This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/29/2022 at 00:38:03 (UTC).

United States v. The Regents of the University of California

Case Summary

On 11/21/2022 United States filed a Civil Right - Other Disability Discrimination lawsuit against The Regents of the University of California. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Donna M. Ryu. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:22-CV-07345

  • Filing Date:

    11/21/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Disability Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Donna M. Ryu

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

United States

Defendant

The Regents of the University of California

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Christine Inkyung Kim

Attorney at U.S. Department of Justice

950 Pennsylvania Avenue Nw

Washington, DC 20530

Charlotte L. Lanvers

Attorney at Disability Rights Education and Defense Fund, Inc.

3075 Adeline Street, Suite 210

Berkeley, CA 94710

Defendant Attorneys

Andrew Kim

Attorney at Goodwin Procter LLP

1900 N St. Nw

Washington, DC 20036

Kimberly Anne Robinson

Attorney at University of California, Office of the President

1111 Franklin Street, 8Th Floor

Oakland, CA 94607-5200

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

3 #3

Main Document

3 #1

Proposed Order

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew Kim on behalf of Defendant The Regents of the University of California (Kim, Andrew) (Filed on 11/21/2022) (Entered: 11/21/2022)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Kimberly Anne Robinson (Robinson, Kimberly) (Filed on 11/21/2022) (Entered: 11/21/2022)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Christine Inkyung Kim (Kim, Christine) (Filed on 11/21/2022) (Entered: 11/21/2022)

#7

(#7) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by United States.. (Lanvers, Charlotte) (Filed on 11/22/2022) (Entered: 11/22/2022)

#8

(#8) CLERK'S NOTICE TO DEFENDANT Re: Consent or Declination: Defendant shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: #http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 12/6/2022. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/22/2022) (Entered: 11/22/2022)

#9

(#9) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order for Cases Asserting Denial of Right of Access under Americans with Disabilities Act. (ark, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/22/2022) (Entered: 11/22/2022)

#10

(#10) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by The Regents of the University of California.. (Kim, Andrew) (Filed on 11/23/2022) (Entered: 11/23/2022)

#11

(#11) NOTICE of Appearance by Gioconda R. Molinari (Molinari, Gioconda) (Filed on 11/28/2022) (Entered: 11/28/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE of Appearance by Gioconda R. Molinari (Molinari, Gioconda) (Filed on 11/28/2022) (Entered: 11/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by The Regents of the University of California.. (Kim, Andrew) (Filed on 11/23/2022) (Entered: 11/23/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order for Cases Asserting Denial of Right of Access under Americans with Disabilities Act. (ark, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/22/2022) (Entered: 11/22/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) CLERK'S NOTICE TO DEFENDANT Re: Consent or Declination: Defendant shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: #http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 12/6/2022. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/22/2022) (Entered: 11/22/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by United States.. (Lanvers, Charlotte) (Filed on 11/22/2022) (Entered: 11/22/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Christine Inkyung Kim (Kim, Christine) (Filed on 11/21/2022) (Entered: 11/21/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Kimberly Anne Robinson (Robinson, Kimberly) (Filed on 11/21/2022) (Entered: 11/21/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew Kim on behalf of Defendant The Regents of the University of California (Kim, Andrew) (Filed on 11/21/2022) (Entered: 11/21/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Joint MOTION for Settlement Entry of Consent Decree filed by United States. Responses due by 12/5/2022. Replies due by 12/12/2022. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Lanvers, Charlotte) (Filed on 11/21/2022) (Entered: 11/21/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2022
  • Docket(#2) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 12/5/2022. (as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/21/2022) (Entered: 11/21/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against The Regents of the University of California. Filed byUnited States. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Lanvers, Charlotte) (Filed on 11/21/2022) (Entered: 11/21/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where THE REGENTS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF CALIFORNIA A PUBLIC ENTITY is a litigant

Latest cases where United States Department of Homeland Security is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kimberly Anne Robinson

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Andrew Kim