arleen) (Entered: 12/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION regarding a copyright (Initial Notification) filed by Amazon Content Services LLC, Apple Video Programming LLC, Columbia Pictures Industries, Inc., Disney Enterprises, Inc., Dreamworks Animation LLC, Netflix US, LLC, Paramount Pictures Corporation, Screen Gem, Inc., Universal City Studios LLC, Universal City Studios Productions LLLP, Universal Content Productions LLC, Universal Television LLC, Warner Bros. Entertainment Inc.. (Sullivan, Sean) (Entered: 12/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT and Notice of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiffs Amazon Content Services LLC, Apple Video Programming LLC, Columbia Pictures Industries, Inc., Disney Enterprises, Inc., Dreamworks Animation LLC, Netflix US, LLC, Paramount Pictures Corporation, Screen Gem, Inc., Universal City Studios LLC, Universal City Studios Productions LLLP, Universal Content Productions LLC, Universal Television LLC, Warner Bros. Entertainment Inc. (Sullivan, Sean) (Entered: 12/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,,,,, #1 filed by Plaintiff Amazon Content Services LLC, Apple Video Programming LLC, Columbia Pictures Industries, Inc., Disney Enterprises, Inc., Dreamworks Animation LLC, Netflix US, LLC, Paramount Pictures Corporation, Screen Gem, Inc., Universal City Studios LLC, Universal City Studios Productions LLLP, Universal Content Productions LLC, Universal Television LLC, Warner Bros. Entertainment Inc.. (Sullivan, Sean) (Entered: 12/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs Amazon Content Services LLC, Apple Video Programming LLC, Columbia Pictures Industries, Inc., Disney Enterprises, Inc., Dreamworks Animation LLC, Netflix US, LLC, Paramount Pictures Corporation, Screen Gem, Inc., Universal City Studios LLC, Universal City Studios Productions LLLP, Universal Content Productions LLC, Universal Television LLC, Warner Bros. Entertainment Inc.. (Sullivan, Sean) (Entered: 12/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-32416322 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiffs Netflix US, LLC, Paramount Pictures Corporation, Universal City Studios LLC, Universal City Studios Productions LLLP, Screen Gem, Inc., Disney Enterprises, Inc., Universal Television LLC, Apple Video Programming LLC, Columbia Pictures Industries, Inc., Amazon Content Services LLC, Universal Content Productions LLC, Warner Bros. Entertainment Inc., Dreamworks Animation LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Complaint) (Attorney Sean M Sullivan added to party Amazon Content Services LLC(pty:pla), Attorney Sean M Sullivan added to party Apple Video Programming LLC(pty:pla), Attorney Sean M Sullivan added to party Columbia Pictures Industries, Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney Sean M Sullivan added to party Disney Enterprises, Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney Sean M Sullivan added to party Dreamworks Animation LLC(pty:pla), Attorney Sean M Sullivan added to party Netflix US, LLC(pty:pla), Attorney Sean M Sullivan added to party Paramount Pictures Corporation(pty:pla), Attorney Sean M Sullivan added to party Screen Gem, Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney Sean M Sullivan added to party Universal City Studios LLC(pty:pla), Attorney Sean M Sullivan added to party Universal City Studios Productions LLLP(pty:pla), Attorney Sean M Sullivan added to party Universal Content Productions LLC(pty:pla), Attorney Sean M Sullivan added to party Universal Television LLC(pty:pla), Attorney Sean M Sullivan added to party Warner Bros. Entertainment Inc.(pty:pla))(Sullivan, Sean) (Entered: 12/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Universal Content Productions LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where DREAMWORKS ANIMATION SKG INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where Columbia Pictures Industries, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Universal Television LLC is a litigant