This case was last updated from PACER on 02/03/2020 at 08:37:10 (UTC).

UNITED STATES SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION v. NANOTECH ENGINEERING, INC. et al

Case Summary

On 12/05/2019 UNITED STATES SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION filed a Finance - Security/Commodity/Exchange lawsuit against NANOTECH ENGINEERING, INC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, District Of Columbia District. The Judge overseeing this case is Amy Berman Jackson. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-03633

  • Filing Date:

    12/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Security/Commodity/Exchange

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    District Of Columbia District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Amy Berman Jackson

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

UNITED STATES SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION

Defendants

MICHAEL JAMES SWEANEY

MICHAEL HATTON

NANOTECH ENGINEERING, INC.

NANOTECH FINANCE LLC

DAVID SWEANEY

JEFFERY GANGE

OMNI GOLF, LLC

3 DRAGONS LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Gregory R. Bockin

Attorney at SECURITIES & EXCHANGE COMMISSION

100 F Street, Ne

Washington, DC 20549

Christopher Mark Bruckmann

Attorney at U.S. SECURITIES & EXCHANGE COMMISSION

100 F Street, Ne

Washington, DC 20549

Defendant Attorneys

Sandra M. Hanna

Attorney at BRUCH HANNA, LLP

1099 New York Avenue, Nw, Suite 500

Washington, DC 20001

Jeffrey Thomas

Attorney at THOMAS LAW LLC

3773 Cherry Creek North Dr, Suite 717

Denver, CO 80209

 

Court Documents

#2

(#2) ORDER granting #1 Motion to Seal Case. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on 12/5/2019. Counsel have been notified.(zrdj) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

4 #4

Declaration of Pei Y. Chung (Part 2 of 4)

4 #3

Declaration of Pei Y. Chung (Part 1 of 4)

1 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#4

(#5) ORDER. Granting in Part and Denying in Part Plaintiff's #4 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order, Pending the determining of plaintiff's motion for a preliminary injunction. It is further ORDERED that plaintiff must file a notice with the Court by 12/9/2019, indicating whether service has occurred, the time of service, and the name, phone number and address of each individual served. Defendants must show cause in writing by 12/13/2019, why a preliminary injunction pursuant to Federal Rule of Procedure 65, containing similar terms should not be issued against them. Plaintiff must file any reply by 12/17/2019. A hearing on this issue will be set for 12/19/2019 at 2:30 PM in Courtroom 3 before Judge Amy Berman Jackson. Unless extended by this Court pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 65(b)(2), this Temporary Restraining Order expires on 12/19/2019. SO ORDERED. (See the order for complete details). Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 12/5/2019. Counsel for Plaintiff has been notified electronically. (zjth) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

#3

(#18) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #3 Complaint, by DAVID SWEANEY (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hanna, Sandra) (Entered: 12/27/2019)

4 #1

Memorandum in Support

#20

(#20) MOTION to Dismiss by DAVID SWEANEY (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Thomas, Jeffrey) (Entered: 01/21/2020)

21 #1

Text of Proposed Order

20 #1

Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order

17 #2

Text of Proposed Order

18 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#18

(#18) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #3 Complaint, by DAVID SWEANEY (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hanna, Sandra) (Entered: 12/27/2019)

#21

(#21) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #20 MOTION to Dismiss by UNITED STATES SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bockin, Gregory) (Entered: 01/28/2020)

#19

(#19) NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey Thomas on behalf of DAVID SWEANEY (Thomas, Jeffrey) (Entered: 01/02/2020)

3 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

17 #1

Declaration of Jeffrey R. Thomas

#1

(#2) ORDER granting #1 Motion to Seal Case. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on 12/5/2019. Counsel have been notified.(zrdj) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

