Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 08/03/2020 at 09:45:10 (UTC).

United Therapeutics Corporation v. Liquidia Technologies, Inc.

Case Summary

On 06/04/2020 United Therapeutics Corporation filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Liquidia Technologies, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Delaware District. The Judge overseeing this case is Richard G. Andrews. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-00755

  • Filing Date:

    06/04/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Delaware District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Richard G. Andrews

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant

United Therapeutics Corporation

Defendant and Counter Claimant

Liquidia Technologies, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant Attorneys

Jack B. Blumenfeld

Attorney at Morris, Nichols, Arsht & Tunnell LLP

1201 North Market Street, P.O. Box 1347

Wilmington, DE 19899

Michael J. Flynn

Attorney at Morris, Nichols, Arsht & Tunnell LLP

1201 North Market Street, P.O. Box 1347

Wilmington, DE 19899

Joshua Mack

Douglas H. Carsten

Defendant and Counter Claimant Attorneys

Jonathan R. Davies

Ivor Elrifi

Deepa Kannappan

Sanya Sukduang

Lauren Krickl

David M. Fry

Attorney at Shaw Keller LLP

1105 North Market Street, 12Th Floor

Wilmington, DE 19801

Karen Elizabeth Keller

Attorney at Shaw Keller LLP

1105 North Market Street, 12Th Floor

Wilmington, DE 19801

Erik B. Milch

 

Court Documents

#20

(#20) SCHEDULING ORDER: Case referred to the Magistrate Judge for the purpose of exploring ADR. Case referred to the Magistrate Judge for discovery. Joinder of Parties due by 6/4/2021. Amended Pleadings due by 6/4/2021. Fact Discovery completed by 9/17/2021. Dispositive Motions due by 11/2/2021. Joint Claim Construction Brief due by 4/30/2021. A Markman Hearing is set for 5/24/2021, at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 6A. A Pretrial Conference is set for 3/4/2022, at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 6A. A 3 day Bench Trial is set for 3/28/2022, at 8:30 AM in Courtroom 6A (see Order for further details). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 7/31/2020. (nms) (Entered: 07/31/2020)

19 #1

Letter to the Honorable Richard G. Andrews

#19

(#19) PROPOSED Scheduling Order, by United Therapeutics Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Letter)(Blumenfeld, Jack) Modified on 7/31/2020 (nms). (Entered: 07/31/2020)

18 #1

Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews

#18

(#18) PROPOSED Scheduling Order, by United Therapeutics Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Letter)(Flynn, Michael) Modified on 7/28/2020 (nms). (Entered: 07/28/2020)

#17

(#17) Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 10,716,793 . (Blumenfeld, Jack) (Entered: 07/22/2020)

16 #1

Exhibits A-C

#16

(#16) First AMENDED COMPLAINT against Liquidia Technologies, Inc. - filed by United Therapeutics Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A-C)(Blumenfeld, Jack) Modified on 7/27/2020 (nms). (Entered: 07/22/2020)

#15

(#15) Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews, from Jack Blumenfeld, regarding dial-in information for the July 30, 2020 scheduling teleconference. (Blumenfeld, Jack) Modified on 7/21/2020 (nms). (Entered: 07/21/2020)

#7

(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by United Therapeutics Corporation. Liquidia Technologies, Inc. served on 6/5/2020, answer due 6/26/2020. (Blumenfeld, Jack) (Entered: 06/05/2020)

#6

(#6) Summonses Issued (please complete the top portion of the form and print out for use/service). (nmg) (Entered: 06/05/2020)

#5

(#5) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Other Affiliate BlackRock Inc. for United Therapeutics Corporation filed by United Therapeutics Corporation. (nmg) (Entered: 06/05/2020)

#4

(#4) Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 9,593,066 B2; 9,604,901 B2. (nmg) (Entered: 06/05/2020)

#3

(#3) Supplemental information for patent cases involving an Abbreviated New Drug Application (ANDA) - Date Patentee(s) Received Notice: 4/27/2020. Date of Expiration of Patent: 12/15/2028.Thirty Month Stay Deadline: 10/27/2022. (nmg) (Entered: 06/05/2020)

#2

(#2) Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (nmg) (Entered: 06/05/2020)

