This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/26/2021 at 09:52:54 (UTC).

UNITED STATES SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION v. GU et al

Case Summary

On September 27, 2021, United States Securities and Exchange Commission (“Commission” or “Plaintiff”), represented by James Patrick Connor attorney at SEC’s DC regional office, filed a civil enforcement action against Suyun Gu (“Gu”) and Yong Lee (“Lee”) (collectively, “Defendants”), seeking permanent injunctive relief, disgorgement of all ill-gotten gains, prejudgment interest, civil penalties, and other relief for allegedly perpetrating a fraudulently options-trading scheme. This case was filed in the United States District Court in the District of New Jersey with Judges Susan D. Wigenton and Andre M. Espinosa presiding.

This is an action against Defendants, Gu and Lee for allegedly perpetrating a fraudulent options-trading scheme to collectively obtain over $1 million in rebates from U.S. national security exchanges through thousands of “wash trades” – simultaneous or near-simultaneous purchases and sales of securities without an actual change in beneficial ownership. 

In the complaint, Plaintiff alleged that, “Gu and Lee either knew or were reckless in not knowing that their wash trading scheme was illegal. For example, during a sworn interview with the SEC staff, Gu stated that “wash trading in the sense of trading with no beneficial change of ownership is only illegal if it was done with the intent of market manipulation or creating a false market where there isn’t one.” Yet Gu and Lee proceeded with their wash trading scheme that created the false impression of legitimate market activity when none existed, all to recover hundreds of thousands of dollars in ill-gotten rebates.”

Plaintiff also alleged that, “By reason of the conduct described above, Defendants in connection with the offer or sale of securities, by the use of the means or instrumentalities of interstate commerce or of the mails, directly or indirectly, acting intentionally, knowingly, recklessly or negligently (i) employed devices, schemes, or artifices to defraud; and (ii) obtained money or property by means of any untrue statement of a material fact or any omission to state a material fact necessary in order to make the statements made, in light of the circumstances under which they were made, not misleading.”

Further, Plaintiff alleged that, “By reason of the conduct described above, Defendants, in connection with the purchase or sale of securities, with scienter, by the use of any means or instrumentality of interstate commerce or of the mails, or of any facility of any national securities exchange, directly or indirectly: (a) employed devices, schemes or artifices to defraud; (b) made untrue statements of material fact or omitted to state material facts necessary in order to make the statements made, in the light of the circumstances under which they were made, not misleading; and/or (c) engaged in acts, practices or courses of business which operated or would have operated as a fraud or deceit upon persons.”

There are two claims for relief laid down by Plaintiff. The first claim is for violation section 17(a)(1) and (2) of the securities act and the second claim is for violations of section 10(b) of the exchange act and rules 10b-5.

In the prayer for relief, Plaintiff has requested the court to pass an order for an award of permanent injunctive relief along with an order to Defendants to disgorge, with prejudgment interest, all ill-gotten gains and civil monetary penalties pursuant to Section 20(d) of the Securities Act [15 U.S.C. § 77t(d)] and Section 21(d) of the Exchange Act [15 U.S.C. § 78u(d)] and further relief as the court may deem just and proper. 

This case summary may not reflect the current position of the parties to this litigation or the status of this case. Sign up to view the latest case updates and court documents.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-17578

  • Filing Date:

    09/27/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Security/Commodity/Exchange

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Susan D. Wigenton

Referral Judge

Andre M. Espinosa

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

UNITED STATES SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION

100 F Street, Ne, DC 20549

Defendant

SUYUN GU

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

James Patrick Connor

Attorney at SECURITIES & EXCHANGE COMMISSION

100 F Street, Ne, Suite 5950

Washington, DC 20549

ANDREW MCFALL

Attorney at SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION

100 F Street, Ne

Washington, DC 20549

Defendant Attorney

EDWARD ANTHONY VELKY

Attorney at BRESSLER, AMERY & ROSS, P.C.

325 Colum

Florham Park, NJ 07039

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

2 #2

Main Document

2 #1

Exhibit 1 -- Proposed Final Judgment

2 #2

Exhibit 2 -- Consent of Defendant Yong Lee

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by ANDREW MCFALL on behalf of UNITED STATES SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION (MCFALL, ANDREW) (Entered: 09/28/2021)

#4

(#4) SUMMONS ISSUED as to SUYUN GU, YONG LEE. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (jc, ) (Entered: 09/28/2021)

#5

(#5) FINAL JUDGMENT in the sum of $76,849.00 in favor of Plaintiff UNITED STATES SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION against Defendant YONG LEE. Signed by Judge Susan D. Wigenton on 9/29/2021. (ld, ) (Entered: 09/29/2021)

#6

(#6) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by UNITED STATES SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION. SUYUN GU waiver sent on 9/29/2021, answer due 11/29/2021. (Connor, James) (Entered: 10/07/2021)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by EDWARD ANTHONY VELKY on behalf of SUYUN GU (VELKY, EDWARD) (Entered: 11/24/2021)

#8

(#8) Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Defendant, Suyun Gu. Attorney EDWARD ANTHONY VELKY for SUYUN GU added. (VELKY, EDWARD) (Entered: 11/24/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Defendant, Suyun Gu. Attorney EDWARD ANTHONY VELKY for SUYUN GU added. (VELKY, EDWARD) (Entered: 11/24/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by EDWARD ANTHONY VELKY on behalf of SUYUN GU (VELKY, EDWARD) (Entered: 11/24/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • DocketCLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - Please note the "Civil Case Terminated" entered on 11/12/2021 was docketed in error. Defendant Suyun Gu remains pending. Please disregard. (jr) Modified on 11/15/2021 (mxw, ). (Entered: 11/15/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • Docket***Civil Case Terminated. (ld, ) (Entered: 11/12/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by UNITED STATES SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION. SUYUN GU waiver sent on 9/29/2021, answer due 11/29/2021. (Connor, James) (Entered: 10/07/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) FINAL JUDGMENT in the sum of $76,849.00 in favor of Plaintiff UNITED STATES SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION against Defendant YONG LEE. Signed by Judge Susan D. Wigenton on 9/29/2021. (ld, ) (Entered: 09/29/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSet Deadlines as to #2 MOTION to Approve Consent Judgment. Motion set for 11/1/2021 before Judge Susan D. Wigenton. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jc, ) (Entered: 09/28/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SUMMONS ISSUED as to SUYUN GU, YONG LEE. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (jc, ) (Entered: 09/28/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by ANDREW MCFALL on behalf of UNITED STATES SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION (MCFALL, ANDREW) (Entered: 09/28/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MOTION to Approve Consent Judgment by UNITED STATES SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 -- Proposed Final Judgment, #2 Exhibit 2 -- Consent of Defendant Yong Lee)(Connor, James) (Entered: 09/28/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Judge Susan D. Wigenton and Magistrate Judge Andre M. Espinosa. (jr) (Entered: 09/27/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Suyun Gu, Yong Lee with JURY DEMAND, filed by UNITED STATES SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Connor, James) (Entered: 09/27/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less