This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/05/2023 at 08:42:42 (UTC).

United Van Lines, LLC v. Enterprise Truck Line, LLC

Case Summary

On 12/07/2022 United Van Lines, LLC filed an Other - Commerce lawsuit against Enterprise Truck Line, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Colorado District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Philip A. Brimmer and Kristen L. Mix. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-03165

  • Filing Date:

    12/07/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Commerce

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Philip A. Brimmer

Referral Judge

Kristen L. Mix

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

United Van Lines, LLC

Defendant

Enterprise Truck Line, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Vic Houston Henry

Defendant Attorneys

Tyler Douglas Olson

Seth Adam Rider

 

Court Documents

#15

(#15) DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Plaintiff United Van Lines, LLC. (Henry, Vic) (Entered: 01/26/2023)

#14

(#14) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Enterprise Truck Line, LLC.(Olson, Tyler) (Entered: 01/11/2023)

#13

(#13) MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 12/29/2022. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Motion #9 is GRANTED. Defendant has up to and including January 12, 2023, to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint.(alave, ) (Entered: 12/29/2022)

12 #3

Continuation of Main Document

12 #2

Continuation of Main Document

12 #1

Continuation of Main Document

12 #12

Main Document

#10

(#10) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Seth Adam Rider on behalf of Enterprise Truck Line, LLCAttorney Seth Adam Rider added to party Enterprise Truck Line, LLC(pty:dft) (Rider, Seth) (Entered: 12/28/2022)

#9

(#9) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond re #1 Complaint, by Defendant Enterprise Truck Line, LLC. (Olson, Tyler) (Entered: 12/28/2022)

#7

(#7) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (Henry, Vic) (Entered: 12/21/2022)

#6

(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by United Van Lines, LLC. Enterprise Truck Line, LLC served on 12/8/2022, answer due 12/29/2022. (Henry, Vic) (Entered: 12/12/2022)

1 #6

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #5

Exhibit E - Gunsmoke Towing Invoice

1 #4

Exhibit D - Invoice & reports from Frontier

1 #3

Exhibit C - Uniform Summons & Penalty Assessment

1 #2

Exhibit B - Drayage Info Sheet

1 #1

Exhibit A - Interline Agreement

1 #1

Main Document

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/26/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Plaintiff United Van Lines, LLC. (Henry, Vic) (Entered: 01/26/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Enterprise Truck Line, LLC.(Olson, Tyler) (Entered: 01/11/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 12/29/2022. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Motion #9 is GRANTED. Defendant has up to and including January 12, 2023, to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint.(alave, ) (Entered: 12/29/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING/PLANNING CONFERENCE by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 12/29/2022. Proposed Scheduling Order due 2/14/2023. Scheduling/Planning Conference set for 2/21/2023 09:30 AM in Courtroom A 401 before Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. (Attachments: #1 Continuation of Main Document, #2 Continuation of Main Document, #3 Continuation of Main Document) (alave, ) (Entered: 12/29/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) MEMORANDUM regarding #9 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond re #1 Complaint, filed by Enterprise Truck Line, LLC. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix, by Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 12/28/2022. Text Only Entry (pabsec, ) (Entered: 12/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Seth Adam Rider on behalf of Enterprise Truck Line, LLCAttorney Seth Adam Rider added to party Enterprise Truck Line, LLC(pty:dft) (Rider, Seth) (Entered: 12/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond re #1 Complaint, by Defendant Enterprise Truck Line, LLC. (Olson, Tyler) (Entered: 12/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ADVISORY NOTICE OF NONCOMPLIANCE WITH COURT RULES/PROCEDURES re: #7 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by attorney Vic Houston Henry. DO NOT REFILE THE DOCUMENT. Action to take - counsel must submit a change of contact request through the Manage my Account tab at the PACER website at https://www.pacer.gov/, pursuant to D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(c) and 3.5 of the Electronic Case Filing Procedures (Civil cases).(Text Only Entry) (jtorr, ) (Entered: 12/22/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (Henry, Vic) (Entered: 12/21/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by United Van Lines, LLC. Enterprise Truck Line, LLC served on 12/8/2022, answer due 12/29/2022. (Henry, Vic) (Entered: 12/12/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2022
  • Docket(#5) ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix for non-dispositive matters. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this case is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge to (1) convene a scheduling conference under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and enter a scheduling order meeting the requirements of D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.2, (2) conduct such status conferences and issue such orders necessary for compliance with the scheduling order, including amendments or modifications of the scheduling order upon a showing of good cause, (3) hear and determine pretrial matters, including discovery and other non-dispositive motions, and (4) conduct a pretrial conference and enter a pretrial order. Court sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.6. On the recommendation or informal request of the magistrate judge or on the request of the parties by motion, this court may direct the parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, a settlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding, by Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 12/08/2022. Text Only Entry (pabsec, ) (Entered: 12/08/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (jcharl, ) (Entered: 12/07/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2022
  • Docket(#3) Case assigned to Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer and drawn to Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. Text Only Entry. (jcharl, ) (Entered: 12/07/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) SUMMONS REQUEST as to Enterprise Truck Line, LLC by Plaintiff United Van Lines, LLC. (Henry, Vic) (Entered: 12/07/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Enterprise Truck Line, LLC (Filing fee $ 402,Receipt Number ACODC-8817246)Attorney Vic Houston Henry added to party United Van Lines, LLC(pty:pla), filed by United Van Lines, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Interline Agreement, #2 Exhibit B - Drayage Info Sheet, #3 Exhibit C - Uniform Summons & Penalty Assessment, #4 Exhibit D - Invoice & reports from Frontier, #5 Exhibit E - Gunsmoke Towing Invoice, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(Henry, Vic) (Entered: 12/07/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less