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Exhibit A-B

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT for PATENT INFRINGEMENT filed against Liquidia Technologies, Inc. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number ADEDC-2974028.) - filed by United Therapeutics Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-B, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(nmg) (Entered: 06/05/2020)

17 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) SCHEDULING ORDER: Case referred to the Magistrate Judge for the purpose of exploring ADR. Case referred to the Magistrate Judge for discovery. Joinder of Parties due by 6/4/2021. Amended Pleadings due by 6/4/2021. Fact Discovery completed by 9/17/2021. Dispositive Motions due by 11/2/2021. Joint Claim Construction Brief due by 4/30/2021. A Markman Hearing is set for 5/24/2021, at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 6A. A Pretrial Conference is set for 3/4/2022, at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 6A. A 3 day Bench Trial is set for 3/28/2022, at 8:30 AM in Courtroom 6A (see Order for further details). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 7/31/2020. (nms) (Entered: 07/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) PROPOSED Scheduling Order, by United Therapeutics Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Letter)(Blumenfeld, Jack) Modified on 7/31/2020 (nms). (Entered: 07/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2020
  • DocketMinute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Richard G. Andrews - Rule 16(b) Telephone Conference held on 7/30/2020. Counsel for Plaintiff: J. Blumenfeld. Counsel for Defendant: K. Keller. (Court Reporter Heather Triozzi.) (lak) (Entered: 07/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) PROPOSED Scheduling Order, by United Therapeutics Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Letter)(Flynn, Michael) Modified on 7/28/2020 (nms). (Entered: 07/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 10,716,793 . (Blumenfeld, Jack) (Entered: 07/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) First AMENDED COMPLAINT against Liquidia Technologies, Inc. - filed by United Therapeutics Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A-C)(Blumenfeld, Jack) Modified on 7/27/2020 (nms). (Entered: 07/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews, from Jack Blumenfeld, regarding dial-in information for the July 30, 2020 scheduling teleconference. (Blumenfeld, Jack) Modified on 7/21/2020 (nms). (Entered: 07/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) Order Setting Rule 16(b) Telephone Conference: A Scheduling Conference is set for 7/30/2020, at 2:00 PM before Judge Richard G. Andrews (see Order for further details). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 7/21/2020. (nms) (Entered: 07/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • DocketPro Hac Vice Attorneys Sanya Sukduang, Jonathan R. Davies, Erik B. Milch, Ivor Elrifi, Lauren Krickl, Deepa Kannappan for Liquidia Technologies, Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (kmd) (Entered: 07/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSO ORDERED, re #13 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Sanya Sukduang, Jonathan Davies, Erik B. Milch, Ivor Elrifi, Lauren Krickl and Deepa Kannappan, filed by Liquidia Technologies, Inc.. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 7/17/2020. (nms) (Entered: 07/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 06/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSO ORDERED, re #8 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Douglas H. Carsten, Joshua Mack and Adam W. Burrowbridge, filed by United Therapeutics Corporation. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 6/11/2020. (nms) (Entered: 06/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Douglas H. Carsten, Joshua Mack and Adam W. Burrowbridge - filed by United Therapeutics Corporation. (Flynn, Michael) Modified on 6/11/2020 (nms). (Entered: 06/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2020
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Richard G. Andrews. Please include the initials of the Judge (RGA) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb) (Entered: 06/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by United Therapeutics Corporation. Liquidia Technologies, Inc. served on 6/5/2020, answer due 6/26/2020. (Blumenfeld, Jack) (Entered: 06/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Summonses Issued (please complete the top portion of the form and print out for use/service). (nmg) (Entered: 06/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Other Affiliate BlackRock Inc. for United Therapeutics Corporation filed by United Therapeutics Corporation. (nmg) (Entered: 06/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 9,593,066 B2; 9,604,901 B2. (nmg) (Entered: 06/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Supplemental information for patent cases involving an Abbreviated New Drug Application (ANDA) - Date Patentee(s) Received Notice: 4/27/2020. Date of Expiration of Patent: 12/15/2028.Thirty Month Stay Deadline: 10/27/2022. (nmg) (Entered: 06/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (nmg) (Entered: 06/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT for PATENT INFRINGEMENT filed against Liquidia Technologies, Inc. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number ADEDC-2974028.) - filed by United Therapeutics Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-B, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(nmg) (Entered: 06/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where United Therapeutics Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Karen Elizabeth Keller