Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 12/15/2019 at 08:54:13 (UTC).

United States of America v. X-Treme Bullets, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 10/16/2019 United States of America filed a Bankruptcy - Other Bankruptcy lawsuit against X-Treme Bullets, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Nevada District. The Judge overseeing this case is Miranda M. Du. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-00637

  • Filing Date:

    10/16/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Other Bankruptcy

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Nevada District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Miranda M. Du

 

Party Details

Appellant

United States of America

Appellees and In Re

Howell Machine, Inc.

Components Exchange, LLC

CFO Solutions, LLC

Lewis-Clark Ammunition Components, LLC

X-Treme Bullets, Inc.

Ammo Load Worldwide, Inc.

Howell Munitions & Technology, Inc.

Valerie Grindle

Kash CA, Inc.

Clearwater Bullet, Inc.

Freedom Munitions, LLC

David Howell

Matthew McKinlay

Z.B., N.A.

X-Treme Bullets, Inc., Ammo Load Worldwide, Inc., Clearwater Bullet, Inc., Freedom Munitions, LLC, Howell Machine, Inc.

Howell Munitions & Technology, Inc., Lewis-Clark Ammunition Components, LLC, Components Exchange, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant Attorneys

Boris Kukso

Attorney at US Dept. of Justice, Tax Division

Po Box 683

Washington, DC 20044

Landon Yost

Attorney at US Department of Justice

555 4Th St Nw

Washington, DC 20001

Appellee Attorneys

Stephen R. Harris

Attorney at Harris Law Practice LLC

6151 Lakeside Dr Ste 2100

Reno, NV 89511

Robert E. Opera

Attorney at Winthrop Couchot PC

3 Civic Plz Ste 280

Newport Beach, CA 92660

Peter William Lianides

Attorney at Winthrop Couchot Golubow Hollander LLP

1301 Dove Street, Suite 500

Newport Beach, CA 92660

Robert Opera

Attorney at Winthrop Golubow Hollander, LLP

1301 Dove Street Suite 500

Newport Beach, CA 92660

Louis Martin Bubala, III

Attorney at Kaempfer Crowell

50 W. Liberty St., Ste. 700

Reno, NV 89501

Gerald Patrick Kennedy

Attorney at Procopio, Cory, Hargreaves & Savitch LLP

525 B Street Suite 2200

San Diego, CA 92101

Todd Carl Ringstad

Attorney at Ringstad & Sanders LLP

2030 Main St Ste 1600

Irvine, CA 92614

Timothy A. Lukas

Attorney at Holland & Hart LLP

5441 Kietzke Lane, Suite 200

Reno, NV 89511

 

Court Documents

20 #1

Proposed Order

#20

(#20) UNOPPOSED MOTION To Consolidate and Set Briefing Schedule re #17 Notice of Related Cases by Appellant United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Kukso, Boris) (Entered: 11/26/2019)

#19

(#19) NOTICE of Change of Address by Robert Opera. Notice Of Corrected Address And Contact Information On Behalf Of Attorneys For Debtor-Appellees And Request For Special Notice (Opera, Robert) (Entered: 11/14/2019)

#18

(#18) RESPONSE to #13 Motion to Vacate by Appellees Ammo Load Worldwide, Inc., Clearwater Bullet, Inc., Components Exchange, LLC, Freedom Munitions, LLC, Howell Machine, Inc., Howell Munitions & Technology, Inc., Lewis-Clark Ammunition Components, LLC, X-Treme Bullets, Inc.. Replies due by 11/20/2019. (Opera, Robert) (Entered: 11/13/2019)

#17

(#17) NOTICE OF RELATED CASES 3:19-cv-666-MMD; 3:19-cv-667-MMD by Appellant United States of America. (Kukso, Boris) (Entered: 11/06/2019)

#16

(#16) Mail Returned as Undeliverable 'No longer at this address' re ECF No. 3 Standing Order, addressed to Peter William Lianides. (LH) (Entered: 11/04/2019)

