This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/29/2020 at 12:06:35 (UTC).

United States Securities and Exchange Commission v. Valentine

Case Summary

On 06/30/2020 United States Securities and Exchange Commission filed a Finance - Security/Commodity/Exchange lawsuit against Valentine. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Laurel Beeler. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-04358

  • Filing Date:

    06/30/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Security/Commodity/Exchange

  • Courthouse:

    California Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Laurel Beeler

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

United States Securities and Exchange Commission

Defendant

John Leo Valentine

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Carol Elizabeth Schultze

Attorney at Securities Exchange Commision

100 F. Street Ne, Mail Stop 5628

Washington, DC 20549-5628

 

Court Documents

#6

(#6) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by United States Securities and Exchange Commission.. (Schultze, Carol) (Filed on 7/14/2020) (Entered: 07/14/2020)

#5

(#5) Summons Issued as to John Leo Valentine. (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/1/2020) (Entered: 07/01/2020)

#4

(#4) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 9/24/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/1/2020 11:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom B, 15th Floor. (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/1/2020) (Entered: 07/01/2020)

#2

(#2) Proposed Summons. (Schultze, Carol) (Filed on 6/30/2020) (Entered: 06/30/2020)

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Exhibit Exhibit 1

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT to Enforce Commission Order against John Leo Valentine. Filed byUnited States Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Schultze, Carol) (Filed on 6/30/2020) (Entered: 06/30/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/16/2020
  • Docket(#7) CLERK'S NOTICE RESETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE TIME: Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/1/2020 at 11:00 AM is reset to 9:30 AM. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/16/2020) (Entered: 07/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by United States Securities and Exchange Commission.. (Schultze, Carol) (Filed on 7/14/2020) (Entered: 07/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summons Issued as to John Leo Valentine. (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/1/2020) (Entered: 07/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 9/24/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/1/2020 11:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom B, 15th Floor. (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/1/2020) (Entered: 07/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2020
  • Docket(#3) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 7/14/2020. (mbcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/30/2020) (Entered: 06/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Proposed Summons. (Schultze, Carol) (Filed on 6/30/2020) (Entered: 06/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT to Enforce Commission Order against John Leo Valentine. Filed byUnited States Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Schultze, Carol) (Filed on 6/30/2020) (Entered: 06/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Carol Elizabeth Schultze