This case was last updated from PACER on 03/16/2020 at 08:00:15 (UTC).

United States Securities and Exchange Commission v. Lundervold

Case Summary

On 01/16/2020 United States Securities and Exchange Commission filed a Finance - Security/Commodity/Exchange lawsuit against Lundervold. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Minnesota District. The Judges overseeing this case are Elizabeth Cowan Wright and Susan Richard Nelson. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    0:20-CV-00236

  • Filing Date:

    01/16/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Security/Commodity/Exchange

  • Courthouse:

    Minnesota District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Elizabeth Cowan Wright

Presiding Judge

Susan Richard Nelson

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

United States Securities and Exchange Commission

Defendant

Mr. Allan L. Lundervold

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Andrew P. O'Brien

Attorney at United States Securities and Exchange Commission

175 West Jackson Boulevard, Ste 1450

Chicago, IL 60604

Charles J Kerstetter

Attorney at US Securities & Exchange Commission

175 Jackson Blvd W Ste 900, Suite 900

Chicago, IL 60604-2615

 

Court Documents

#7

(#7) Defendant's ANSWER to Complaint filed by Allan L. Lundervold. (Weiner, Evan) (Entered: 03/12/2020)

#6

(#6) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by United States Securities and Exchange Commission. Allan L. Lundervold waiver sent on 1/16/2020, answer due 3/16/2020. (O'Brien, Andrew) (Entered: 02/11/2020)

#5

(#5) EXHIBIT Civil Cover Sheet re #1 Complaint. (O'Brien, Andrew) (Entered: 01/23/2020)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Charles J Kerstetter on behalf of United States Securities and Exchange Commission. (Kerstetter, Charles) (Entered: 01/16/2020)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew P. O'Brien on behalf of United States Securities and Exchange Commission. (O'Brien, Andrew) (Entered: 01/16/2020)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Allan L. Lundervold filed by United States Securities and Exchange Commission. No summons requested. (O'Brien, Andrew) (Entered: 01/16/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Defendant's ANSWER to Complaint filed by Allan L. Lundervold. (Weiner, Evan) (Entered: 03/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by United States Securities and Exchange Commission. Allan L. Lundervold waiver sent on 1/16/2020, answer due 3/16/2020. (O'Brien, Andrew) (Entered: 02/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) EXHIBIT Civil Cover Sheet re #1 Complaint. (O'Brien, Andrew) (Entered: 01/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • Docket(#4) TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Susan Richard Nelson per (3rd, 4th - Antitrust, Securities) list, referred to Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright. Please use case number 20-cv-00236 SRN/ECW. (MTP) (Entered: 01/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Charles J Kerstetter on behalf of United States Securities and Exchange Commission. (Kerstetter, Charles) (Entered: 01/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew P. O'Brien on behalf of United States Securities and Exchange Commission. (O'Brien, Andrew) (Entered: 01/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Allan L. Lundervold filed by United States Securities and Exchange Commission. No summons requested. (O'Brien, Andrew) (Entered: 01/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Charles J Kerstetter