This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/20/2020 at 10:21:50 (UTC).

United States Securities and Exchange Commission v. TCA Fund Management Group Corporation et al

Case Summary

On 05/21/2020 United States Securities and Exchange Commission filed an Other lawsuit against TCA Fund Management Group Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Arizona District. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-MC-00026

  • Filing Date:

    05/21/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

United States Securities and Exchange Commission

Defendants

TCA Global Credit Fund LP

TCA Fund Management Group Corporation

TCA Global Credit Fund GP Limited

TCA Global Credit Fund Limited

TCA Global Credit Fund Master Fund LP

Receiver

Jonathan E Perlman

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Andrew O Schiff

Attorney at Securities & Exchange Commission - Miami, FL

801 Brickell Ave., Ste. 1950

Miami, FL 33131

Stephanie N Moot

Attorney at Securities & Exchange Commission - Miami, FL

801 Brickell Ave., Ste. 1950

Miami, FL 33131

Receiver Attorneys

Gregory Matthew Garno

Attorney at Genovese Joblove & Battista PA

100 Se 2Nd St., 44Th Fl.

Miami, FL 33131

Heather Lauren Yonke

Attorney at Genovese Joblove & Battista PA

100 Se 2Nd St., 44Th Fl.

Miami, FL 33131

Irina Rebeca Sadovnic

Attorney at Genovese Joblove & Battista PA

100 Se 2Nd St., 44Th Fl.

Miami, FL 33131

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Letter

1 #3

Envelope

#2

#3

#4

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER re: #1 Miscellaneous Case Opening Regarding: COMPLAINT for RECEIVERSHIP pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 754, filed by Jonathan E Perlman from United States District Court, Southern District of Florida (Miami), case number 1:20-cv-21964-CMA. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 5/18/2020. (REK) (Entered: 05/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) JUDGMENT OF PERMANENT INJUNCTION AND OTHER RELIEF re: #1 Miscellaneous Case Opening Regarding: COMPLAINT for RECEIVERSHIP pursuant to 28 U.S.C> 754 filed by Jonathan E Perlman from United States District Court, Southern District of Florida (Miami), case number 1:20-cv-21964-CMA. Signed by Judge Cecilia M Altonaga on 5/12/2020. (REK) (Entered: 05/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ORDER GRANTING UNOPPOSED EXPEDITED MOTION FOR APPOINTMENT OF RECEIVER re: #1 Miscellaneous Case Opening Regarding: COMPLAINT FOR RECEIVERSHIP pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 754 filed by Jonathan E Perlman from United States District Court, Southern District of Florida (Miami) case number: 1:20-cv-21964-CMA. Signed by Judge Cecilia M Altonaga on 5/11/2020. (REK) (Entered: 05/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Miscellaneous Case Opening Regarding: COMPLAINT for RECEIVERSHIP pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 754, filed by Jonathan E Perlman from U.S. District Court, Southern District of Florida (Miami), case number: 1:20-cv-21964-CMA. Case Opening Fee Received: $47.00 receipt number PHX219447. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Letter, #3 Envelope)(REK) (Entered: 05/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where TCA Fund Management Group Corp. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Stephanie N Moot

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Andrew Schiff