This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/19/2019 at 08:16:27 (UTC).

United States of America v. Walga Ross Group JV et al

Case Summary

On 08/20/2019 United States of America filed a Contract - Miller Act lawsuit against Walga Ross Group JV. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Oklahoma Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are John E Dowdell and Frank H McCarthy. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:19-CV-00459

  • Filing Date:

    08/20/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Miller Act

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

John E Dowdell

Referral Judge

Frank H McCarthy

 

Party Details

Counter Defendants and Plaintiffs

United States of America

Granite Excavation and Construction LLC

Defendants and Counter Claimants

Walga Ross Group JV

Federal Insurance Company

Ross Group Construction Corporation, The

Walga MTE, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Counter Defendant and Plaintiff Attorneys

Evan Blake Gatewood

Attorney at Hayes Magrini & Gatewood

P O Box 60140

Oklahoma City, OK 73146-0140

Christopher Douglas Skelton

Attorney at Hayes Magrini & Gatewood

P O Box 60140

Oklahoma City, OK 73146-0140

Defendant and Counter Claimant Attorneys

Timothy Lee Rogers

Attorney at Barrow & Grimm PC

110 W 7Th St Ste 900

Tulsa, OK 74119-1044

John Edward Harper, Jr

Attorney at Barrow & Grimm PC

110 W 7Th St Ste 900

Tulsa, OK 74119-1044

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#36) JOINT STATUS REPORT by Granite Excavation and Construction LLC (Skelton, Christopher) (Entered: 10/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#35) AMENDED ANSWER (Re: #29 Answer, #20 Counterclaim ) by Granite Excavation and Construction LLC (Skelton, Christopher) (Entered: 10/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#34) MINUTE ORDER by Chief Judge John E Dowdell The Unopposed Motion for Leave to Amend Granite's Answer to WRG's Counterclaim (Doc. 33) is granted. Granite's Amended Answer shall be filed by October 4, 2019. ; setting/resetting deadline(s)/hearing(s): ( Miscellaneous Deadline set for 10/4/2019); granting #33 Motion for Leave to File Document(s) (Re: #29 Answer ) (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (SAS, Chambers) (Entered: 10/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#33) Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Amended Answer by Granite Excavation and Construction LLC (With attachments) (Skelton, Christopher) (Entered: 09/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#32) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (identifying: Corporate Parent Granite Excavation & Construction, LLC for Granite Excavation and Construction LLC, Granite Excavation and Construction LLC) by Granite Excavation and Construction LLC (Skelton, Christopher) (Entered: 09/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#31) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Christopher Douglas Skelton on behalf of Granite Excavation and Construction LLC [Note: Attorney Christopher Douglas Skelton added to party Granite Excavation and Construction LLC(pty:relpla), Attorney Christopher Douglas Skelton added to party Granite Excavation and Construction LLC(pty:cd).] (Skelton, Christopher) (Entered: 09/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2019
  • (#30) MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing Granite Excavation and Construction LLC to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCvP 7.1 within seven (7) days of this order, if they have not already done so. The parties shall use the form entitled Corporate Disclosure Statement available on the Courts website (please do not refile if already filed on non-court form unless directed to do so). If you have already filed your Corporate Disclosure Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Corporate Disclosure Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (dlg, Dpty Clk) (Entered: 09/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#29) ANSWER with Jury Demand (Re: #20 Counterclaim ) by United States of America (Gatewood, Evan) (Entered: 08/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2019
  • (#28) MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , changing case number to 19-cv-459-JED-FHM (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (dlg, Dpty Clk) (Entered: 08/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2019
  • (#27) MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing Walga Ross Group JV, Walga MTE, LLC, The Ross Group Construction Corporation, and Federal Insurance Company to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCvP 7.1 within seven (7) days of this order, if they have not already done so. The parties shall use the form entitled Corporate Disclosure Statement available on the Courts website (please do not refile if already filed on non-court form unless directed to do so). If you have already filed your Corporate Disclosure Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Corporate Disclosure Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (dlg, Dpty Clk) (Entered: 08/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
17 More Docket Entries
  • 06/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Defendant Federal Insurance Company. Federal Insurance Company waiver sent on 6/17/2019, answer due 8/16/2019. (Gatewood, Evan) [Transferred from Oklahoma Western on 8/21/2019.] (Entered: 06/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ORDER re #6 Plaintiff's Response to Court's Order to Show Cause. The Court directs the plaintiff to obtain service on all defendants by June 26, 2019. Signed by Honorable Patrick R Wyrick on 6/5/2019. (ks) [Transferred from Oklahoma Western on 8/21/2019.] (Entered: 06/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Summons Issued Electronically as to The Ross Group Construction Corporation, Walga MTE, LLC. (kmt) [Transferred from Oklahoma Western on 8/21/2019.] (Entered: 06/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE filed by United States of America. (Gatewood, Evan) [Transferred from Oklahoma Western on 8/21/2019.] (Entered: 06/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) AMENDED COMPLAINT against Federal Insurance Company, Walga Ross Group JV, Walga MTE, LLC, The Ross Group Construction Corporation filed by United States of America.(Gatewood, Evan) [Transferred from Oklahoma Western on 8/21/2019.] (Entered: 06/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE within 14 days of the date of this order, whether service has been effected upon the Defendants, and if not, why service has not been timely made. In the absence of such a showing, this case will be dismissed without prejudice to refiling (as more fully set out). Signed by Honorable Patrick R Wyrick on 5/23/2019. (ks) [Transferred from Oklahoma Western on 8/21/2019.] (Entered: 05/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Honorable Patrick R Wyrick for all further proceedings. Honorable Timothy D. DeGiusti no longer assigned to case. Signed by Honorable Timothy D. DeGiusti on 4/19/2019. (mb) [Transferred from Oklahoma Western on 8/21/2019.] (Entered: 04/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2019
  • PAYMENT FOR A CIVIL CASE Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1087-2857681. (Gatewood, Evan) [Transferred from Oklahoma Western on 8/21/2019.] (Entered: 02/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Summons Issued Electronically as to Federal Insurance Company, Walga Ross Group JV. (kmt) [Transferred from Oklahoma Western on 8/21/2019.] (Entered: 02/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Federal Insurance Company, Walga Ross Group JV filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(kmt) [Transferred from Oklahoma Western on 8/21/2019.] (Entered: 02/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Ross Group Construction Corporation, The is a litigant

Latest cases where Federal Insurance Company is a litigant