This case was last updated from PACER on 02/03/2020 at 08:25:49 (UTC).

United States of America v. Thurston et al

Case Summary

On 12/05/2019 United States of America filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against Thurston. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Kentucky Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Thomas B. Russell. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:19-CV-00190

  • Filing Date:

    12/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Kentucky Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Thomas B. Russell

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Cross Defendant

United States of America

Defendants, Cross Defendants and Cross Claimants

Terri M. Thurston

Midland Funding, LLC

Unknown Heirs and Spouses

Unknown Spouse

Billy Reed Thurston

Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC

Terri M. Ellegood

CACH, LLC

Deborah K. Thurston

Jefferson Capital Systems, LLC

Asset Acceptance, LLC

Capital One Bank (USA), N.A.

United States of America

Not Classified By Court

Warning Order Attorney

15 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Cross Defendant and Plaintiff Attorneys

William F. Campbell

Attorney at U.S. Attorney Office - Louisville

717 W. Broadway

Louisville, KY 40202

Katherine A. Bell

Attorney at U.S. Attorney Office - Louisville

717 W. Broadway

Louisville, KY 40202

Defendant, Cross Defendant and Cross Claimant Attorneys

W. Scott Stinnett

Attorney at Lloyd & McDaniel, PLC

700 N. Hurstbourne Pkwy, Suite 200

Louisville, KY 40223-0200

William F. Campbell

Attorney at U.S. Attorney Office - Louisville

717 W. Broadway

Louisville, KY 40202

Katherine A. Bell

Attorney at U.S. Attorney Office - Louisville

717 W. Broadway

Louisville, KY 40202

Not Classified By Court Attorney

Julie A. Tennyson

Attorney at Marcum Tennyson PLLC

P.O. Box 9551

Paducah, KY 42002

 

Court Documents

#18

(#18) WARNING ORDER AND ORDER APPOINTING WARNING ORDER ATTORNEY signed by Senior Judge Thomas B. Russell on 1/27/2020. Granting #17 Warning Order. Attorney Julie A. Tennyson for Warning Order Attorney appointed. cc: Counsel(KJA) (Entered: 01/29/2020)

17 #2

Proposed Order

17 #1

Affidavit for Issuance

#17

(#17) MOTION for Warning Order and Attorney Appointment for Any Unknown Spouse of Terri M. Thurston f/k/a Terri M. Ellegood and Any Unknown Heirs and Spouses of Heirs of James T. Thurston by Plaintiff United States of America (Attachments: #1 Affidavit for Issuance, #2 Proposed Order) (Campbell, William) (Entered: 01/13/2020)

#16

(#16) SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States of America. Midland Funding, LLC served on 1/9/2020, answer due 1/30/2020. (Campbell, William) (Entered: 01/13/2020)

#15

(#15) SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States of America. Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC served on 1/9/2020, answer due 1/30/2020. (Campbell, William) (Entered: 01/13/2020)

#14

(#14) ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, , CROSSCLAIM against All Parties by Capital One Bank (USA), N.A.. (Stinnett, W.) (Entered: 01/09/2020)

1 #10

Exhibit J-Judgment Lien

1 #9

Exhibit I-Judgment Lien

1 #8

Exhibit H-Judgment Lien

1 #7

Exhibit G-Judgment Lien

1 #6

Exhibit F-Judgment Lien

1 #5

Exhibit E-Judgment Lien

1 #4

Exhibit D-Reamortization Agreement

1 #3

Exhibit C-Subsidy Repayment Agreement

1 #2

Exhibit B-Real Estate Mortgage

1 #1

Exhibit A-Promissory Note

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT filed by United States of America against All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Promissory Note, #2 Exhibit B-Real Estate Mortgage, #3 Exhibit C-Subsidy Repayment Agreement, #4 Exhibit D-Reamortization Agreement, #5 Exhibit E-Judgment Lien, #6 Exhibit F-Judgment Lien, #7 Exhibit G-Judgment Lien, #8 Exhibit H-Judgment Lien, #9 Exhibit I-Judgment Lien, #10 Exhibit J-Judgment Lien, #11 Exhibit K-Judgment Lien, #12 Exhibit L-Judgment Lien, #13 Cover Sheet) (KJA) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

22 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) WARNING ORDER AND ORDER APPOINTING WARNING ORDER ATTORNEY signed by Senior Judge Thomas B. Russell on 1/27/2020. Granting #17 Warning Order. Attorney Julie A. Tennyson for Warning Order Attorney appointed. cc: Counsel(KJA) (Entered: 01/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) MOTION for Warning Order and Attorney Appointment for Any Unknown Spouse of Terri M. Thurston f/k/a Terri M. Ellegood and Any Unknown Heirs and Spouses of Heirs of James T. Thurston by Plaintiff United States of America (Attachments: #1 Affidavit for Issuance, #2 Proposed Order) (Campbell, William) (Entered: 01/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States of America. Midland Funding, LLC served on 1/9/2020, answer due 1/30/2020. (Campbell, William) (Entered: 01/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States of America. Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC served on 1/9/2020, answer due 1/30/2020. (Campbell, William) (Entered: 01/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, , CROSSCLAIM against All Parties by Capital One Bank (USA), N.A.. (Stinnett, W.) (Entered: 01/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, , CROSSCLAIM against All Parties by Midland Funding, LLC. (Stinnett, W.) (Entered: 01/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, , CROSSCLAIM against All Parties by Asset Acceptance, LLC. (Stinnett, W.) (Entered: 01/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States of America. Jefferson Capital Systems, LLC served on 12/11/2019, answer due 1/2/2020. (Campbell, William) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States of America. CACH, LLC served on 12/13/2019, answer due 1/3/2020. (Campbell, William) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States of America. Capital One Bank (USA), N.A. served on 12/12/2019, answer due 1/2/2020. (Campbell, William) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States of America. Asset Acceptance, LLC served on 12/12/2019, answer due 1/2/2020. (Campbell, William) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States of America. Deborah K. Thurston served on 12/12/2019, answer due 1/2/2020. (Campbell, William) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States of America. Billy Reed Thurston served on 12/14/2019, answer due 1/6/2020. (Campbell, William) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States of America. Terri M. Thurston served on 12/14/2019, answer due 1/6/2020. (Campbell, William) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to Asset Acceptance, LLC, CACH, LLC, Capital One Bank (USA), N.A., Jefferson Capital Systems, LLC, Midland Funding, LLC, Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC, Billy Reed Thurston, Deborah K. Thurston, Terri M. Thurston. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for printing and serving the attached issued summons(es). (KJA) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Senior Judge Thomas B. Russell. (KJA) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT filed by United States of America against All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Promissory Note, #2 Exhibit B-Real Estate Mortgage, #3 Exhibit C-Subsidy Repayment Agreement, #4 Exhibit D-Reamortization Agreement, #5 Exhibit E-Judgment Lien, #6 Exhibit F-Judgment Lien, #7 Exhibit G-Judgment Lien, #8 Exhibit H-Judgment Lien, #9 Exhibit I-Judgment Lien, #10 Exhibit J-Judgment Lien, #11 Exhibit K-Judgment Lien, #12 Exhibit L-Judgment Lien, #13 Cover Sheet) (KJA) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.