#15

(#15) Mail Returned as Undeliverable 'No longer at this address' re ECF Nos. #4 Certificate Readiness, 5 Minute Order, and 6 Notice for Desig of Local Counsel & VP addressed to Peter William Lianides. (Attachments: #1 ECF No. 6) (LH) (Entered: 10/31/2019)

13 #1

Proposed Order

#13

(#13) MOTION to Vacate 5 Minute Order Bankruptcy Briefing Schedule,,, by Appellant United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Yost, Landon) (Entered: 10/30/2019)

1 #10

Debtor-Appellees' Statement of Election to Proceed in District Court

1 #9

BAP Memo to USBC Clerk

1 #8

BAP Opening Letter

1 #7

BAP Briefing Order

1 #6

Order Granting Debtors' Motion for Order Approving Compromises of Controve

1 #5

Notice of Appeal of Order Approving Compromises of Controversies

1 #4

Appeal Memorandum

1 #1

BAP Docket Sheet

#1

(#10) TRANSMITTAL from BAP to USDC, Courtesy copies of documents sent via email (ECF No. #1 ). (DRM) (Entered: 10/23/2019)

21 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#21) ORDER granting Appellant's motion to consolidate appeals and set briefing schedule (ECF No. #20 .) Good cause appearing, Appellant's motion to consolidate appeals and set briefing schedule (ECF No. #20 ) is granted. In light of the grant of the motion to consolidate appeals and set a briefing schedule, Appellant's motion to vacate briefing schedule (ECF No. [ #13 ) is denied as moot. Case numbers 3:19-cv-666-MMD and 3:19-cv-667-MMD are hereby consolidated as member cases under the base file 3:19-cv-637-MMD. All future filings are to be done under 3:19-cv-637-MMD. Case numbers 3:19-cv-666-MMD and 3:19-cv-637-MMD are terminated. Opening Appeal Brief is due by 1/15/2020. Answering Appeal Brief is due by 2/12/2020. Reply Appeal Brief is due by 2/26/2020. Signed by Chief Judge Miranda M. Du on 12/2/2019. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PAV) (Entered: 12/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#20) UNOPPOSED MOTION To Consolidate and Set Briefing Schedule re #17 Notice of Related Cases by Appellant United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Kukso, Boris) (Entered: 11/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) NOTICE of Change of Address by Robert Opera. Notice Of Corrected Address And Contact Information On Behalf Of Attorneys For Debtor-Appellees And Request For Special Notice (Opera, Robert) (Entered: 11/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) RESPONSE to #13 Motion to Vacate by Appellees Ammo Load Worldwide, Inc., Clearwater Bullet, Inc., Components Exchange, LLC, Freedom Munitions, LLC, Howell Machine, Inc., Howell Munitions & Technology, Inc., Lewis-Clark Ammunition Components, LLC, X-Treme Bullets, Inc.. Replies due by 11/20/2019. (Opera, Robert) (Entered: 11/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) NOTICE OF RELATED CASES 3:19-cv-666-MMD; 3:19-cv-667-MMD by Appellant United States of America. (Kukso, Boris) (Entered: 11/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) Mail Returned as Undeliverable 'No longer at this address' re ECF No. 3 Standing Order, addressed to Peter William Lianides. (LH) (Entered: 11/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) Mail Returned as Undeliverable 'No longer at this address' re ECF Nos. #4 Certificate Readiness, 5 Minute Order, and 6 Notice for Desig of Local Counsel & VP addressed to Peter William Lianides. (Attachments: #1 ECF No. 6) (LH) (Entered: 10/31/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) MOTION to Vacate 5 Minute Order Bankruptcy Briefing Schedule,,, by Appellant United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Yost, Landon) (Entered: 10/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) Mail Returned as Undeliverable re ECF Nos. 3 Standing Order, #4 Certificate Readiness, 5 Minute Order, and 9 QC Notice, addressed to Robert E. Opera. (Attachments: #1 ECF Nos. 4 and 5, #2 ECF No. 9) (LH) (Entered: 10/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) Mail Returned as Undeliverable re ECF No. 2 Minute Order, addressed to Peter William Lianides. "Not deliverable as addressed. Unable to forward." (KR) (Entered: 10/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 10/22/2019
  • (#8) CLERK'S NOTICE Regarding Local Rule IC 2-1. Attorney Gerald P. Kennedy is in violation of Local Rule IC 2-1(a) and 2-1(d). You are required to register to file documents electronically in the Court's electronic filing system (CM/ECF) and the electronic service of pleadings and other papers. Please visit the Court's website to complete the registration for CM/ECF. (no image attached) (LE) (Entered: 10/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2019
