This case was last updated from PACER on 09/29/2019 at 07:39:45 (UTC).

United States of America v. Taylor-Watson et al

Case Summary

On 07/31/2019 United States of America filed an Other lawsuit against Taylor-Watson. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Alabama Middle District. The Judge overseeing this case is William Keith Watkins. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-MC-03883

  • Filing Date:

    07/31/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Alabama Middle District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

William Keith Watkins

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

United States of America

Defendant

Tonya Taylor-Watson

Ozark, AL 36360

Garnishee

Herndon Oil Corporation

102 N Court Square

Abbeville, AL 36310

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Robert Randolph Neeley

Attorney at U.S. Attorney's Office

Po Box 197

Montgomery, AL 36101-0197

 

Court Documents

#6

(#6) US Marshals ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed on 8/8/2019 as to Herndon Oil Corporation re #1 Application for Writ of Garnishment, #3 Writ of Garnishment. (kr, ) (Entered: 08/15/2019)

1 #2

Notice of Garnishment and Instructions to Debtor

#3

(#3) WRIT OF GARNISHMENT issued & furnished to USMS for service. (kr, ) (Entered: 08/05/2019)

#9

(#9) ORDER TO GARNISHEE: Upon consideration of the United States' #8 Motion for Entry of Final Disposition Order, it is ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED; Accordingly, it is ORDERED as follows: (1) Garnishee, Herndon Oil Corporation, shall withhold 25% from Defendant Tonya Taylor-Watson disposable earnings each week and shall promptly remit the identified nonexempt funds every pay period to the Clerk of the Court, One Church Street, Suite B-110, Montgomery, AL 36104; and (2) The Clerk of the Court shall apply these funds to the restitution balance owed by the Defendant, Tonya Taylor-Watson; It is further ORDERED that, pursuant to 28 USC 3205(c)(10), this garnishment shall remain in effect until satisfaction of the debt owed to Plaintiff, until Defendant ceases employment with the Garnishee (unless the Garnishee reinstates or reemploys Defendant within 90 days after Defendant's dismissal or resignation), or by order of this court quashing the Writ of Garnishment; The Clerk of the Court is DIRECTED to administratively close this action subject to reopening for good cause shown; The administrative closure does not affect the validity of the continuing Writ of Garnishment. Signed by Honorable Judge William Keith Watkins on 9/12/2019.(kr, ) (Entered: 09/12/2019)

#4

(#4) ANSWER to Writ of Garnishment by Herndon Oil Corporation. (kr, ) (Entered: 08/12/2019)

1 #5

Answer of Garnishee Form

1 #3

Right to Claim Exemption

1 #4

Proposed Writ

#8

(#8) MOTION for Entry of Final Disposition Order by United States of America. (Neeley, Robert) Modified on 9/11/2019 to clarify the docket text (cnw, ). (Entered: 09/11/2019)

#7

(#7) ORDER: it is ORDERED that, on or before 9/26/2019, the Government shall file a motion for the entry of an appropriate disposition order, as further set out in order. Signed by Honorable Judge William Keith Watkins on 9/10/2019. (kr, ) (Entered: 09/10/2019)

1 #1

Instructions to Garnishee

#2

(#2) Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by United States of America. (kr, ) (Entered: 08/05/2019)

#5

(#5) US Marshals ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed on 8/8/2019 as to Tonya Taylor-Watson re #1 Application for Writ of Garnishment, #3 Writ of Garnishment. (kr, ) (Entered: 08/15/2019)

#1

(#1) APPLICATION for Writ of Garnishment, filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Instructions to Garnishee, #2 Notice of Garnishment and Instructions to Debtor, #3 Right to Claim Exemption, #4 Proposed Writ, #5 Answer of Garnishee Form)(kr, ) (Entered: 08/05/2019)

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Mail Returned as Undeliverable, #9 Order sent to Tonya Taylor-Watson was returned with the following notation, "Return to sender, not deliverable as addressed, unable to forward". (No pdf attached to this entry) (cnw, ) (Entered: 09/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Mail Returned as Undeliverable; #7 Order sent to Tonya Taylor-Watson was returned with the following notation, "Return to sender, vacant, unable to forward". (No pdf attached to this entry) (cnw, ) (Entered: 09/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ORDER TO GARNISHEE: Upon consideration of the United States' #8 Motion for Entry of Final Disposition Order, it is ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED; Accordingly, it is ORDERED as follows: (1) Garnishee, Herndon Oil Corporation, shall withhold 25% from Defendant Tonya Taylor-Watson disposable earnings each week and shall promptly remit the identified nonexempt funds every pay period to the Clerk of the Court, One Church Street, Suite B-110, Montgomery, AL 36104; and (2) The Clerk of the Court shall apply these funds to the restitution balance owed by the Defendant, Tonya Taylor-Watson; It is further ORDERED that, pursuant to 28 USC 3205(c)(10), this garnishment shall remain in effect until satisfaction of the debt owed to Plaintiff, until Defendant ceases employment with the Garnishee (unless the Garnishee reinstates or reemploys Defendant within 90 days after Defendant's dismissal or resignation), or by order of this court quashing the Writ of Garnishment; The Clerk of the Court is DIRECTED to administratively close this action subject to reopening for good cause shown; The administrative closure does not affect the validity of the continuing Writ of Garnishment. Signed by Honorable Judge William Keith Watkins on 9/12/2019.(kr, ) (Entered: 09/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) MOTION for Entry of Final Disposition Order by United States of America. (Neeley, Robert) Modified on 9/11/2019 to clarify the docket text (cnw, ). (Entered: 09/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ORDER: it is ORDERED that, on or before 9/26/2019, the Government shall file a motion for the entry of an appropriate disposition order, as further set out in order. Signed by Honorable Judge William Keith Watkins on 9/10/2019. (kr, ) (Entered: 09/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) US Marshals ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed on 8/8/2019 as to Herndon Oil Corporation re #1 Application for Writ of Garnishment, #3 Writ of Garnishment. (kr, ) (Entered: 08/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) US Marshals ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed on 8/8/2019 as to Tonya Taylor-Watson re #1 Application for Writ of Garnishment, #3 Writ of Garnishment. (kr, ) (Entered: 08/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ANSWER to Writ of Garnishment by Herndon Oil Corporation. (kr, ) (Entered: 08/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) WRIT OF GARNISHMENT issued & furnished to USMS for service. (kr, ) (Entered: 08/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by United States of America. (kr, ) (Entered: 08/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) APPLICATION for Writ of Garnishment, filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Instructions to Garnishee, #2 Notice of Garnishment and Instructions to Debtor, #3 Right to Claim Exemption, #4 Proposed Writ, #5 Answer of Garnishee Form)(kr, ) (Entered: 08/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.