This case was last updated from PACER on 07/21/2020 at 13:35:22 (UTC).

USA v. $4,800.00 in United States Currency

Case Summary

On 05/22/2020 USA filed a Forfeiture - Controlled Substance/Drug lawsuit against 4,800 00 in United States Currency. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Mark A. Beatty. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-00477

  • Filing Date:

    05/22/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Forfeiture - Controlled Substance/Drug

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Illinois Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Mark A. Beatty

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

United States

USA

Defendant

$4,800.00 in United States Currency

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Adam E. Hanna

Attorney at Assistant U.S. Attorney - Fairview Heights

9 Executive Drive, Suite 300

Fairview Heights, IL 62208

 

Court Documents

#6

(#6) Warrant Issued of Articles in Rem (rah) (Entered: 06/01/2020)

#4

DOCUMENT UNAVAILABLE

#3

(#3) NOTICE OF INITIAL ASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE: This case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Mark A. Beatty pursuant to Administrative Order No. 257. The parties are advised that their consent is required if the assigned Magistrate Judge is to conduct all further proceedings in the case, including trial and final entry of judgment pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 73. As set forth in Administrative Order No. 257, each party will be required to file a Notice and Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction form indicating consent or nonconsent to the jurisdiction of the assigned Magistrate Judge. If all parties do not consent to the Magistrate Judge's jurisdiction, the case will be randomly assigned to a district judge for all further proceedings and the parties cannot later consent to reassignment of the case to a magistrate judge. The parties are further advised that they are free to withhold consent without adverse substantive consequences. Within 21 days of this Notice, the following party or parties must file the attached form indicating consent to proceed before the assigned Magistrate Judge or an affirmative declination to consent: USA. A link regarding the magistrate judges in this district is attached for your convenience: #http://www.ilsd.uscourts.gov/documents/BenefitsofConsent.pdf. All future documents must bear case number 3:20-cv-477-MAB. Refer to Civil/Removal Case Processing Requirements, found on the ILSD website, for further service information. Consent due by 6/16/2020 (kls3) (Entered: 05/26/2020)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Adam E. Hanna on behalf of United States (Hanna, Adam) (Entered: 05/22/2020)

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Declaration

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT for Forfeiture against $4,800.00 in United States Currency, filed by United States. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Hanna, Adam) (Entered: 05/22/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Warrant Issued of Articles in Rem (rah) (Entered: 06/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE by USA re #1 Complaint (Direct Notice of Civil Judicial Forfeiture) (Hanna, Adam) (Entered: 05/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CONSENT/NON-CONSENT TO U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE - sealed pending receipt from all parties. (Hanna, Adam) (Entered: 05/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE OF INITIAL ASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE: This case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Mark A. Beatty pursuant to Administrative Order No. 257. The parties are advised that their consent is required if the assigned Magistrate Judge is to conduct all further proceedings in the case, including trial and final entry of judgment pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 73. As set forth in Administrative Order No. 257, each party will be required to file a Notice and Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction form indicating consent or nonconsent to the jurisdiction of the assigned Magistrate Judge. If all parties do not consent to the Magistrate Judge's jurisdiction, the case will be randomly assigned to a district judge for all further proceedings and the parties cannot later consent to reassignment of the case to a magistrate judge. The parties are further advised that they are free to withhold consent without adverse substantive consequences. Within 21 days of this Notice, the following party or parties must file the attached form indicating consent to proceed before the assigned Magistrate Judge or an affirmative declination to consent: USA. A link regarding the magistrate judges in this district is attached for your convenience: #http://www.ilsd.uscourts.gov/documents/BenefitsofConsent.pdf. All future documents must bear case number 3:20-cv-477-MAB. Refer to Civil/Removal Case Processing Requirements, found on the ILSD website, for further service information. Consent due by 6/16/2020 (kls3) (Entered: 05/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Adam E. Hanna on behalf of United States (Hanna, Adam) (Entered: 05/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT for Forfeiture against $4,800.00 in United States Currency, filed by United States. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Hanna, Adam) (Entered: 05/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less