This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/26/2021 at 09:02:10 (UTC).

UnitedHealthCare Services, Inc. et al v. Team Health Holdings, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 10/27/2021 UnitedHealthCare Services, Inc filed a Property - Personal Property Fraud lawsuit against Team Health Holdings, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Tennessee Eastern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Clifton L Corker and H Bruce Guyton. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:21-CV-00364

  • Filing Date:

    10/27/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Personal Property Fraud

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Clifton L Corker

Referral Judge

H Bruce Guyton

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

UnitedHealthCare Services, Inc.

United Healthcare Insurance Company

UMR, Inc.

Defendants

Team Health Holdings, Inc.

AmeriTeam Services, LLC

HCFS Health Care Financial Services, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Dwight E Tarwater

Attorney at Paine Tarwater & Bickers LLP

900 South Gay Street, 2200 Riverview Tower

Knoxville, TN 37902

Charles Gokey

Attorney at Robins Kaplan LLP

800 Lasalle Ave, Ste 2800

Minneapolis, MN 55402

Gregory S. Voshell

Attorney at Robins, Kaplan, Miller & Ciresi, LLP (NY)

900 Third Avenue, Suite 11900

New York, NY 10022

Jamie R. Kurtz

Attorney at Robins, Kaplan, Miller & Ciresi, LLP

800 Lasalle Avenue, 2800 Lasalle Plaza

Minneapolis, MN 55402

Jeffrey S. Gleason

Attorney at Robins, Kaplan, Miller & Ciresi, LLP

800 Lasalle Avenue, 2800 Lasalle Plaza

Minneapolis, MN 55402

Kendell Garrett Vonckx

Attorney at Paine Tarwater & Bickers LLP

900 South Gay Street, 2200 Riverview Tower

Knoxville, TN 37902

Michael J King

Attorney at Paine Bickers LLP

900 S. Gay Street, Suite 2200

Knoxville, TN 37902

Paul D. Weller

Attorney at Robins, Kaplan, Miller & Ciresi, LLP (NY)

900 Third Avenue, Suite 11900

New York, NY 10022

Defendant Attorneys

Caldwell Gwendolyn Collins

Attorney at Baker, Donelson, Bearman, Caldwell & Berkowitz (Nashville)

211 Commerce Street, Suite 800

Nashville, TN 37201-1800

Gary C Shockley

Attorney at Baker Donelson

1600 West End Avenue, Suite 2000

Nashville, TN 37203

Justin C Fineberg

Attorney at Lash & Goldberg LLP

2500 Weston Road, Suite 220

Fort Lauderdale, FL 33331

Martin B Goldberg

Attorney at Lash & Goldberg LLP

2500 Weston Road, Suite 220

Fort Lauderdale, FL 33331

 

Court Documents

29 #1

Other Notice of Consent/Non-Consent

#29

(#29) ORDER: The parties are ordered to confer and return the attached form within the time provided.Signed by District Judge Clifton L Corker on 12/21/21. (Attachments: #1 Other Notice of Consent/Non-Consent) (ABF) (Entered: 12/21/2021)

#28

(#28) Certificate of Corporate Interest by AmeriTeam Services, LLC, HCFS Health Care Financial Services, LLC, Team Health Holdings, Inc.. (Shockley, Gary) (Entered: 12/20/2021)

#27

(#27) MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages Motion to File Memorandum of Law in Excess of 25 Pages by AmeriTeam Services, LLC, HCFS Health Care Financial Services, LLC, Team Health Holdings, Inc.. (Shockley, Gary) (Entered: 12/20/2021)

#26

(#26) MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #25 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by AmeriTeam Services, LLC, HCFS Health Care Financial Services, LLC, Team Health Holdings, Inc.. (Shockley, Gary) (Entered: 12/20/2021)

#25

(#25) MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by AmeriTeam Services, LLC, HCFS Health Care Financial Services, LLC, Team Health Holdings, Inc.. (Shockley, Gary) (Entered: 12/20/2021)

