This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/06/2022 at 08:35:44 (UTC).

United States Securities and Exchange Commission v. The Heartland Group Ventures, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 01/05/2022 United States Securities and Exchange Commission filed an Other lawsuit against The Heartland Group Ventures, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Southern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Robert N. Scola, Jr. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-MC-20067

  • Filing Date:

    01/05/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Robert N. Scola, Jr

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

United States Securities and Exchange Commission

Defendants

Manjit Singh Sahota

The Heartland Group Ventures, LLC

Heartland Production and Recovery LLC

Heartland Production and Recovery Fund LLC

Heartland Production and Recovery Fund II LLC

The Heartland Group Fund III, LLC

Heartland Drilling Fund I, LP

Carson Oil Field Development Fund II, LP

Alternative Office Solutions, LLC

Arcooil Corp.

Barron Petroleum LLC

James Ikey

John Muratore

Thomas Brad Pearsey

Roger

Rustin Brunson

Dodson Prairie Oil & Gas LLC

Panther City Energy LLC

Muratore Financial Services, Inc.

11 More Parties Available

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Letter

1 #2

Exhibit

#3

(#3) Bar Letter re: Admissions sent to attorney Jeffrey R. Fine, Rose L. Romero and Danielle N. Rushing, mailing date January 6, 2022, (pt) (Entered: 01/06/2022)

#5

(#5) Clerks Notice of Receipt of Filing Fee received on 1/5/2022 in the amount of $ 49.00, receipt number FLS100243084. (vt) (Entered: 01/06/2022)

#6

(#6) Order Closing Case. As no relief is sought in this case, the Court directs the Clerk to close this case. Any party may move to re-open the case. Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr on 1/25/2022. See attached document for full details. (amb) (Entered: 01/25/2022)

 

Docket Entries

01/25/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#6) Order Closing Case. As no relief is sought in this case, the Court directs the Clerk to close this case. Any party may move to re-open the case. Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr on 1/25/2022. See attached document for full details. (amb) (Entered: 01/25/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/06/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#5) Clerks Notice of Receipt of Filing Fee received on 1/5/2022 in the amount of $ 49.00, receipt number FLS100243084. (vt) (Entered: 01/06/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/06/2022

Docket(#4) Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. No Civil Cover Sheet. Filer is instructed to file a Notice (Other) with the Civil Cover Sheet attached within 24 hours of the notice. (jbs) (Entered: 01/06/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/06/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#3) Bar Letter re: Admissions sent to attorney Jeffrey R. Fine, Rose L. Romero and Danielle N. Rushing, mailing date January 6, 2022, (pt) (Entered: 01/06/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/05/2022

Docket(#2) Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr. (jbs) (Entered: 01/06/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/05/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#1) Order (Complaint) for Appointment of Receiver. Filing fee $ 49.00, filed by Deborah D. Williamson. (Attachments: #1 Letter, #2 Exhibit)(jbs) (Entered: 01/06/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less