This case was last updated from PACER on 03/18/2019 at 07:49:45 (UTC).

United States of America v. New Mexico Environment Department

Case Summary

On 01/17/2019 United States of America filed an Other - Environment lawsuit against New Mexico Environment Department. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New Mexico District. The Judges overseeing this case are Stephan M. Vidmar and Kenneth J. Gonzales. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-00046

  • Filing Date:

    01/17/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Environment

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New Mexico District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Stephan M. Vidmar

Presiding Judge

Kenneth J. Gonzales

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

United States of America

Defendants

James Kenney

New Mexico Environment Department

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Eileen McDonough

Attorney at US Department of Justice

Po Box 23986

Washington, DC 20026-3896

Defendant Attorney

William G. Grantham

Attorney at New Mexico Office of the Attorney General

111 Lomas Nw, Ste. 300

Albuquerque, NM 87102

 

Court Documents

#12

(#12) ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to #4 Motion to Dismiss by Chief Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza. Plaintiff's Response is due by 3/14/2019. (ag) (Entered: 03/04/2019)

15 #1

Exhibit

#15

(#15) MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #4 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM OR FOR MORE DEFINITE STATEMENT filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (McDonough, Eileen) (Entered: 03/14/2019)

#13

(#13) NOTICE of Appearance by David D. Mitchell on behalf of United States of America (Mitchell, David) (Entered: 03/11/2019)

#11

(#11) NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher N. Atencio on behalf of All Defendants (Atencio, Christopher) (Entered: 03/01/2019)

#10

(#10) NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Lundin on behalf of All Defendants (Lundin, Robert) (Entered: 03/01/2019)

#9

(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Anne Minard on behalf of All Defendants (Minard, Anne) (Entered: 03/01/2019)

#8

(#8) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #4 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM OR FOR MORE DEFINITE STATEMENT by United States of America. (McDonough, Eileen) (Entered: 02/28/2019)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer Lynn Hower on behalf of All Defendants (Hower, Jennifer) (Entered: 02/28/2019)

#6

(#6) NOTICE OF CONSENT SUBMISSION DEADLINE: Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(2), the parties are reminded that a magistrate judge was assigned as the trial judge in this matter under 28 U.S.C. 636(c). The parties are advised that the Clerk will reassign this matter to a district judge as the trial judge no later than March 11, 2019 unless consents from all parties have been filed. The parties are free to withhold consent. If you have already entered your consent, you need not resubmit. (ag) (Entered: 02/27/2019)

5 #1

Exhibit

#4

(#4) MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM OR FOR MORE DEFINITE STATEMENT by New Mexico Environment Department. (Grantham, William) (Entered: 02/18/2019)

#3

(#3) APPENDIX/SUPPLEMENT re #1 Complaint Civil Cover Sheet by United States of America (McDonough, Eileen) (Entered: 01/18/2019)

1 #2

Exhibit Permit Attachments 1-3

1 #1

Exhibit Permit

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against New Mexico Environment Department ( Filing Fee - Waived), filed by United States. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Permit, #2 Exhibit Permit Attachments 1-3)(McDonough, Eileen) (Entered: 01/17/2019)

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/15/2019
  • (#16) PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been reassigned to District Judge Kenneth J. Gonzales as the trial judge. Under D.N.M.LR-Civ. 10.1, the first page of each document must have the case file number and initials of the assigned judges.Accordingly, further documents filed in this matter must bear the case number and the judges' initials shown in the case caption and the NEF for this document. Kindly reflect this change in your filings. Sr. District Judge Robert C. Brack no longer assigned to this case.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (mnb) (Entered: 03/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #4 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM OR FOR MORE DEFINITE STATEMENT filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (McDonough, Eileen) (Entered: 03/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2019
  • (#14) PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been reassigned to Sr. District Judge Robert C. Brack as the trial judge. Under D.N.M.LR-Civ. 10.1, the first page of each document must have the case file number and initials of the assigned judges.Accordingly, further documents filed in this matter must bear the case number and the judges' initials shown in the case caption and the NEF for this document. Kindly reflect this change in your filings. Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza no longer assigned to this case.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (mnb) (Entered: 03/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) NOTICE of Appearance by David D. Mitchell on behalf of United States of America (Mitchell, David) (Entered: 03/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to #4 Motion to Dismiss by Chief Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza. Plaintiff's Response is due by 3/14/2019. (ag) (Entered: 03/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher N. Atencio on behalf of All Defendants (Atencio, Christopher) (Entered: 03/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Lundin on behalf of All Defendants (Lundin, Robert) (Entered: 03/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Anne Minard on behalf of All Defendants (Minard, Anne) (Entered: 03/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #4 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM OR FOR MORE DEFINITE STATEMENT by United States of America. (McDonough, Eileen) (Entered: 02/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer Lynn Hower on behalf of All Defendants (Hower, Jennifer) (Entered: 02/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE OF CONSENT SUBMISSION DEADLINE: Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(2), the parties are reminded that a magistrate judge was assigned as the trial judge in this matter under 28 U.S.C. 636(c). The parties are advised that the Clerk will reassign this matter to a district judge as the trial judge no later than March 11, 2019 unless consents from all parties have been filed. The parties are free to withhold consent. If you have already entered your consent, you need not resubmit. (ag) (Entered: 02/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint served on NM Attorney General; General Counsel NMED; and Secretary NMED on 1/24/2019, filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(McDonough, Eileen) (Entered: 02/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM OR FOR MORE DEFINITE STATEMENT by New Mexico Environment Department. (Grantham, William) (Entered: 02/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • Summons Issued as to James Kenney, New Mexico Environment Department. (jg) (Entered: 01/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) APPENDIX/SUPPLEMENT re #1 Complaint Civil Cover Sheet by United States of America (McDonough, Eileen) (Entered: 01/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • (#2) PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (jg) (Entered: 01/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • United States Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza and United States Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar assigned. (jg) (Entered: 01/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • Office code correction. Case office code has been changed from 1 (Albuquerque) to 2 (Las Cruces). (jg) (Entered: 01/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against New Mexico Environment Department ( Filing Fee - Waived), filed by United States. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Permit, #2 Exhibit Permit Attachments 1-3)(McDonough, Eileen) (Entered: 01/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.