23 #1

Other - Certificate of Good Standing

#23

(#23) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Martin B. Goldberg) ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number ATNEDC-4924527.) by AmeriTeam Services, LLC, HCFS Health Care Financial Services, LLC, Team Health Holdings, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Other - Certificate of Good Standing)(Shockley, Gary) Modified on 12/16/2021 to indicate that the Certificate of Good Standing is more than 30 days old but attorney's standing has been verified by the clerk's office and he remains in good standing (ABF). (Entered: 12/16/2021)

22 #1

Other - Certificate of Good Standing

6 #2

Summons HCFS Health Care

#5

(#5) NOTICE by UMR, Inc., United Healthcare Insurance Company, UnitedHealthCare Services, Inc. SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (Tarwater, Dwight) (Entered: 10/28/2021)

#4

(#4) NOTICE by UMR, Inc., United Healthcare Insurance Company, UnitedHealthCare Services, Inc. SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (Tarwater, Dwight) (Entered: 10/28/2021)

#3

(#3) NOTICE by UMR, Inc., United Healthcare Insurance Company, UnitedHealthCare Services, Inc. re #1 Complaint, SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (Tarwater, Dwight) (Entered: 10/28/2021)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Deficiency (Pro Hac) as to Gleason, Kurtz, Gokey, Weller, and Voshell. (CNC)Notice mailed to all attorneys (CNC) (Main Document 2 replaced on 10/28/2021) (CNC). (Entered: 10/28/2021)

1 #3

Other Rule 7.1 Disclosure

1 #2

Other Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Exhibit A - Billing

#1

(#3) NOTICE by UMR, Inc., United Healthcare Insurance Company, UnitedHealthCare Services, Inc. re #1 Complaint, SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (Tarwater, Dwight) (Entered: 10/28/2021)