35 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMINUTE ORDER granting #21 Motion for Extension of Time. Plaintiff must respond to defendant David Sweaney's Motion to Dismiss #20 by March 3, 2020. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 1/29/2020. (lcabj2) (Entered: 01/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #20 MOTION to Dismiss by UNITED STATES SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bockin, Gregory) (Entered: 01/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) MOTION to Dismiss by DAVID SWEANEY (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Thomas, Jeffrey) (Entered: 01/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey Thomas on behalf of DAVID SWEANEY (Thomas, Jeffrey) (Entered: 01/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMINUTE ORDER granting #18 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant David Sweaney must answer or otherwise respond to the complaint by January 21, 2020. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 1/2/2020. (lcabj2) (Entered: 01/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #3 Complaint, by DAVID SWEANEY (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hanna, Sandra) (Entered: 12/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMINUTE ORDER granting #17 Motion for Leave of Jeffrey R. Thomas to Appear Pro Hac Vice only upon condition that the lawyer admitted, or at least one member of the lawyer's firm, undergo CM/ECF training, obtain a CM/ECF username and password, and agree to file papers electronically. No court papers will be mailed to any lawyer. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). #Click for instructions. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 12/27/19. (DMK) (Entered: 12/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Jeffrey R. Thomas, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-6673427. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by DAVID SWEANEY (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jeffrey R. Thomas, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Hanna, Sandra) (Entered: 12/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) NOTICE of Appearance by Sandra M. Hanna on behalf of DAVID SWEANEY (Hanna, Sandra) (Entered: 12/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) ORDER. Plaintiff's motion to convert the temporary restraining order to a preliminary injunction #14 is GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART. See Order for complete details. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 12/19/2019. (lcabj2) (Entered: 12/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 12/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. NANOTECH ENGINEERING, INC. served on 12/6/2019, answer due 12/27/2019 (Bruckmann, Christopher) (Entered: 12/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE REGARDING SERVICE as required by Court's Order dated 12/5/2019 (REDACTED) by UNITED STATES SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION re #5 Order on Motion for TRO,,,,, Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings,,,, (Bruckmann, Christopher) (Entered: 12/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • ***Case Unsealed pursuant to Order filed 12/5/19. (ztd) (Entered: 12/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ORDER. Granting in Part and Denying in Part Plaintiff's #4 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order, Pending the determining of plaintiff's motion for a preliminary injunction. It is further ORDERED that plaintiff must file a notice with the Court by 12/9/2019, indicating whether service has occurred, the time of service, and the name, phone number and address of each individual served. Defendants must show cause in writing by 12/13/2019, why a preliminary injunction pursuant to Federal Rule of Procedure 65, containing similar terms should not be issued against them. Plaintiff must file any reply by 12/17/2019. A hearing on this issue will be set for 12/19/2019 at 2:30 PM in Courtroom 3 before Judge Amy Berman Jackson. Unless extended by this Court pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 65(b)(2), this Temporary Restraining Order expires on 12/19/2019. SO ORDERED. (See the order for complete details). Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 12/5/2019. Counsel for Plaintiff has been notified electronically. (zjth) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • Set/Reset Hearing: An Under Seal, Ex Parte Hearing with only counsel for the plaintiff attending is set for 12/5/2019 at 3:00 PM in Courtroom 3 before Judge Amy Berman Jackson. (jth) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order, MOTION for Order to Show Cause by UNITED STATES SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Declaration of Jeffrey R. Anderson, #3 Declaration of Pei Y. Chung (Part 1 of 4), #4 Declaration of Pei Y. Chung (Part 2 of 4), #5 Declaration of Pei Y. Chung (Part 3 of 4), #6 Declaration of Pei Y. Chung (Part 4 of 4), #7 Declaration of Lucas Jiles, #8 Rule 65 Cert., #9 Text of Proposed Order)(zrdj) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • Summons (7) Issued as to 3 DRAGONS LLC, JEFFERY GANGE, NANOTECH ENGINEERING, INC., NANOTECH FINANCE LLC, OMNI GOLF, LLC, DAVID SWEANEY, MICHAEL JAMES SWEANEY. (zrdj) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) COMPLAINT against 3 DRAGONS LLC, JEFFERY GANGE, NANOTECH ENGINEERING, INC., NANOTECH FINANCE LLC, OMNI GOLF, LLC, DAVID SWEANEY, MICHAEL JAMES SWEANEY with Jury Demand filed by UNITED STATES SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(zrdj) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) ORDER granting #1 Motion to Seal Case. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on 12/5/2019. Counsel have been notified.(zrdj) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) MOTION to Seal Case by UNITED STATES SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(zrdj) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.