  • (#7) NOTICE TO COUNSEL PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IA 11-2. Counsel Todd carl Ringstad to comply with completion and filing of the Verified Petition and Designation of Local Counsel. For your convenience, click on the following link to obtain the form from the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. Upon approval of the Verified Petition, counsel is required to register for the Court's Case Management and Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) system and the electronic service of documents. Please visit the Court's website www.nvd.uscourts.gov to register Attorney. Verified Petition due by 12/6/2019. (no image attached) (LE) (Entered: 10/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2019
  • (#6) NOTICE TO COUNSEL PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IA 11-2. Counsel Peter William Lianides to comply with completion and filing of the Verified Petition and Designation of Local Counsel. For your convenience, click on the following link to obtain the form from the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. Upon approval of the Verified Petition, counsel is required to register for the Court's Case Management and Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) system and the electronic service of documents. Please visit the Court's website www.nvd.uscourts.gov to register Attorney. Verified Petition due by 12/6/2019. (no image attached) (LE) (Entered: 10/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) TRANSMITTAL from BAP to USDC, Courtesy copies of documents sent via email (ECF No. #1 ). (DRM) (Entered: 10/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2019
  • (#5) MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Chief Judge Miranda M. Du on 10/21/2019. IT IS ORDERED that the appellant shall have a period of 14 days from the date of this order to file/serve an opening brief. Appellee shall have 14 days after to file/serve an answering brief. Thereafter, appellant shall have 14 days to file/serve a final reply brief. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that appellant shall file and serve excerpts of the record as an appendix to the appellant brief pursuant to Fed. R. Bankr. P. 8009(b) and LR IC 2-2. Appellee may also file/serve an appendix with appellee brief which contains required material omitted by appellant. Opening brief due by 11/4/2019. Answering brief due by 11/18/2019. Reply brief due by 12/2/2019. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM) (Entered: 10/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) CERTIFICATE of Readiness. Appeal Reference Number 19-38. BAP case NV-19-1228. USBC case 18-50609-btb. (KR) (Entered: 10/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • (#3) STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Miranda M. Du. Chief Judge Du's Civil Standing Order is posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website and may be accessed directly via this hyperlink: #www.nvd.uscourts.gov (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PAV) (Entered: 10/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • (#2) MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Chief Judge Miranda M. Du on 10/18/2019. IT IS ORDERED that the designation of reporters and recorders transcripts (if any) as required by Fed. R. Bankr. P. 8009(a) shall be filed with the clerk of bankruptcy court so the certificate of readiness may be transmitted timely to the district court. If the designation was previously filed with the clerk of BAP, counsel shall file a copy of the same with the clerk of bankruptcy court. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that all future documents filed in connection with this appeal shall bear the bankruptcy case number, adversary case number (if any) and the district court civil case number. For Bankruptcy Appeals, Attorneys are required to file Verified Petitions in accordance with LR IA 11-2. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR) (Entered: 10/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • Case randomly assigned to Chief Judge Miranda M. Du. (LE) (Entered: 10/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Notice of TRANSFER OF APPEAL TO DISTRICT COURT, BAP case NV-19-1228, Bankruptcy Court case 3:18-bk-50609-BTB. (Attachments: #1 BAP Docket Sheet, #2 Transmittal to BAP, #3 Notice of Referral to BAP, #4 Appeal Memorandum, #5 Notice of Appeal of Order Approving Compromises of Controversies, #6 Order Granting Debtors' Motion for Order Approving Compromises of Controversies, #7 BAP Briefing Order, #8 BAP Opening Letter, #9 BAP Memo to USBC Clerk, #10 Debtor-Appellees' Statement of Election to Proceed in District Court) (KR) (Entered: 10/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less