29 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#29) ORDER: The parties are ordered to confer and return the attached form within the time provided.Signed by District Judge Clifton L Corker on 12/21/21. (Attachments: #1 Other Notice of Consent/Non-Consent) (ABF) (Entered: 12/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) Certificate of Corporate Interest by AmeriTeam Services, LLC, HCFS Health Care Financial Services, LLC, Team Health Holdings, Inc.. (Shockley, Gary) (Entered: 12/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages Motion to File Memorandum of Law in Excess of 25 Pages by AmeriTeam Services, LLC, HCFS Health Care Financial Services, LLC, Team Health Holdings, Inc.. (Shockley, Gary) (Entered: 12/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #25 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by AmeriTeam Services, LLC, HCFS Health Care Financial Services, LLC, Team Health Holdings, Inc.. (Shockley, Gary) (Entered: 12/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by AmeriTeam Services, LLC, HCFS Health Care Financial Services, LLC, Team Health Holdings, Inc.. (Shockley, Gary) (Entered: 12/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) ORDER granting #22 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You MUST register as an E-Filer here: #https://pacer.psc.uscourts.gov/pscof/regWizard.jsf; granting #23 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You MUST register as an E-Filer here: #https://pacer.psc.uscourts.gov/pscof/regWizard.jsf. Signed by Magistrate Judge H. Bruce Guyton on 12/17/2021. (This entry constitutes the complete Order of the Court). (AGA) Modified on 12/20/2021 to indicate c/m to Justin Fineberg and Martin Goldberg (ABF). (Entered: 12/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClerk's Verification of PHV Requirements is complete regarding document: #23 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Martin B. Goldberg) ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number ATNEDC-4924527.) filed by Team Health Holdings, Inc., HCFS Health Care Financial Services, LLC, AmeriTeam Services, LLC (ABF) (Entered: 12/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Martin B. Goldberg) ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number ATNEDC-4924527.) by AmeriTeam Services, LLC, HCFS Health Care Financial Services, LLC, Team Health Holdings, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Other - Certificate of Good Standing)(Shockley, Gary) Modified on 12/16/2021 to indicate that the Certificate of Good Standing is more than 30 days old but attorney's standing has been verified by the clerk's office and he remains in good standing (ABF). (Entered: 12/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClerk's Verification of PHV Requirements is complete regarding document: #22 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Justin C. Fineberg) ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number ATNEDC-4924492.) filed by Team Health Holdings, Inc., HCFS Health Care Financial Services, LLC, AmeriTeam Services, LLC (ABF) (Entered: 12/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Justin C. Fineberg) ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number ATNEDC-4924492.) by AmeriTeam Services, LLC, HCFS Health Care Financial Services, LLC, Team Health Holdings, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Other - Certificate of Good Standing)(Shockley, Gary) Modified on 12/16/2021 to indicate that the Certificate of Good Standing is more than 30 days old but attorney's standing has been verified by the clerk's office and he remains in good standing (ABF). (Entered: 12/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
17 More Docket Entries
  • 11/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons & Complaint - Ameriteam Services, LLC served on Glenda Shepard, Service of Process Intake Clerk on 10.29.21, filed by UMR, Inc., United Healthcare Insurance Company, UnitedHealthCare Services, Inc.. (Tarwater, Dwight) (Entered: 11/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons & Complaint - Team Health Holdings, Inc. served on Glenda Shepard, Service of Process Intake Clerk on 10.29.21, filed by UMR, Inc., United Healthcare Insurance Company, UnitedHealthCare Services, Inc.. (Tarwater, Dwight) (Entered: 11/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER: Pursuant to Local Rule 3.2(d)(3), the undersigned finds that the above-captioned case is related to Celtic Insurance Company v. Team Health Holdings, Inc., et al., No. 3:20-CV-523. The Court finds that these cases arise out of the same transaction or occurrence and involve one or more of the same parties. Therefore, the two cases are related. Because the first of these cases was assigned to District Judge Clifton L. Corker and Magistrate Judge H. Bruce Guyton, this case will also be assigned to District Judge Clifton L. Corker and Magistrate Judge H. Bruce Guyton. However, consolidation is not ordered.Signed by Magistrate Judge H Bruce Guyton on 11/1/21. (ABF) (Entered: 11/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • DocketDistrict Judge Clifton L Corker and Magistrate Judge H Bruce Guyton added. (ABF) (Entered: 11/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Summons Issued as to AmeriTeam Services, LLC, HCFS Health Care Financial Services, LLC, Team Health Holdings, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Summons AmeriTeam Services, #2 Summons HCFS Health Care)(ABF) (Entered: 10/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE by UMR, Inc., United Healthcare Insurance Company, UnitedHealthCare Services, Inc. SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (Tarwater, Dwight) (Entered: 10/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE by UMR, Inc., United Healthcare Insurance Company, UnitedHealthCare Services, Inc. SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (Tarwater, Dwight) (Entered: 10/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE by UMR, Inc., United Healthcare Insurance Company, UnitedHealthCare Services, Inc. re #1 Complaint, SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (Tarwater, Dwight) (Entered: 10/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Deficiency (Pro Hac) as to Gleason, Kurtz, Gokey, Weller, and Voshell. (CNC)Notice mailed to all attorneys (CNC) (Main Document 2 replaced on 10/28/2021) (CNC). (Entered: 10/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against AmeriTeam Services, LLC, HCFS Health Care Financial Services, LLC, Team Health Holdings, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATNEDC-4882802.), filed by UnitedHealthCare Services, Inc., UMR, Inc., United Healthcare Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Billing, #2 Other Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Other Rule 7.1 Disclosure)(Tarwater, Dwight) (Entered: 10/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AmeriTeam Services, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where TEAM HEALTH HOLDINGS, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where HCFS Health Care Financial Services, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where UnitedHealthcare Service, LLC is a litigant